PITTSBURGH LOGISTICS SYSTEM, INC. v. NEEL TRUCKNG LLC
Plaintiff: PITTSBURGH LOGISTICS SYSTEMS, INC.
Defendant: NEEL TRUCKING LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00023
Filed: January 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Marilyn J Horan
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Pittsburgh Logistics Systems, Inc. and against Neel Trucking, LLC in the amount of $30,050.34 (jv)
February 13, 2020 Filing 10 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to NEEL TRUCKING LLC (jv)
February 12, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST by PITTSBURGH LOGISTICS SYSTEMS, INC. for entry of DEFAULT JUDGMENT against NEEL TRUCKING LLC. (Manzi, Christopher)
February 12, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST by PITTSBURGH LOGISTICS SYSTEMS, INC. for entry of DEFAULT against NEEL TRUCKING LLC . (Manzi, Christopher)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND NOW, this 10th day of February, 2020, the Court finds that the Complaint in the above-captioned case was filed on January 7, 2020, (ECF No. #1 ), and a Summons served on Defendant on January 13, 2020, with an answer due on February 3, 2020, (ECF No. #5 ). As of the date of this Order, no answer has been filed. Therefore, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall show cause by February 18, 2020, why this case should not be dismissed for Plaintiff's failure to prosecute. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that failure to file a response will be construed by the Court as Plaintiff's consent to the dismissal of the Complaint for failure to prosecute. Show Cause Response due by 2/18/2020 Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 2/10/2020. (bjl)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 1/14/2020. (jgb)
January 13, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by PITTSBURGH LOGISTICS SYSTEMS, INC. NEEL TRUCKING LLC served on 1/13/2020, answer due 2/3/2020. (Moraites, Nicholas)
January 8, 2020 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by PITTSBURGH LOGISTICS SYSTEM, INC.. (Manzi, Christopher)
January 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher S. Manzi on behalf of PITTSBURGH LOGISTICS SYSTEM, INC.. (Manzi, Christopher)
January 8, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Complaint,. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 1/15/2020. (jv)
January 8, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to NEEL TRUCKNG LLC (jv)
January 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NEEL TRUCKNG LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5417423), filed by PITTSBURGH LOGISTICS SYSTEM, INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons as to Neel Trucking LLC) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PITTSBURGH LOGISTICS SYSTEM, INC. v. NEEL TRUCKNG LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEEL TRUCKING LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PITTSBURGH LOGISTICS SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By: Christopher S. Manzi
Represented By: Nicholas T. Moraites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?