COUNTY OF ALLEGHENY et al v. STRADER
Plaintiff: CITY OF PITTSBURGH, COUNTY OF ALLEGHENY and SCHOOL DISTRICT OF PITTSBURGH
Defendant: VANCE STRADER
Case Number: 2:2019cv01406
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: J Nicholas Ranjan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE to 2 ORDER re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and Notice of Removal, filed by VANCE STRADER. (cjo)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Response to 2 Text Order due by 12/18/2019. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 11/18/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (av)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response by VANCE STRADER. (jm)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and Notice of Removal, filed by VANCE STRADER. On October 29, 2019, Mr. Strader filed a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and notice of removal, alleging that the Court has subject matter jurisdiction under federal question jurisdiction. Yet, the action being removed appears to be an action in the Allegheny County Court of Common Pleas involving delinquent real estate tax collection matters brought by the County of Allegheny, City of Pittsburgh, and School District of Pittsburgh against Mr. Strader, which matters do not implicate any federal questions. In light of the above, it is HEREBY ORDERED as follows: Mr. Strader shall file a response to this ORDER by 11/15/2019, showing cause why this case should not be remanded to the Allegheny County Court of Common Pleas. Plaintiffs shall file a response by 11/22/2019, explaining why the action should be remanded. Responses shall be limited to 5 pages or less. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (av)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by VANCE STRADER. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COUNTY OF ALLEGHENY et al v. STRADER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VANCE STRADER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CITY OF PITTSBURGH
Represented By: Emily J. Mueller
Represented By: Christopher C. Malloy
Represented By: David L. Scherer
Represented By: Joseph W. Gramc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COUNTY OF ALLEGHENY
Represented By: Emily J. Mueller
Represented By: Christopher C. Malloy
Represented By: David L. Scherer
Represented By: Joseph W. Gramc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCHOOL DISTRICT OF PITTSBURGH
Represented By: Emily J. Mueller
Represented By: Christopher C. Malloy
Represented By: David L. Scherer
Represented By: Joseph W. Gramc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?