MOHAN v. TRINITY SERVICES GROUP, INC. et al
Plaintiff: MELISSA MOHAN
Defendant: TRINITY SERVICES GROUP, INC. and TKC HOLDINGS, INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00548
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Marilyn J Horan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441cr
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Mediation by MELISSA MOHAN. Mediation Date 9/9/2020 at 10AM (Wallace, Christi)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Kenneth Benson is appointed as mediator. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 6/10/2020. (rtw)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER IMPLEMENTING FEDERAL RULE OF EVIDENCE 502(d). Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 6/10/2020. (rtw)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Fact Discovery due by 11/9/2020. Exchange of required Rule 26(a)(1) information due by 6/24/2020; Amended Pleadings due by 6/24/2020 ; Joinder of Parties due by 6/24/2020 Telephonic Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 11/17/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Marilyn J. Horan. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 6/10/2020. (rtw)
June 10, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Marilyn J. Horan: Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference held on 6/10/2020. Initial Case Management Order, 502(d) Order, and Order referring case to Mediation will be entered. (Court Reporter: none) Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes a Minute of the Court or Notice on the matter. (rtw)
June 3, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION selecting ADR process by TKC HOLDINGS, INC., TRINITY SERVICES GROUP, INC.. (Bunting, Laura)
June 3, 2020 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bunting, Laura)
May 16, 2020 FINAL NOTICE: In preparation of the Court's conversion to NextGen, our Court's CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 12:00 p.m. (Noon) on Friday, May 22, 2020, until 11:59 pm. Monday, May 25, 2020. Please plan accordingly. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found #here. Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. The first step is to upgrade any legacy PACER accounts. The second step is to link that upgraded PACER account with your WDPA CM/ECF account after the Court goes live with NextGen. To link your account, you will need your current e-filing credentials from our Court. If your CM/ECF login contains any special characters (anything other than a letter or number), you will need to change it as logins with those characters will be unable to link to PACER accounts. No later than Thursday, May 21, 2020, you should log into both PACER and the current version of CM/ECF to review and record your current e-filing credentials for both, as you will need to know them in order to e-file after May 23, 2020. Please consult the Court's #administrative order for additional information on deadlines and alternative filing options during this period. (Administrator, ) (ADI)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 4/30/2020. (jgb)
April 26, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania will be upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF on May 26, 2020. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found #here. Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. The first step is to upgrade any legacy PACER accounts. Each attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account in order to electronically file after our conversion to NextGen. The second step will be to link that upgraded PACER account with your WDPA CM/ECF account after the Court goes live with NextGen. To link your account, you will need your current e-filing credentials from our Court. If your CM/ECF login contains a special character (such as &, @, $, *), you will need to change it as logins with those characters will be unable to link to PACER accounts. No later than Thursday, May 21, 2020, you should log into both PACER and the current version of CM/ECF to (1) review and record your current e-filing credentials for both, as you will need to know them in order to e-file after May 23, 2020 and (2) ensure that your primary email address to receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEF) is accurate. Failure to provide an accurate email address may result in a delay in receiving NEFs after the Court converts to NextGen. (Administrator, ) (ADI)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE : A Telephonic Initial Case Management conference is set for 6/10/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Marilyn J. Horan. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/3/2020. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 4/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Rule 26(f) Report, #2 Exhibit B ADR stipulation) (rtw)
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint and Defenses by TKC HOLDINGS, INC., TRINITY SERVICES GROUP, INC.. (Bunting, Laura)
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying Trinity Services Group, Inc. is a wholly-owned subsidiary of TKC Holdings, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by TKC HOLDINGS, INC., TRINITY SERVICES GROUP, INC.. (Bunting, Laura)
April 16, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Notice of Removal. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 4/23/2020. (ma)
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas of Butler County, case number 20-10250 Copies attached: State Court Complaint, Declaration, Demand Letter, Correspondence, Docket Entries, Ntoice of Filing (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5561843), filed by TRINITY SERVICES GROUP, INC., TKC HOLDINGS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F) (ma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOHAN v. TRINITY SERVICES GROUP, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELISSA MOHAN
Represented By: Christi M. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRINITY SERVICES GROUP, INC.
Represented By: Laura C. Bunting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TKC HOLDINGS, INC.
Represented By: Laura C. Bunting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?