CASH v. ALLEGHENY COUNTY SHERIFF OFF. et al
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER CASH and CHRISTOPHER L. CASH
Defendant: CHRISTIAN JONCZAK, ALLEGHENY COUNTY SHERIFF OFF., NATHANIAL ROPPERT, ANDREW MERCER, OFFICER SCOTT BOBAK, MATT BOEHM and JENNY MONTELEONE
Case Number: 2:2019cv01553
Filed: December 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Patricia L Dodge
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT re #7 COMPLAINT against SCOTT BOBAK, ANDREW MERCER, filed by CHRISTOPHER CASH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit of summary, #2 Exhibit of Picture, #3 Envelope) (jv)
January 8, 2020 Filing 12 Partial Payment of Filing Fee by CHRISTOPHER CASH. Fee $91.18, receipt number 24668060444. (gmt)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order directing Plaintiff to amend his complaint #7 as described herein and file it with the Court no later than February 5, 2020. Failure to comply with this Order could result in dismissal of this action for failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 1/8/2020. (mqe)
January 7, 2020 Filing 9 Authorization permitting withdrawal of prison account funds to pay filing fee by CHRISTOPHER CASH. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jv)
December 30, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by CHRISTOPHER CASH. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jv)
December 27, 2019 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against ALLEGHENY COUNTY SHERIFF OFF., SCOTT BOBAK, MATT BOEHM, CHRISTIAN JONCZAK, ANDREW MERCER, JENNY MONTELEONE, NATHANIAL ROPPERT), filed by CHRISTOPHER CASH. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jv)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by CHRISTOPHER CASH. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 12/27/2019. (mqe) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/27/2019: #1 Authorization Form) (mqe)
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by CHRISTOPHER CASH. (Attachments: #1 Form completed by Records Officer of Prison, #2 Prisoner Account Statement, #3 Authorization, #4 Envelope) (nll)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER administratively closing case. Plaintiff may reopen the case if, by 2/21/2020, he pays the statutory filing fee or submits a motion to proceed in forma pauperis along with the required supporting documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 12/19/2019. (mqe)
December 3, 2019 Filing 1 Remark: Complaint lodged, no fee or IFP motion received. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (nll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CASH v. ALLEGHENY COUNTY SHERIFF OFF. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTIAN JONCZAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLEGHENY COUNTY SHERIFF OFF.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATHANIAL ROPPERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW MERCER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OFFICER SCOTT BOBAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATT BOEHM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JENNY MONTELEONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER CASH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER L. CASH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?