SIDIBE v. CROTHALL HEALTHCARE, INC.
Plaintiff: MOHAMED SIDIBE
Defendant: CROTHALL HEALTHCARE, INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00480
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert J Colville
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2020 FINAL NOTICE: In preparation of the Court's conversion to NextGen, our Court's CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 12:00 p.m. (Noon) on Friday, May 22, 2020, until 11:59 pm. Monday, May 25, 2020. Please plan accordingly. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found #here. Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. The first step is to upgrade any legacy PACER accounts. The second step is to link that upgraded PACER account with your WDPA CM/ECF account after the Court goes live with NextGen. To link your account, you will need your current e-filing credentials from our Court. If your CM/ECF login contains any special characters (anything other than a letter or number), you will need to change it as logins with those characters will be unable to link to PACER accounts. No later than Thursday, May 21, 2020, you should log into both PACER and the current version of CM/ECF to review and record your current e-filing credentials for both, as you will need to know them in order to e-file after May 23, 2020. Please consult the Court's #administrative order for additional information on deadlines and alternative filing options during this period. (Administrator, ) (ADI)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AMENDED ORDER entered pursuant to Rule 502(d) of the Federal Rules of Evidence (correcting case caption in Document No. #14 ). Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 5/6/20. (jg)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Sally Cimini, Esquire is appointed as mediator; The ADR conference(s) shall be concluded before 8/5/20 unless extended by order of the Court. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 5/6/20. (jg)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Motions to Amend/Add Parties due by 6/30/20; Fact Discovery ends 10/2/20. Deadlines for expert discovery, to the extent necessary, shall be discussed at the Post-Fact Discovery Status Conference; The parties shall complete the ADR process they selected by 8/5/20. Discovery is not stayed pending ADR; Counsel must fax to 412-208-7309 updated confidential position letters by 10/22/20; A Post-Discovery Status Conference is set for 10/26/2020 at 11:00 AM in Suite 6220 before Judge Robert J. Colville. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 5/6/20. (jg)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER entered pursuant to Rule 502(d) of the Federal Rules of Evidence. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 5/6/20. (jg)
May 6, 2020 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert J. Colville: Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference held on 5/6/20; Appropriate Orders follow. (Court Reporter: None) (jg)
April 28, 2020 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (McCombs, Katelyn)
April 28, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION selecting ADR process by CROTHALL HEALTHCARE, INC.. (McCombs, Katelyn)
April 26, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania will be upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF on May 26, 2020. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found #here. Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. The first step is to upgrade any legacy PACER accounts. Each attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account in order to electronically file after our conversion to NextGen. The second step will be to link that upgraded PACER account with your WDPA CM/ECF account after the Court goes live with NextGen. To link your account, you will need your current e-filing credentials from our Court. If your CM/ECF login contains a special character (such as &, @, $, *), you will need to change it as logins with those characters will be unable to link to PACER accounts. No later than Thursday, May 21, 2020, you should log into both PACER and the current version of CM/ECF to (1) review and record your current e-filing credentials for both, as you will need to know them in order to e-file after May 23, 2020 and (2) ensure that your primary email address to receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEF) is accurate. Failure to provide an accurate email address may result in a delay in receiving NEFs after the Court converts to NextGen. (Administrator, ) (ADI)
April 17, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter T. Kobylinski on behalf of MOHAMED SIDIBE. (Kobylinski, Peter)
April 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM ORDER indicating that the parties' Rule 26 Meeting Report and Stipulation Selecting ADR Process are due by 4/29/20; A Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference is set for 5/6/20 at 10:00 AM before Judge Robert J. Colville. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 4/11/20. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (jg)
April 10, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by CROTHALL HEALTHCARE, INC.. (McCombs, Katelyn)
April 7, 2020 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement identifying Compass Group USA, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CROTHALL HEALTHCARE, INC.. (McCombs, Katelyn)
April 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Katelyn W. McCombs on behalf of CROTHALL HEALTHCARE, INC.. (McCombs, Katelyn)
April 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert W. Cameron on behalf of CROTHALL HEALTHCARE, INC.. (Cameron, Robert)
April 7, 2020 Filing 4 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only," so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jg)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 4/7/20. (jg)
April 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jg)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County, case number GD 20 3288 with Jury Demand (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5547253), filed by CROTHALL HEALTHCARE, INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit) (cel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SIDIBE v. CROTHALL HEALTHCARE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CROTHALL HEALTHCARE, INC.
Represented By: Katelyn W. McCombs
Represented By: Robert W. Cameron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOHAMED SIDIBE
Represented By: David M. Kobylinski
Represented By: Peter T. Kobylinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?