LEE v. MCGARRY et al
Plaintiff: L. COURTLAND LEE
Defendant: MICHAEL H. MCGARRY, MARK C. KELLY, JAMES G. BERGES, MICHAEL W. LAMACH, HUGH GRANT, MELANIE L. HEALEY, STEPHEN F. ANGEL, VINCENT J. MORALES, GARY R. HEMINGER, PPG INDUSTRIES, INC., JOHN V. FARACI, MARTIN H. RICHENHAGEN, VICTORIA F. HAYNES and MICHELE J. HOOPER
Case Number: 2:2020cv00075
Filed: January 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Joy Flowers Conti
Referring Judge: William S Stickman
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion to Stay. Status Conference set for 6/1/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9B before Judge William S. Stickman. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 03/06/20. (eca)
March 4, 2020 Filing 11 BRIEF in Opposition re #4 Motion to Stay filed by L. COURTLAND LEE. (Yates, Alfred)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #7 , #8 , and #9 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mark P. Goodman, Elliot Greenfield, and Nathan S. Richards are admitted pro hac vice for PPG Industries, Inc. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 02/26/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
February 26, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Nathan S. Richards to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5485526) by PPG INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Nathan S. Richards, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Richards, Nathan)
February 26, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Elliot Greenfield to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5485502) by PPG INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Elliot Greenfield, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Greenfield, Elliot)
February 26, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Mark P. Goodman to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5485454) by PPG INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Mark P. Goodman, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Goodman, Mark)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER. Response to #4 Motion to Stay due by 3/4/2020; Response not to exceed ten pages. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 02/19/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
February 14, 2020 Filing 5 BRIEF in Support re #4 Motion to Stay filed by PPG INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Callahan, Colin)
February 14, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Stay by PPG INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Callahan, Colin)
February 14, 2020 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by PPG INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Callahan, Colin)
January 21, 2020 Judge William S. Stickman added. Judge Joy Flowers Conti no longer assigned to case. (mao)
January 17, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to MARK C. KELLY, MICHAEL H. MCGARRY, PPG INDUSTRIES, INC. (cjo)
January 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against STEPHEN F. ANGEL, JAMES G. BERGES, JOHN V. FARACI, HUGH GRANT, VICTORIA F. HAYNES, MELANIE L. HEALEY, GARY R. HEMINGER, MICHELE J. HOOPER, MARK C. KELLY, MICHAEL W. LAMACH, MICHAEL H. MCGARRY, VINCENT J. MORALES, PPG INDUSTRIES, INC., MARTIN H. RICHENHAGEN (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5430956), filed by L. COURTLAND LEE. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Summons PPG Industries, #11 Summons Mark C. Kelly, #12 Summons Michael H. McGarry) (cjo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEE v. MCGARRY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL H. MCGARRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK C. KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES G. BERGES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL W. LAMACH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUGH GRANT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MELANIE L. HEALEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN F. ANGEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VINCENT J. MORALES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARY R. HEMINGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PPG INDUSTRIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN V. FARACI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARTIN H. RICHENHAGEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VICTORIA F. HAYNES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHELE J. HOOPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L. COURTLAND LEE
Represented By: Alfred G. Yates, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?