RAMSEY v. H.B. ARRISON OF WEST VIRGINIA, INC.
Plaintiff: EDWARD RAMSEY
Defendant: H.B. ARRISON OF WEST VIRGINIA, INC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01659
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Nora Barry Fischer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by EDWARD RAMSEY. H.B. ARRISON OF WEST VIRGINIA, INC. waiver sent on 12/24/2019, answer due 2/24/2020. (Bruzzese, Michael)
January 13, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Moreland on behalf of H.B. ARRISON OF WEST VIRGINIA, INC.. (Moreland, Christopher)
January 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Trisha A. Gill on behalf of H.B. ARRISON OF WEST VIRGINIA, INC.. (Gill, Trisha)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 12/26/19. (jg)
December 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jg)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against H.B. ARRISON OF WEST VIRGINIA, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5405556), filed by EDWARD RAMSEY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RAMSEY v. H.B. ARRISON OF WEST VIRGINIA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD RAMSEY
Represented By: Michael J. Bruzzese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.B. ARRISON OF WEST VIRGINIA, INC.
Represented By: Christopher M. Moreland
Represented By: Trisha A. Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?