STRICTLY F/X L.L.C. v. PYROTECNICO FIREWORKS, INC.
Plaintiff: STRICTLY F/X L.L.C.
Defendant: PYROTECNICO FIREWORKS, INC. and PYROTECHNICO F/X, L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00201
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: David S Cercone
Referring Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2020 Filing 51 TEXT CORRECTIVE ORDER re 48 Order: Joint Stipulations of Fact due by 4/30/2020. All deadlines set forth in the 48 Order remain in effect. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 4/6/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ajt)
March 31, 2020 Filing 50 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by PYROTECHNICO F/X, L.L.C.. (Albert, Jessica)
March 31, 2020 Filing 49 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by PYROTECNICO FIREWORKS, INC.. (Albert, Jessica)
March 28, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania (WDPA) will be upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF (NextGen CM/ECF) on Monday, May 26, 2020. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found at #here . Currently, multiple attorneys within a firm may share a single PACER account. Shared PACER accounts cannot be used by WDPA e-filing attorneys once the WDPA NextGen CM/ECF system is implemented. Each attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account that will be linked to the e-filing account. If you have an upgraded PACER account, no action is required until after the WDPA NextGen CM/ECF upgrade on May 26, 2020. You have an upgraded PACER account if you (1) e-file in another NextGen court, or (2) created your PACER account after August 10, 2014. If neither of these are true, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account before you will be able to link your PACER account to your current WDPA CM/ECF account for your new NextGen CM/ECF account. Further informational notices will be sent later, but if you have questions about upgrading your PACER account, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6856. (Administrator, ) (ADI)
March 23, 2020 Filing 48 TEXT ORDER: Upon request of the parties, the following deadlines are extended: Depositions to be completed by 4/21/2020; Plaintiff's witness list filed by 4/24/2020; Defendant's witness list filed by 4/24/2020; Exhibits marked and exchanged by 4/26/2020; Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law filed by 4/28/2020; Joint Stipulations of Fact filed by 4/20/2020 at 12:00 PM; and ADR completed by 4/28/2020. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 3/23/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ajt)
March 18, 2020 Filing 47 BRIEF in Opposition re #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by PYROTECHNICO F/X, L.L.C., PYROTECNICO FIREWORKS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Ex A, #2 Exhibit Ex B, #3 Exhibit Ex C, #4 Exhibit Ex D, #5 Affidavit Ex E, #6 Exhibit Ex F) (Channel, Christopher) Modified text on 3/19/2020. (jjg)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #45 Stipulated Protective Order filed by PYROTECHNICO F/X, L.L.C., PYROTECNICO FIREWORKS, INC. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 3/18/2020. (nll)
March 17, 2020 Filing 45 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER Jointly Submitted by PYROTECHNICO F/X, L.L.C., PYROTECNICO FIREWORKS, INC.. (Channel, Christopher)
March 16, 2020 Filing 44 TEXT ORDER: The preliminary injunction hearing originally scheduled for 4/14/2020 is cancelled and RESCHEDULED for 5/7/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10A before Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy. All other deadlines remain in effect. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 3/16/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ajt)
March 12, 2020 Filing 43 ANSWER to #29 Amended Complaint,, by PYROTECNICO FIREWORKS, INC.. (Channel, Christopher)
March 12, 2020 Filing 42 Notice of Mediation by RONALD W. FOLINO. Mediation Date April 7, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. (Folino, Ronald)
March 4, 2020 Filing 41 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by STRICTLY F/X L.L.C.. PYROTECHNICO F/X, L.L.C. waiver sent on 2/27/2020, answer due 4/27/2020. (Ryan, Kathleen)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Judge Ronald W. Folino is appointed as mediator. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 3/4/2020. (ajt)
March 3, 2020 Filing 38 STIPULATION selecting ADR process by STRICTLY F/X L.L.C.. (Ryan, Kathleen)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #34 Proposed Order to EXPEDITE DISCOVERY filed by PYROTECHNICO F/X, L.L.C., PYROTECNICO FIREWORKS, INC. as more fully set forth in the attached order. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 3/2/2020. (nll)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #33 Motion to Extend Time to file ADR Stipulation. ADR Stipulation due 3/3/2020. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 3/2/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (nll)
March 2, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica K. Albert on behalf of PYROTECHNICO F/X, L.L.C.. (Albert, Jessica)
February 28, 2020 Filing 34 Proposed Order Joint Expedited Discovery Schedule by PYROTECHNICO F/X, L.L.C., PYROTECNICO FIREWORKS, INC.. (Channel, Christopher)
February 28, 2020 Filing 33 Joint MOTION to Extend Time to File ADR Stipulation by PYROTECHNICO F/X, L.L.C., PYROTECNICO FIREWORKS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Channel, Christopher)
February 28, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher S. Channel on behalf of PYROTECHNICO F/X, L.L.C.. (Channel, Christopher)
February 28, 2020 Filing 31 TEXT ORDER granting #30 Motion to Add New Defendant to Its Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. The pending motion for preliminary injunction #5 is deemed to be asserted against PYROTECHNICO F/X, L.L.C. without parties having to refile any submissions on the record. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 2/28/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ajt)
February 27, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION Strictly FX L.L.C.S Motion to Add New Defendant to Its Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by STRICTLY F/X L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Miller, Gary)
February 27, 2020 Filing 29 AMENDED COMPLAINT against PYROTECHNICO F/X,L.L.C., PYROTECNICO FIREWORKS, INC. PYROTECNICO FIREWORKS, INC. answer due 3/12/2020, filed by STRICTLY F/X L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Strictly FX Photographs, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Employee Confidentiality and Non-Solicitation Agreement, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Screenshots of Strictly FX Dropbox Activity, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - Cease and Desist to Bleggi, #5 Exhibit Ex. E - Cease and Desist to Pyrotecnico) (Ryan, Kathleen) Modified text on 2/28/2020. (jjg)
February 26, 2020 Filing 39 PRE-HEARING ORDER: Response to Motion due by 3/18/2020. Plaintiff's witness list due by 3/25/2020; Defendant's witness list due by 4/1/2020. Exhibit List due by 4/3/2020. Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law due by 4/7/2020. Joint Stipulations due by 4/8/2020 at 12:00 PM. Evidentiary Hearing on the Motion for Preliminary Injunction set for 4/14/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10A before Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 2/26/2020. (ajt)
February 26, 2020 Filing 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy: Telephonic Status Conference held on 2/26/2020. If the parties agree to mediation, they should file an ADR Stipulation by 2/28/2020 as more fully stated in the attached order. (Court Reporter: None) (nll)
February 26, 2020 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion re #26 Brief in Opposition to Motion, #18 Brief in Support of Motion, #17 Motion to Expedite Discovery filed by STRICTLY F/X L.L.C.. (Ryan, Kathleen)
February 25, 2020 Filing 26 BRIEF in Opposition re #17 Motion to Expedite filed by PYROTECNICO FIREWORKS, INC.. (Channel, Christopher)
February 25, 2020 Filing 25 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by PYROTECNICO FIREWORKS, INC.. (Channel, Christopher)
February 25, 2020 Filing 24 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by STRICTLY F/X L.L.C.. (Ryan, Kathleen)
February 24, 2020 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STRICTLY F/X L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Blum, Joseph)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mark Shepard is appointed as mediator. Party MARK D. SHEPARD added. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 2/21/2020. (nll) Document removed from public view. Filed in Error. Modified text on 2/21/2020. (nll)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Proof of Service due by 12:00 PM 2/25/2020; Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/26/2020 at 02:15 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy; Willingness to proceed before Magistrate Judge due by 2/25/2020 as more fully stated in the attached order. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 2/21/2020. (nll)
February 21, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #22 Order Referring Case to Mediation. ERROR: Caption and/or Case number of document does not match caption and/or case number of case. This message is for informational purposes only. (jjg)
February 17, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica K. Albert on behalf of PYROTECNICO FIREWORKS, INC.. (Albert, Jessica)
February 17, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher S. Channel on behalf of PYROTECNICO FIREWORKS, INC.. (Channel, Christopher)
February 14, 2020 Filing 18 BRIEF in Support re #17 Motion to Expedite Discovery filed by STRICTLY F/X L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Blum, Joseph)
February 14, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by STRICTLY F/X L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service) (Blum, Joseph)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Gary M. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 2/14/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sms)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Thomas J. Sullivan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 2/14/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (Eddy, J.)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Kathleen Ryan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 2/14/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (Eddy, J.)
February 13, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for attorney Thomas J. Sullivan to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5467953) by STRICTLY F/X L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Proposed Order) (Sullivan, Thomas)
February 12, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for attorney Kathleen Ryan to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5466330) by STRICTLY F/X L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service) (Ryan, Kathleen)
February 12, 2020 Filing 11 Errata re #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by STRICTLY F/X L.L.C.. Reason for Correction: Signature needs to match filer. (Miller, Gary)
February 12, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by STRICTLY F/X L.L.C.. PYROTECNICO FIREWORKS, INC. served on 2/11/2020, answer due 3/3/2020. (Blum, Joseph)
February 12, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Gary M. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5465427) by STRICTLY F/X L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service) (Blum, Joseph)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Judge David S. Cercone no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 2/12/2020. (kly)
February 12, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ERROR: Signature on document and filer do not match. CORRECTION: Attorney advised of signature requirements. Attorney to resubmit the document using the Errata event. This message is for informational purposes only. (jjg)
February 12, 2020 Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy added. (mao)
February 11, 2020 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by STRICTLY F/X L.L.C.. (Blum, Joseph)
February 11, 2020 Filing 6 BRIEF in Support re #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by STRICTLY F/X L.L.C.. (Blum, Joseph)
February 11, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by STRICTLY F/X L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (Blum, Joseph)
February 11, 2020 Filing 4 EXHIBITS in Support of #1 Complaint, by STRICTLY F/X L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Blum, Joseph)
February 10, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to PYROTECNICO FIREWORKS, INC. (jjg)
February 7, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by STRICTLY F/X L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (jjg)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PYROTECNICO FIREWORKS, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5461073), filed by STRICTLY F/X L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-E, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) (jjg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STRICTLY F/X L.L.C. v. PYROTECNICO FIREWORKS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STRICTLY F/X L.L.C.
Represented By: Joseph H. Blum
Represented By: Gary M Miller
Represented By: Kathleen M Ryan
Represented By: Thomas Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PYROTECNICO FIREWORKS, INC.
Represented By: Jessica K. Albert
Represented By: Christopher S. Channel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PYROTECHNICO F/X, L.L.C.
Represented By: Jessica K. Albert
Represented By: Christopher S. Channel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?