PAPINCAK v. C R BARD INCORPORATED et al
Plaintiff: SHAWNEE PAPINCAK
Defendant: C R BARD INCORPORATED and BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INCORPORATED
Case Number: 2:2020cv00470
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Lisa Pupo Lenihan
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2020 FINAL NOTICE: In preparation of the Court's conversion to NextGen, our Court's CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 12:00 p.m. (Noon) on Friday, May 22, 2020, until 11:59 pm. Monday, May 25, 2020. Please plan accordingly. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found #here. Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. The first step is to upgrade any legacy PACER accounts. The second step is to link that upgraded PACER account with your WDPA CM/ECF account after the Court goes live with NextGen. To link your account, you will need your current e-filing credentials from our Court. If your CM/ECF login contains any special characters (anything other than a letter or number), you will need to change it as logins with those characters will be unable to link to PACER accounts. No later than Thursday, May 21, 2020, you should log into both PACER and the current version of CM/ECF to review and record your current e-filing credentials for both, as you will need to know them in order to e-file after May 23, 2020. Please consult the Court's #administrative order for additional information on deadlines and alternative filing options during this period. (Administrator, ) (ADI)
April 26, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania will be upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF on May 26, 2020. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found #here. Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. The first step is to upgrade any legacy PACER accounts. Each attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account in order to electronically file after our conversion to NextGen. The second step will be to link that upgraded PACER account with your WDPA CM/ECF account after the Court goes live with NextGen. To link your account, you will need your current e-filing credentials from our Court. If your CM/ECF login contains a special character (such as &, @, $, *), you will need to change it as logins with those characters will be unable to link to PACER accounts. No later than Thursday, May 21, 2020, you should log into both PACER and the current version of CM/ECF to (1) review and record your current e-filing credentials for both, as you will need to know them in order to e-file after May 23, 2020 and (2) ensure that your primary email address to receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEF) is accurate. Failure to provide an accurate email address may result in a delay in receiving NEFs after the Court converts to NextGen. (Administrator, ) (ADI)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING the (ECF No. #12 ) Joint Motion to Stay. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Telephone Conference scheduled for May 15, 2020 is CANCELLED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court mark this case CLOSED. Nothing contained in this order shall be considered a dismissal or disposition of this action. Should further proceedings be required, either party may file a motion to re-open and this case will proceed as if this order had not been entered. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court expressly retains jurisdiction in this matter to consider any issue arising during the period when settlement is being finalized including, but not limited to, enforcing settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 04/16/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb)
April 15, 2020 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Stay by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INCORPORATED, C R BARD INCORPORATED. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Feeney, Brian)
April 14, 2020 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement identifying Becton, Dickinson and Company as corporate parent or other affiliate, by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INCORPORATED, C R BARD INCORPORATED. (Feeney, Brian)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that a Telephone Conference is scheduled for May 15, 2020 at 2:00 PM. All participants shall call into the conference by dialing 888-363-4749 and entering the access code 6019141. If asked for a security code, use * to bypass. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 04/13/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that because this case has been assigned to a Magistrate Judge, each party must execute and file the form consenting to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge or selecting the option to have the case randomly assigned to a District Judge no later than May 4, 2020. The applicable form is available on the Courts website at www.pawd.uscourts.gov in the forms section. THE EVENT USED FOR DOCKETING THIS FORM IS FOUND UNDER OTHER DOCUMENTS, CALLED CONSENT TO TRIAL BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE OR DISTRICT JUDGE. If the parties elect to have the case assigned to a District Judge, Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan will continue to manage the case as provided for in Local Rule 72G. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 04/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Form) (jmb)
April 13, 2020 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement identifying Becton, Dickinson and Company as corporate parent or other affiliate, by BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INCORPORATED, C R BARD INCORPORATED. (Feeney, Brian)
April 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian T. Feeney on behalf of BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INCORPORATED, C R BARD INCORPORATED. (Feeney, Brian)
April 6, 2020 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-01974. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 1, 2020 Remark - Case transferred to the Western District of Pennsylvania via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AMENDED ORDER - SECOND AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/20/20. [Amending to Remove Case: Lisa Riley v. C. R. Bard, Inc., 2:18-cv-00896-NV from page 25 of Schedule B]. (SLQ)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED ORDER - AMENDED SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/6/20. (SLQ)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER (THIRD). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. (SLQ)
March 26, 2019 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-19-1974-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
March 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16698986 filed by Shawnee Papincak. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PAPINCAK v. C R BARD INCORPORATED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R BARD INCORPORATED
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Brian T. Feeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR INCORPORATED
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: Brian T. Feeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAWNEE PAPINCAK
Represented By: Amanda L Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?