ATZENI-DANDREA v. WVU HOSPTIALS
Plaintiff: RENEE L. ATZENI-DANDREA
Defendant: WVU HOSPTIALS
Case Number: 2:2020cv00583
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Joy Flowers Conti
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #6 Motion to Dismiss. ERROR: Brief should have been filed as a separate document. CORRECTION: Attorney advised in future that documents of that nature are to be filed as separate documents. Clerk of Court removed from public view entry since court redocketed as #8 BRIEF in Support re #5 Motion to Dismiss. This message is for informational purposes only. (jv)
June 19, 2020 Filing 8 BRIEF in Support re #5 Motion to Dismiss filed by WVU HOSPTIALS. (jv)
June 18, 2020 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement identifying NONE as corporate parent or other affiliate, by WVU HOSPTIALS. (Boggs, Joshua)
June 18, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Memorandum in Support re #5 Motion to Dismiss by WVU HOSPTIALS. (Boggs, Joshua) Modified on 6/19/2020 to remove from public view since court filed correctly as #8 Brief in Support of #6 Motion to Dismiss (jv).
June 18, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by WVU HOSPTIALS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order) (Boggs, Joshua)
May 16, 2020 FINAL NOTICE: In preparation of the Court's conversion to NextGen, our Court's CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 12:00 p.m. (Noon) on Friday, May 22, 2020, until 11:59 pm. Monday, May 25, 2020. Please plan accordingly. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found #here. Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. The first step is to upgrade any legacy PACER accounts. The second step is to link that upgraded PACER account with your WDPA CM/ECF account after the Court goes live with NextGen. To link your account, you will need your current e-filing credentials from our Court. If your CM/ECF login contains any special characters (anything other than a letter or number), you will need to change it as logins with those characters will be unable to link to PACER accounts. No later than Thursday, May 21, 2020, you should log into both PACER and the current version of CM/ECF to review and record your current e-filing credentials for both, as you will need to know them in order to e-file after May 23, 2020. Please consult the Court's #administrative order for additional information on deadlines and alternative filing options during this period. (Administrator, ) (ADI)
May 5, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to WVU HOSPTIALS (jv)
May 4, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against WVU HOSPTIALS (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 24668062347), filed by RENEE L. ATZENI-DANDREA. (Attachments: #1 Summons for WVU Hospitals, #2 Receipt) (jv) Modified to indicate that the summons were for WVU Hospitals on 5/5/2020. (jv)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER FOR STATISTICAL CLOSING. It is ordered that the Clerk of Court is to mark this case closed as no filing fee or application to proceed informa pauperis has been submitted. The Plaintiff may submit a motion to proceed informa pauperis and if it is granted the case will be reopened. The Plaintiff may also reopen the case by paying the $400 filing fee. Details more fully stated in the order. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 4/27/20. (cjo)
April 26, 2020 IMPORTANT NOTICE: The United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania will be upgrading its current CM/ECF system to the Next Generation of CM/ECF on May 26, 2020. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found #here. Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. The first step is to upgrade any legacy PACER accounts. Each attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account in order to electronically file after our conversion to NextGen. The second step will be to link that upgraded PACER account with your WDPA CM/ECF account after the Court goes live with NextGen. To link your account, you will need your current e-filing credentials from our Court. If your CM/ECF login contains a special character (such as &, @, $, *), you will need to change it as logins with those characters will be unable to link to PACER accounts. No later than Thursday, May 21, 2020, you should log into both PACER and the current version of CM/ECF to (1) review and record your current e-filing credentials for both, as you will need to know them in order to e-file after May 23, 2020 and (2) ensure that your primary email address to receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEF) is accurate. Failure to provide an accurate email address may result in a delay in receiving NEFs after the Court converts to NextGen. (Administrator, ) (ADI)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 Remark: Complaint lodged since no fee was received and no motion to proceed IFP was received. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to WVU Hospital, #2 Envelope) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ATZENI-DANDREA v. WVU HOSPTIALS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WVU HOSPTIALS
Represented By: Joshua K. Boggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RENEE L. ATZENI-DANDREA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?