PRYOR v. INFRASOURCE CONSTRUCTION LLC
Plaintiff: JAMES PRYOR
Defendant: INFRASOURCE CONSTRUCTION LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00475
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Patricia L Dodge
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement identifying Quanta Services, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by INFRASOURCE CONSTRUCTION LLC. (Godfrey, Nicholas)
May 29, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #3 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant to L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 6/5/2020. (ept)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for H. Devon Collins to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 5/21/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mqe)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Kirk M. Wall to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 5/21/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mqe)
May 21, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney H. Devon Collins to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5623671) by INFRASOURCE CONSTRUCTION LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of H. Devon Collins in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order) (Collins, H.)
May 21, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for attorney Kirk M. Wall to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5623031) by INFRASOURCE CONSTRUCTION LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) (Wall, Kirk)
May 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas J. Godfrey on behalf of INFRASOURCE CONSTRUCTION LLC. (Godfrey, Nicholas)
May 16, 2020 FINAL NOTICE: In preparation of the Court's conversion to NextGen, our Court's CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 12:00 p.m. (Noon) on Friday, May 22, 2020, until 11:59 pm. Monday, May 25, 2020. Please plan accordingly. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found #here. Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. The first step is to upgrade any legacy PACER accounts. The second step is to link that upgraded PACER account with your WDPA CM/ECF account after the Court goes live with NextGen. To link your account, you will need your current e-filing credentials from our Court. If your CM/ECF login contains any special characters (anything other than a letter or number), you will need to change it as logins with those characters will be unable to link to PACER accounts. No later than Thursday, May 21, 2020, you should log into both PACER and the current version of CM/ECF to review and record your current e-filing credentials for both, as you will need to know them in order to e-file after May 23, 2020. Please consult the Court's #administrative order for additional information on deadlines and alternative filing options during this period. (Administrator, ) (ADI)
April 29, 2020 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JAMES PRYOR. INFRASOURCE CONSTRUCTION LLC waiver sent on 4/7/2020, answer due 6/8/2020. (Bruzzese, Michael)
April 26, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania will be upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF on May 26, 2020. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found #here. Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. The first step is to upgrade any legacy PACER accounts. Each attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account in order to electronically file after our conversion to NextGen. The second step will be to link that upgraded PACER account with your WDPA CM/ECF account after the Court goes live with NextGen. To link your account, you will need your current e-filing credentials from our Court. If your CM/ECF login contains a special character (such as &, @, $, *), you will need to change it as logins with those characters will be unable to link to PACER accounts. No later than Thursday, May 21, 2020, you should log into both PACER and the current version of CM/ECF to (1) review and record your current e-filing credentials for both, as you will need to know them in order to e-file after May 23, 2020 and (2) ensure that your primary email address to receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEF) is accurate. Failure to provide an accurate email address may result in a delay in receiving NEFs after the Court converts to NextGen. (Administrator, ) (ADI)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against INFRASOURCE CONSTRUCTION LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5546173), filed by JAMES PRYOR. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ept)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PRYOR v. INFRASOURCE CONSTRUCTION LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES PRYOR
Represented By: Michael J. Bruzzese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INFRASOURCE CONSTRUCTION LLC
Represented By: Kirk M Wall
Represented By: Nicholas J. Godfrey
Represented By: H. Devon Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?