DRAZDIK
In Re: ANDREW STEPHEN DRAZDIK, JR.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00549
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Marilyn J Horan
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FINAL JUDGMENT pursuant to Rule 58 entered in the form of the dismissal of plaintiff's complaint for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. This order is entered as the final order in this case pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58. The clerk of court shall mark the case closed. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 6/11/2020. (rtw)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER that the #6 Second Amended Complaint is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim, without leave to amend. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 6/11/2020. (rtw)
May 19, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against CRIMINAL INVESTIGATIONS U.S. POSTAL SERVICE, DIRECTOR INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, PENNSYLVANIA STATE BUREAU, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, filed by ANDREW STEPHEN DRAZDIK, JR. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Envelope) (jd)
May 16, 2020 FINAL NOTICE: In preparation of the Court's conversion to NextGen, our Court's CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 12:00 p.m. (Noon) on Friday, May 22, 2020, until 11:59 pm. Monday, May 25, 2020. Please plan accordingly. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found #here. Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. The first step is to upgrade any legacy PACER accounts. The second step is to link that upgraded PACER account with your WDPA CM/ECF account after the Court goes live with NextGen. To link your account, you will need your current e-filing credentials from our Court. If your CM/ECF login contains any special characters (anything other than a letter or number), you will need to change it as logins with those characters will be unable to link to PACER accounts. No later than Thursday, May 21, 2020, you should log into both PACER and the current version of CM/ECF to review and record your current e-filing credentials for both, as you will need to know them in order to e-file after May 23, 2020. Please consult the Court's #administrative order for additional information on deadlines and alternative filing options during this period. (Administrator, ) (ADI)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM ORDER indicating that for the reasons set forth in the Order and in the Court's #3 Opinion and Order filed April 28, 2020, it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's #4 Amended Complaint is DISMISSED. Plaintiff is granted leave to file a second amended complaint no later than May 29, 2020. If said second amended complaint similarly fails to state a claim, the complaint will be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 5/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1 Complaint for Civil Case, #2 Appendix 2 Pro Se Package) (rtw)
May 5, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by ANDREW STEPHEN DRAZDIK, JR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope) (jd)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 OPINION and ORDER re the #1 Complaint filed by ANDREW STEPHEN DRAZDIK, JR. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiffs Complaint is DISMISSED. Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint consistent with this Opinion no later than May 22, 2020. If no amended complaint is filed, this case will be closed. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 4/28/2020. (rtw)
April 26, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania will be upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF on May 26, 2020. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found #here. Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. The first step is to upgrade any legacy PACER accounts. Each attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account in order to electronically file after our conversion to NextGen. The second step will be to link that upgraded PACER account with your WDPA CM/ECF account after the Court goes live with NextGen. To link your account, you will need your current e-filing credentials from our Court. If your CM/ECF login contains a special character (such as &, @, $, *), you will need to change it as logins with those characters will be unable to link to PACER accounts. No later than Thursday, May 21, 2020, you should log into both PACER and the current version of CM/ECF to (1) review and record your current e-filing credentials for both, as you will need to know them in order to e-file after May 23, 2020 and (2) ensure that your primary email address to receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEF) is accurate. Failure to provide an accurate email address may result in a delay in receiving NEFs after the Court converts to NextGen. (Administrator, ) (ADI)
April 17, 2020 Filing 2 Filing fee: $400, receipt number 24668062138 (jd)
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by ANDREW STEPHEN DRAZDIK, JR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Envelope) (jd) Modified text on 4/20/2020. (tt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DRAZDIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: ANDREW STEPHEN DRAZDIK, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?