NELSON v. STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY
Plaintiff: REBECCA NELSON
Defendant: STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2019cv01382
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Mark R Hornak
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY BRIEF re #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY. (Martini, Mark)
November 20, 2019 Filing 10 BRIEF in Opposition re #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by REBECCA NELSON. (Kobylinski, David)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's deadline to file her brief in response is hereby EXTENDED to 11/19/19. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 11/13/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb)
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 Brief in Support of Motion, #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by REBECCA NELSON. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kobylinski, David)
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 BRIEF in Support re #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY. (Martini, Mark)
October 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) (Martini, Mark)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice and use either Dial-In No. 1 or Dial-In No. 2, both of which are contained in this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only", so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jad)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 10/28/19. (jad)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jad)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY. (Martini, Mark)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County, case number GD19-007602 with jury demand Copies attached: writ of sumons, appearances and complaint (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 315--5334264), filed by STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6) (sdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NELSON v. STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REBECCA NELSON
Represented By: David M. Kobylinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE FARM FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY
Represented By: Mark A. Martini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?