STACHE v. MID MON VALLEY TRANSIT AUTHORITY
Plaintiff: DIANA L. STACHE
Defendant: MID MON VALLEY TRANSIT AUTHORITY
Case Number: 2:2019cv01364
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Patricia L Dodge
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Continue. Response to Motion to Dismiss #3 due by 12/27/2019. Replies due by 1/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 11/25/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mqe)
November 22, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #9 Motion to Continue. ERROR: Proposed Order was made part of main document. CORRECTION: Attorney advised that in future proposed orders are to be made attachments to the main document. This message is for informational purposes only. (cjo)
November 22, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Continue by DIANA L. STACHE. (Magone, Frank)
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by MID MON VALLEY TRANSIT AUTHORITY. (Kramer, Elizabeth)
November 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth L. Kramer on behalf of MID MON VALLEY TRANSIT AUTHORITY. (Kramer, Elizabeth)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: In accordance with the case management system in place in this district, this case has been assigned to the undersigned for all pretrial matters. Therefore, it is ORDERED that on or before 11/26/2019, the parties shall complete an election form either consenting to jurisdiction by the Magistrate Judge or electing to have a District Judge assigned to the case, and shall file the form with the Clerk's Office. A copy of the form can be found on this Court's website at: http://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/sites/pawd/files/Consent-to-Mag.pdf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 11/5/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mqe)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Responses due by 11/25/2019. Replies due by 12/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 11/4/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mqe)
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 BRIEF in Support re #3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by MID MON VALLEY TRANSIT AUTHORITY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service) (Lavery, Frank)
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by MID MON VALLEY TRANSIT AUTHORITY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Certification and Notice for Filing Pretrial Motions Certification of Conferral) (Lavery, Frank)
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by MID MON VALLEY TRANSIT AUTHORITY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Lavery, Frank)
October 29, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Notice of Removal. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 11/5/2019. (cjo)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas of Washington County, case number 2019-5852 Copies attached: Civil Cover Sheet, Exhibit A: State Court Complaint, Exhibit B, Certificate of Service (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5331475), filed by MID MON VALLEY TRANSIT AUTHORITY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A: State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Certificate of Service) (cjo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STACHE v. MID MON VALLEY TRANSIT AUTHORITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MID MON VALLEY TRANSIT AUTHORITY
Represented By: Frank J. Lavery, Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Kramer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANA L. STACHE
Represented By: Frank D. Magone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?