FILBERT v. EZ RENTALS, LLC
Plaintiff: JOSEPH R. FILBERT
Defendant: EZ RENTALS LLC and EZ RENTALS, LLC
Petitioner: DEBBIE SCHWEIGER
Case Number: 2:2019cv01375
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Joy Flowers Conti
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JOSEPH R. FILBERT (mao)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss re #1 Complaint by DEBBIE SCHWEIGER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope) (jmm)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons by JOSEPH R. FILBERT (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Waiver of Service of Summons) (jm)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 Remark: Proof of Service on Defendant received from Plaintiff. Not docketed as Return of Service due to no summons having been issued. (jm)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EZ RENTALS, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 24668059133), filed by JOSEPH R. FILBERT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Receipt) (jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FILBERT v. EZ RENTALS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH R. FILBERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EZ RENTALS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EZ RENTALS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DEBBIE SCHWEIGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?