CTAP, LLC v. ALTSCHULER et al
Plaintiff: CTAP, LLC
Defendant: JD RUSH CORPORATION, MICHAEL ALTSCHULER and BRAD POLESKI
Case Number: 2:2019cv01469
Filed: November 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: David S Cercone
Referring Judge: J Nicholas Ranjan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER. In light of the parties advising the Court that they have reached a settlement, it is hereby ORDERED that the Evidentiary Hearing set for today at 9:00AM is CANCELLED. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 12/23/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (av)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER re hearing procedures as discussed during the #42 Telephonic Status Conference on 12/20/2019. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 12/20/2019. (av)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER. The parties are directed to confer and, by 12/22/2019, e-mail Courtroom Deputy Alex Vahlsing a status report containing proposed witness time limits or other allocation of time for the hearing on CTAP's motion for preliminary injunction. The parties are free to propose per witness time limits or allocate blocks of time to each party as they see fit. If any disputes remain by 12/22/2019, the parties should note those disputes in their joint report. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 12/20/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (av)
December 20, 2019 Filing 42 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan: Telephonic Status Conference held on 12/20/2019. (av)
December 19, 2019 Filing 40 SEALED DOCUMENT by JD RUSH CORPORATION. This document Sealed pursuant to 34 Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6) (av)
December 19, 2019 Filing 39 SEALED DOCUMENT by CTAP, LLC. This document Sealed pursuant to 32 Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J) (av)
December 19, 2019 Filing 38 REPORT of Mediation: Case has not been resolved. The parties are reminded of their obligation to complete the ADR questionnaire and submit within 5 days of the conclusion of the ADR process. The questionnaire can be accessed at www.pawd.uscourts.gov. Click on the ADR icon. Mediation session was held on 12/17/2019. (Stroyd, Arthur)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER. A pre-hearing telephone conference will be held on 12/20/2019 at 9:30 AM. The parties should be prepared to discuss the parameters of the upcoming preliminary injunction hearing, anticipated witness lists, courtroom technology needs, and the status of any settlement discussions. A separate notice will issue with dial-in instructions. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 12/19/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (av)
December 18, 2019 Filing 35 BRIEF in Opposition re #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by MICHAEL ALTSCHULER, BRAD POLESKI. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service) (Boreman, Brian)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. After receiving notice of the order of court, you must provide the sealed document to the Clerk of Courts both on paper and on disk, in pdf format. In the alternative, you may contact the Intake Section and make arrangements to email the pdf to the Clerk of Courts. The sealed version of the document WILL NOT be docketed by the Clerk of Court until the party electronically files the redacted version of the documents (using Redacted Document event located under Other Documents), unless otherwise ordered by the Court. You would be required to serve the sealed document on counsel using traditional service methods. Decision to Unseal Document deferred. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 12/18/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (av) Modified text on 12/19/2019. (jd)
December 18, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by JD RUSH CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Binotto, Phillip)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. After receiving notice of the order of court, you must provide the sealed document to the Clerk of Courts both on paper and on disk, in pdf format. In the alternative, you may contact the Intake Section and make arrangements to email the pdf to the Clerk of Courts. The sealed version of the document WILL NOT be docketed by the Clerk of Court until the party electronically files the redacted version of the documents (using Redacted Document event located under Other Documents), unless otherwise ordered by the Court. You would be required to serve the sealed document on counsel using traditional service methods. Decision to Unseal Document deferred. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 12/18/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (av) Modified text on 12/19/2019. (jd)
December 18, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by CTAP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bunting, Laura)
December 12, 2019 Filing 30 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses by MICHAEL ALTSCHULER, BRAD POLESKI. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Boreman, Brian)
December 12, 2019 Filing 29 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by JD RUSH CORPORATION. (Binotto, Phillip)
November 26, 2019 Filing 28 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by CTAP, LLC. BRAD POLESKI served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019. (Bunting, Laura)
November 26, 2019 Filing 27 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by CTAP, LLC. JD RUSH CORPORATION served on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/12/2019. (Bunting, Laura)
November 26, 2019 Filing 26 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by CTAP, LLC. MICHAEL ALTSCHULER served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019. (Bunting, Laura)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Brian Boreman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 11/22/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (av)
November 22, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for attorney Brian D Boreman to Appear Pro Hac Vice, on behalf of Defendants Michael Altschuler and Brad Poleski (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5370960) by MICHAEL ALTSCHULER, BRAD POLESKI. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Brian D Boreman, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service) (Boreman, Brian)
November 21, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary J. Mueller on behalf of CTAP, LLC. (Mueller, Zachary)
November 21, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Marla N. Presley on behalf of CTAP, LLC. (Presley, Marla)
November 21, 2019 Filing 21 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by JD RUSH CORPORATION. (Binotto, Phillip)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 11/20/2019. (av)
November 20, 2019 Filing 19 Errata re #18 Motion for Protective Order by CTAP, LLC. Reason for Correction: Missing Exhibit A. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Stipulated Protective Order) (Bunting, Laura)
November 20, 2019 Filing 18 Joint MOTION for Protective Order (Entry of Stipulated) by CTAP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Stipulated Protective Order) (Bunting, Laura)
November 20, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Evidentiary Hearing set for 12/23/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6C before Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan. (av)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Arthur H. Stroyd is appointed as mediator. Mediation to occur at 9:00AM on 12/17/2019 at the offices of Del Sole Cavanaugh Stroyd LLC. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 11/20/2019. (av)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER re #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by CTAP, LLC. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 11/19/2019. (av)
November 19, 2019 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan: Telephonic Status Conference held on 11/19/2019. (Court Reporter: N/A) (av)
November 18, 2019 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CTAP, LLC. (Bunting, Laura)
November 15, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary D. Bombatch on behalf of JD RUSH CORPORATION. (Bombatch, Zachary)
November 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Marcia L. DePaula on behalf of JD RUSH CORPORATION. (DePaula, Marcia)
November 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip J. Binotto, Jr on behalf of JD RUSH CORPORATION. (Binotto, Phillip)
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to MICHAEL ALTSCHULER, JD RUSH CORPORATION, BRAD POLESKI (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (jd)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/19/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's counsel serve a copy of this Order to Defendants' counsel. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 11/14/2019. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (av)
November 14, 2019 Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan added as presiding. (cjo)
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by CTAP, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons JD Rush) (Bunting, Laura)
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by CTAP, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons Altschuler, #2 Summons Poleski) (Bunting, Laura)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Judge David S. Cercone no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 11/13/2019. (kly)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 BRIEF in Support re #3 Motion for Permanent Injunction filed by CTAP, LLC. (Bunting, Laura)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by CTAP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bunting, Laura)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by CTAP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (Bunting, Laura)
November 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MICHAEL ALTSCHULER, JD RUSH CORPORATION, BRAD POLESKI (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5355343) filed by CTAP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (cel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CTAP, LLC v. ALTSCHULER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JD RUSH CORPORATION
Represented By: Zachary D. Bombatch
Represented By: Phillip J. Binotto, Jr.
Represented By: Marcia L. DePaula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL ALTSCHULER
Represented By: Brian D. Boreman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRAD POLESKI
Represented By: Brian D. Boreman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CTAP, LLC
Represented By: Laura C. Bunting
Represented By: Marla N. Presley
Represented By: Zachary J. Mueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?