KLEINZ et al v. UNITRIN AUTO AND HOME INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: LAURA C. WIEGAND and MATTHIAS J. KLEINZ
Defendant: KEMPER SERVICES GROUP, UNITRIN AUTO AND HOME INSURANCE COMPANY and KEMPER CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2019cv01426
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Patricia L Dodge
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #2 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. ERROR: Document should have been filed as two separate documents. CORRECTION: Attorney advised in future that documents of that nature are to be filed as separate documents. Clerk of Court docketed BRIEF in Support of Motion. This message is for informational purposes only. (jm)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #2 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Response to Motion due by 12/2/2019. Replies due by 12/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 11/7/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mqe)
November 6, 2019 Filing 4 BRIEF in Support re #2 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by KEMPER CORPORATION, KEMPER SERVICES GROUP, UNITRIN AUTO AND HOME INSURANCE COMPANY. (jm)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM of Bad Faith Allegations by UNITRIN AUTO AND HOME INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of MTD, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Proposed Order) (Stickley, Robert)
November 5, 2019 Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge added. (mao)
November 5, 2019 Judge Joy Flowers Conti no longer assigned to case. (mao)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County, case number GD-19-14326 Copies attached: Complaint, Insurance Policy, Civil Cover Sheet (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5344417), filed by UNITRIN AUTO AND HOME INSURANCE COMPANY, KEMPER SERVICES GROUP, KEMPER CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit) (jm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KLEINZ et al v. UNITRIN AUTO AND HOME INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAURA C. WIEGAND
Represented By: James C. Heneghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHIAS J. KLEINZ
Represented By: James C. Heneghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEMPER SERVICES GROUP
Represented By: Robert S. Stickley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITRIN AUTO AND HOME INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Robert S. Stickley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEMPER CORPORATION
Represented By: Robert S. Stickley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?