RHODES v. PRAUSE et al
Plaintiff: ALEXANDER RHODES
Defendant: LIBEROS LLC and NICOLE PRAUSE
Case Number: 2:2019cv01366
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Maureen P Kelly
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 12 BRIEF in Support re #11 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by LIBEROS LLC, NICOLE PRAUSE. (Sbrolla, Philip)
December 20, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by LIBEROS LLC, NICOLE PRAUSE. (Attachments: #1 Certification and Notice for Filing Pretrial Motions, #2 Proposed Order) (Sbrolla, Philip)
November 14, 2019 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by LIBEROS LLC, NICOLE PRAUSE. (Sbrolla, Philip)
November 13, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ALEXANDER RHODES. NICOLE PRAUSE waiver sent on 11/8/2019, answer due 1/7/2020. (Stebbins, Andrew)
November 13, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ALEXANDER RHODES. LIBEROS LLC waiver sent on 11/8/2019, answer due 1/7/2020. (Stebbins, Andrew)
November 13, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #7 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 11/20/2019. (jm)
November 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip J. Sbrolla on behalf of LIBEROS LLC, NICOLE PRAUSE. (Sbrolla, Philip)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for attorney Andrew Stebbins to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 11/07/2019. (tjw)
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 Errata re #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Attachment of Exhibit 1 to Affidavit by ALEXANDER RHODES. Reason for Correction: Failure to attach exhibit. (Stebbins, Andrew)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 First MOTION for attorney Andrew Stebbins to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Motion to Appear (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5351186) by ALEXANDER RHODES. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support on Mtn to Appear Pro Hac Vice) (Stebbins, Andrew)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 As detailed in the accompanying Order, given that motions pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) are discouraged if the pleading defect is curable by amendment, IT HEREBY IS ORDERED that the parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of any motion to dismiss to determine whether it can be avoided. The duty to meet and confer extends to parties appearing pro se. Consistent with the foregoing, motions to dismiss must be accompanied by a certificate of the movant, stating that the moving party has made a good faith effort to confer with the nonmovant(s) to determine whether the identified pleading deficiencies properly may be cured by amendment. Motions to dismiss that do not contain the required certification will be summarily denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 10/24/2019. (tjw)
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to LIBEROS LLC, NICOLE PRAUSE (Attachments: #1 Summons) (jm)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LIBEROS LLC, NICOLE PRAUSE (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5331590), filed by ALEXANDER RHODES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Summons LIBEROS LLC, #5 Summons PRAUSE) (jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RHODES v. PRAUSE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBEROS LLC
Represented By: Philip J. Sbrolla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NICOLE PRAUSE
Represented By: Philip J. Sbrolla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEXANDER RHODES
Represented By: Alicia M. Schmitt
Represented By: Andrew C Stebbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?