SHEETZ v. C R BARD INCORPORATED et al
Plaintiff: MARY A. SHEETZ
Defendant: C R BARD INCORPORATED and BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INCORPORATED
Case Number: 2:2019cv01422
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cathy Bissoon
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Craig Phillips is appointed as mediator. Party Craig Phillips added. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 12/17/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (wss)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. See contents of this filing for detailed instructions and deadlines. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 12/3/19. (wss)
December 2, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION selecting ADR process by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INCORPORATED, C R BARD INCORPORATED. (Frelinghuysen, Cyrus)
December 2, 2019 Filing 11 PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN pursuant to Rule 26(f) by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INCORPORATED, C R BARD INCORPORATED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 L, #13 M) (Frelinghuysen, Cyrus)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. On or before 12/2/19, the parties shall file a joint ADR Stipulation and a joint proposed discovery plan, in a form consistent with Federal Rule 26(f). To the extent that any documents filed on the docket in the MDL are relevant to the proceedings in this Court moving forward, the parties shall refile those documents on the docket in this matter also on or before 12/2/19. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 11/19/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (wss)
November 19, 2019 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cathy Bissoon: Telephone Conference held on 11/19/2019. (Court Reporter: none) Order to follow. (jhi)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 11/18/19 at 3:00 PM before Judge Cathy Bissoon. The parties shall be prepared to discuss the status of this case, including the status of any pending motions. All participants shall contact the undersigned's Chambers on a single telephone line, and counsel for Defendants shall coordinate the call. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 11/12/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (wss)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Cyrus Frelinghuysen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 11/12/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (wss)
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for attorney Cyrus Frelinghuysen to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5354293) by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INCORPORATED, C R BARD INCORPORATED. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Frelinghuysen, #2 Proposed Order) (Frelinghuysen, Cyrus)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by A. Michael Pratt on behalf of BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INCORPORATED, C R BARD INCORPORATED. (Pratt, A.)
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-04253. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 23, 2019 Remark: Case transferred to the Western District of Pennsylvania via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (SECOND). (See document for details). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 10/17/19. (SLQ)
May 31, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-04253-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ)
May 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16988483 filed by Mary A Sheetz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHEETZ v. C R BARD INCORPORATED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R BARD INCORPORATED
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: A. Michael Pratt
Represented By: Cyrus Frelinghuysen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INCORPORATED
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: A. Michael Pratt
Represented By: Cyrus Frelinghuysen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY A. SHEETZ
Represented By: John A Dalimonte
Represented By: Paul Lincoln Stoller
Represented By: Ashley Crowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?