COUNTY OF BUTLER et al v. THOMAS W. WOLF et al
Plaintiff: R.W. MCDONALD & SONS, INC., NANCY GIFFORD, COUNTY OF FAYETTE, COUNTY OF BUTLER, MARCI MUSTELLO, MIKE KELLY, STARLIGHT DRIVE-IN, INC., DARYL METCALFE, TIM BONNER, MIKE GIFFORD, PRIMA CAPELLI, INC., COUNTY OF WASHINGTON, CATHY HOSKINS, COUNTY OF GREENE, STEVEN SCHOEFFEL, PAUL F. CRAWFORD and SKYVIEW DRIVE-IN, LLC
Defendant: THOMAS W. WOLF and RACHEL LEVINE
Case Number: 2:2020cv00677
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: William S Stickman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Affirmative Defenses by RACHEL LEVINE, THOMAS W. WOLF. (Romano, Karen)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Answer due 06/05/20; Exchange of initial disclosures by 06/05/20; Initial disclosures by 06/12/20; Joint Status Report on discovery due 06/16/20; Declaratory Judgment Hearing set for 07/17/20 at 9:30 AM before Judge William S. Stickman; Joint Status Report on the hearing due 07/09/20; Declarations/Affidavits due by 07/09/20; Pre-hearing briefs by 07/09/20. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 06/02/20. (eca)
June 2, 2020 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William S. Stickman: Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/2/2020. (Court Reporter: Deborah Betzler) (eca)
June 1, 2020 Filing 16 STATUS REPORT by TIM BONNER, COUNTY OF BUTLER, COUNTY OF FAYETTE, COUNTY OF GREENE, COUNTY OF WASHINGTON, PAUL F. CRAWFORD, MIKE GIFFORD, NANCY GIFFORD, CATHY HOSKINS, MIKE KELLY, DARYL METCALFE, MARCI MUSTELLO, PRIMA CAPELLI, INC., R.W. MCDONALD & SONS, INC., STEVEN SCHOEFFEL, SKYVIEW DRIVE-IN, LLC, STARLIGHT DRIVE-IN, INC.. (Breth, Thomas)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #9 Motion for a Speedy Hearing of Declaratory Judgment Action Pursuant to Rule 57. The Court holds that expedited proceedings to examine the claims at Counts II, IV and V are warranted. The Court denies the motion as to Counts I and III. Status Report due by 6/1/2020 at 5:00 PM. Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/2/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge William S. Stickman. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 05/28/20. (eca)
May 27, 2020 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William S. Stickman: Telephonic Oral Argument held on 5/27/2020. (Court Reporter: Deborah Betzler) (eca)
May 26, 2020 Filing 13 BRIEF in Opposition re #9 Motion for Declaratory Judgment, filed by RACHEL LEVINE, THOMAS W. WOLF. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Unpublished Opinions) (Romano, Karen)
May 26, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment (Speedy Hearing Pursuant to Rule 57) filed by RACHEL LEVINE, THOMAS W. WOLF. (Romano, Karen)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER. Response to #9 Motion for Declaratory Judgment due by 5/26/2020. Telephonic Oral Argument set for 5/27/2020 at 3:00 PM before Judge William S. Stickman. Page limitations and call parameters outlined herein. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 05/21/20. (eca)
May 20, 2020 Filing 10 BRIEF in Support re #9 Motion for Declaratory Judgment, (Speedy Hearing Pursuant to Rule 57) filed by TIM BONNER, COUNTY OF BUTLER, COUNTY OF FAYETTE, COUNTY OF GREENE, COUNTY OF WASHINGTON, PAUL F. CRAWFORD, MIKE GIFFORD, NANCY GIFFORD, CATHY HOSKINS, MIKE KELLY, DARYL METCALFE, MARCI MUSTELLO, PRIMA CAPELLI, INC., R.W. MCDONALD & SONS, INC., STEVEN SCHOEFFEL, SKYVIEW DRIVE-IN, LLC, STARLIGHT DRIVE-IN, INC.. (King, Thomas)
May 20, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment (Speedy Hearing Pursuant to Rule 57) by TIM BONNER, COUNTY OF BUTLER, COUNTY OF FAYETTE, COUNTY OF GREENE, COUNTY OF WASHINGTON, PAUL F. CRAWFORD, MIKE GIFFORD, NANCY GIFFORD, CATHY HOSKINS, MIKE KELLY, DARYL METCALFE, MARCI MUSTELLO, PRIMA CAPELLI, INC., R.W. MCDONALD & SONS, INC., STEVEN SCHOEFFEL, SKYVIEW DRIVE-IN, LLC, STARLIGHT DRIVE-IN, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (King, Thomas)
May 20, 2020 Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from RACHEL LEVINE on 7/7/2020; THOMAS W. WOLF on 7/7/2020 (ma)
May 19, 2020 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by TIM BONNER, COUNTY OF BUTLER, COUNTY OF FAYETTE, COUNTY OF GREENE, COUNTY OF WASHINGTON, PAUL F. CRAWFORD, MIKE GIFFORD, NANCY GIFFORD, CATHY HOSKINS, MIKE KELLY, DARYL METCALFE, MARCI MUSTELLO, PRIMA CAPELLI, INC., R.W. MCDONALD & SONS, INC., STEVEN SCHOEFFEL, SKYVIEW DRIVE-IN, LLC, STARLIGHT DRIVE-IN, INC.. (King, Thomas)
May 19, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RACHEL LEVINE, THOMAS W. WOLF. RACHEL LEVINE waiver sent on 5/7/20; answer due on 7/7/20. THOMAS W. WOLF waiver sent on 5/7/20, answer due on 7/7/20. (Romano, Karen) Modified text on 5/21/2020. (ma)
May 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen Mascio Romano on behalf of RACHEL LEVINE, THOMAS W. WOLF. (Romano, Karen)
May 16, 2020 FINAL NOTICE: In preparation of the Court's conversion to NextGen, our Court's CM/ECF system will be unavailable from 12:00 p.m. (Noon) on Friday, May 22, 2020, until 11:59 pm. Monday, May 25, 2020. Please plan accordingly. Complete information, including a checklist of actions regarding the WDPA NexGen CM/ECF implementation, can be found #here. Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. The first step is to upgrade any legacy PACER accounts. The second step is to link that upgraded PACER account with your WDPA CM/ECF account after the Court goes live with NextGen. To link your account, you will need your current e-filing credentials from our Court. If your CM/ECF login contains any special characters (anything other than a letter or number), you will need to change it as logins with those characters will be unable to link to PACER accounts. No later than Thursday, May 21, 2020, you should log into both PACER and the current version of CM/ECF to review and record your current e-filing credentials for both, as you will need to know them in order to e-file after May 23, 2020. Please consult the Court's #administrative order for additional information on deadlines and alternative filing options during this period. (Administrator, ) (ADI)
May 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E. Breth on behalf of TIM BONNER, COUNTY OF BUTLER, COUNTY OF FAYETTE, COUNTY OF GREENE, COUNTY OF WASHINGTON, PAUL F. CRAWFORD, MIKE GIFFORD, NANCY GIFFORD, CATHY HOSKINS, MIKE KELLY, DARYL METCALFE, MARCI MUSTELLO, PRIMA CAPELLI, INC., R.W. MCDONALD & SONS, INC., STEVEN SCHOEFFEL, SKYVIEW DRIVE-IN, LLC, STARLIGHT DRIVE-IN, INC.. (Breth, Thomas)
May 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan P. Shuber on behalf of TIM BONNER, COUNTY OF BUTLER, COUNTY OF FAYETTE, COUNTY OF GREENE, COUNTY OF WASHINGTON, PAUL F. CRAWFORD, MIKE GIFFORD, NANCY GIFFORD, CATHY HOSKINS, MIKE KELLY, DARYL METCALFE, MARCI MUSTELLO, PRIMA CAPELLI, INC., R.W. MCDONALD & SONS, INC., STEVEN SCHOEFFEL, SKYVIEW DRIVE-IN, LLC, STARLIGHT DRIVE-IN, INC.. (Shuber, Jordan)
May 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald T. Elliott on behalf of TIM BONNER, COUNTY OF BUTLER, COUNTY OF FAYETTE, COUNTY OF GREENE, COUNTY OF WASHINGTON, PAUL F. CRAWFORD, MIKE GIFFORD, NANCY GIFFORD, CATHY HOSKINS, MIKE KELLY, DARYL METCALFE, MARCI MUSTELLO, PRIMA CAPELLI, INC., R.W. MCDONALD & SONS, INC., STEVEN SCHOEFFEL, SKYVIEW DRIVE-IN, LLC, STARLIGHT DRIVE-IN, INC.. (Elliott, Ronald)
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to RACHEL LEVINE, THOMAS W. WOLF (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ma)
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RACHEL LEVINE, THOMAS W. WOLF (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5599356), filed by R.W. MCDONALD & SONS, INC., MIKE GIFFORD, COUNTY OF WASHINGTON, PAUL F. CRAWFORD, TIM BONNER, COUNTY OF BUTLER, MARCI MUSTELLO, MIKE KELLY, CATHY HOSKINS, COUNTY OF FAYETTE, SKYVIEW DRIVE-IN, LLC, NANCY GIFFORD, DARYL METCALFE, PRIMA CAPELLI, INC., STARLIGHT DRIVE-IN, INC., STEVEN SCHOEFFEL, COUNTY OF GREENE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons) (ma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COUNTY OF BUTLER et al v. THOMAS W. WOLF et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.W. MCDONALD & SONS, INC.
Represented By: Thomas W. King, III
Represented By: Jordan P. Shuber
Represented By: Thomas E. Breth
Represented By: Ronald T. Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NANCY GIFFORD
Represented By: Thomas W. King, III
Represented By: Jordan P. Shuber
Represented By: Thomas E. Breth
Represented By: Ronald T. Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COUNTY OF FAYETTE
Represented By: Thomas W. King, III
Represented By: Jordan P. Shuber
Represented By: Thomas E. Breth
Represented By: Ronald T. Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COUNTY OF BUTLER
Represented By: Thomas W. King, III
Represented By: Jordan P. Shuber
Represented By: Thomas E. Breth
Represented By: Ronald T. Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARCI MUSTELLO
Represented By: Thomas W. King, III
Represented By: Jordan P. Shuber
Represented By: Thomas E. Breth
Represented By: Ronald T. Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIKE KELLY
Represented By: Thomas W. King, III
Represented By: Jordan P. Shuber
Represented By: Thomas E. Breth
Represented By: Ronald T. Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STARLIGHT DRIVE-IN, INC.
Represented By: Thomas W. King, III
Represented By: Jordan P. Shuber
Represented By: Thomas E. Breth
Represented By: Ronald T. Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARYL METCALFE
Represented By: Thomas W. King, III
Represented By: Jordan P. Shuber
Represented By: Thomas E. Breth
Represented By: Ronald T. Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIM BONNER
Represented By: Thomas W. King, III
Represented By: Jordan P. Shuber
Represented By: Thomas E. Breth
Represented By: Ronald T. Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIKE GIFFORD
Represented By: Thomas W. King, III
Represented By: Jordan P. Shuber
Represented By: Thomas E. Breth
Represented By: Ronald T. Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PRIMA CAPELLI, INC.
Represented By: Thomas W. King, III
Represented By: Jordan P. Shuber
Represented By: Thomas E. Breth
Represented By: Ronald T. Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COUNTY OF WASHINGTON
Represented By: Thomas W. King, III
Represented By: Jordan P. Shuber
Represented By: Thomas E. Breth
Represented By: Ronald T. Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CATHY HOSKINS
Represented By: Thomas W. King, III
Represented By: Jordan P. Shuber
Represented By: Thomas E. Breth
Represented By: Ronald T. Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COUNTY OF GREENE
Represented By: Thomas W. King, III
Represented By: Jordan P. Shuber
Represented By: Thomas E. Breth
Represented By: Ronald T. Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN SCHOEFFEL
Represented By: Thomas W. King, III
Represented By: Jordan P. Shuber
Represented By: Thomas E. Breth
Represented By: Ronald T. Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL F. CRAWFORD
Represented By: Thomas W. King, III
Represented By: Jordan P. Shuber
Represented By: Thomas E. Breth
Represented By: Ronald T. Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SKYVIEW DRIVE-IN, LLC
Represented By: Thomas W. King, III
Represented By: Jordan P. Shuber
Represented By: Thomas E. Breth
Represented By: Ronald T. Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS W. WOLF
Represented By: Karen Mascio Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RACHEL LEVINE
Represented By: Karen Mascio Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?