MENDOZA v. ACTION LAB ENTERTAINMENT, INC. et al
Plaintiff: DANIEL R. MENDOZA
Defendant: CHAD CICCONI, ACTION LAB ENTERTAINMENT, INC. and BRYAN SEATON
Case Number: 2:2020cv00514
Filed: April 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Mark R Hornak
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1121
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATION to Dismiss Fifth Cause of Action by ACTION LAB ENTERTAINMENT, INC., CHAD CICCONI, BRYAN SEATON. (Gaul, Stuart)
May 16, 2020 FINAL NOTICE: In preparation of the Court's conversion to NextGen, our Court's CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 12:00 p.m. (Noon) on Friday, May 22, 2020, until 11:59 pm. Monday, May 25, 2020. Please plan accordingly. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found #here. Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. The first step is to upgrade any legacy PACER accounts. The second step is to link that upgraded PACER account with your WDPA CM/ECF account after the Court goes live with NextGen. To link your account, you will need your current e-filing credentials from our Court. If your CM/ECF login contains any special characters (anything other than a letter or number), you will need to change it as logins with those characters will be unable to link to PACER accounts. No later than Thursday, May 21, 2020, you should log into both PACER and the current version of CM/ECF to review and record your current e-filing credentials for both, as you will need to know them in order to e-file after May 23, 2020. Please consult the Court's #administrative order for additional information on deadlines and alternative filing options during this period. (Administrator, ) (ADI)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER APPROVING #17 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Defendants' Answer is due on or before 6/10/20. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 5/5/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jad)
May 4, 2020 Filing 17 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by BRYAN SEATON, ACTION LAB ENTERTAINMENT, INC., CHAD CICCONI Answer due from All Defendants. (Gaul, Stuart)
April 26, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania will be upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF on May 26, 2020. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found #here. Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. The first step is to upgrade any legacy PACER accounts. Each attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account in order to electronically file after our conversion to NextGen. The second step will be to link that upgraded PACER account with your WDPA CM/ECF account after the Court goes live with NextGen. To link your account, you will need your current e-filing credentials from our Court. If your CM/ECF login contains a special character (such as &, @, $, *), you will need to change it as logins with those characters will be unable to link to PACER accounts. No later than Thursday, May 21, 2020, you should log into both PACER and the current version of CM/ECF to (1) review and record your current e-filing credentials for both, as you will need to know them in order to e-file after May 23, 2020 and (2) ensure that your primary email address to receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEF) is accurate. Failure to provide an accurate email address may result in a delay in receiving NEFs after the Court converts to NextGen. (Administrator, ) (ADI)
April 23, 2020 Filing 16 Errata re #15 Disclosure Statement by ACTION LAB ENTERTAINMENT, INC.. Reason for Correction: Corrected Caption. (Gaul, Stuart)
April 23, 2020 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ACTION LAB ENTERTAINMENT, INC.. (Gaul, Stuart)
April 23, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart C. Gaul, Jr on behalf of ACTION LAB ENTERTAINMENT, INC., CHAD CICCONI, BRYAN SEATON. (Gaul, Stuart)
April 20, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE on Defendant Bryan Seaton on April 20, 2020 by DANIEL R. MENDOZA re #8 Disclosure Statement, #6 Order, #1 Complaint, #5 Notice of ADR Designation, #7 Notice,, #4 Summons Issued (Motolenich-Salas, Kenneth)
April 20, 2020 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint with Exhibits, Notice Regarding Telephone Proceedings, and Plaintiff's Disclosure Statement Pursuant to LCvR 7.1 served on Chad Cicconi on 04/20/2020, filed by DANIEL R. MENDOZA. (Motolenich-Salas, Kenneth)
April 20, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint with Exhibits, Notice Regarding Telephone Proceedings, and Plaintiff's Disclosure Statement Pursuant to LCvR 7.1 served on Action Lab Entertainment, Inc. on 04/20/2020, filed by DANIEL R. MENDOZA. (Motolenich-Salas, Kenneth)
April 20, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ERROR: Proposed Order was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised that all future motions require a proposed order as an attachment. NO ACTION REQUIRED FOR THIS INSTANCE. (jv)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion for Kenneth Motolenich-Salas to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 4/20/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb)
April 17, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Kenneth Motolenich-Salas to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5566248) by DANIEL R. MENDOZA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kenneth Motolenich-Salas In Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit 1 to Affidavit (Certificate of Good Standing, D. Ariz.)) (Motolenich-Salas, Kenneth)
April 10, 2020 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement by DANIEL R. MENDOZA. (Motolenich-Salas, Kenneth)
April 10, 2020 Filing 7 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice and use either Dial-In No. 1 or Dial-In No. 2, both of which are contained in this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only", so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jad)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 4/10/20. (jad)
April 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jad)
April 10, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued (Main Document is as to Action Lab Entertainment, Inc.)as to ACTION LAB ENTERTAINMENT, INC., CHAD CICCONI, BRYAN SEATON (Attachments: #1 Summons issued as to Chad Cicconi, #2 Summons issued as to Bryan Seaton) (jv)
April 10, 2020 Filing 3 PATENT/TRADEMARK DOCUMENTS ISSUED. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Docket Sheet, #3 AO 120 Form, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibits 1-16) (jv)
April 10, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Complaint. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 4/17/2020. (jv)
April 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of AO 120 form completed by DANIEL R. MENDOZA re #1 Complaint, (jv)
April 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ACTION LAB ENTERTAINMENT, INC., CHAD CICCONI, BRYAN SEATON (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5554084), filed by DANIEL R. MENDOZA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons as Action Lab Entertainment, Inc., #3 Summons as to Bryan Seaton, #4 Summons as to Chad Cicconi) (jv) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/10/2020: #5 Exhibit s 1-16) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MENDOZA v. ACTION LAB ENTERTAINMENT, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAD CICCONI
Represented By: Stuart C. Gaul, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACTION LAB ENTERTAINMENT, INC.
Represented By: Stuart C. Gaul, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRYAN SEATON
Represented By: Stuart C. Gaul, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL R. MENDOZA
Represented By: Kenneth M Motolenich-Salas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?