BOWSER AUTOMOTIVE, INC. v. CHUBB GROUP OF INSURANCE COMPANIES et al
Plaintiff: BOWSER AUTOMOTIVE, INC.
Defendant: FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY and CHUBB GROUP OF INSURANCE COMPANIES
Case Number: 2:2020cv00747
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cathy Bissoon
Referring Judge: Joy Flowers Conti
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2020 Civil case CLOSED. This case has been voluntarily dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). See Doc. #13 . Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 6/29/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dcd)
June 29, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BOWSER AUTOMOTIVE, INC. (Shub, Jonathan)
June 29, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jonathan Shub (Shub, Jonathan)
June 25, 2020 Filing 11 BRIEF in Support of #10 Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by CHUBB GROUP OF INSURANCE COMPANIES, FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Loffler, Jesse)
June 25, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #8 Motion to Remand, filed by CHUBB GROUP OF INSURANCE COMPANIES, FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Loffler, Jesse)
June 9, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #8 Motion to Remand. ERROR: Proposed Order was made part of main document. CORRECTION: Attorney advised that in future proposed orders are to be made attachments to the main document. This message is for informational purposes only. (jjg)
June 9, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #8 Motion to Remand. ERROR: Document should have been filed as two separate documents. CORRECTION: Attorney advised in future that documents of that nature are to be filed as separate documents. Clerk of Court docketed Brief in Support of Motion. This message is for informational purposes only. (jjg)
June 5, 2020 BRIEF in Support re #8 Motion to Remand filed by BOWSER AUTOMOTIVE, INC. (with document #8) (jjg)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Response re #8 Motion to Remand. Defendants' response is due by 6/25/20. All future motions in this case will be governed by the undersigned's Practices and Procedures (https://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/content/cathy-bissoon-district-judge), and no briefing schedule will issue. If the parties consent to the jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in this case, the parties must file a stipulation consenting to such jurisdiction on or before 6/15/20. If any party declines to consent, no stipulation or other filing is required. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 6/5/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dcd)
June 5, 2020 Filing 8 First MOTION to Remand by BOWSER AUTOMOTIVE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Cooper, Scott)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendants shall have until fourteen (14) days following an order on Plaintiff's anticipated motion for remand to answer, move or respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 6/3/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dcd)
June 3, 2020 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CHUBB GROUP OF INSURANCE COMPANIES, FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Loffler, Jesse)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 5/27/20. (jhi)
May 27, 2020 Judge Cathy Bissoon added. (cmc)
May 27, 2020 Judge Marilyn J. Horan no longer assigned to case. (cmc)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455 the undersigned recuses from this case and the Clerk is directed to reassign this case to another member of the Court. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 5/27/20. (jms)
May 26, 2020 Filing 3 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by CHUBB GROUP OF INSURANCE COMPANIES, FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Loffler, Jesse)
May 26, 2020 Judge Marilyn J. Horan added. (jmm)
May 26, 2020 Judge Joy Flowers Conti no longer assigned to case. (jmm)
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying Chubb INA Holdings Inc., Chubb Group Holdings Inc., Chubb Limited as corporate parent or other affiliate, by FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (ma)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County, case number GD-20-5272 Copies attached: State Court Complaint, Dockets, and Filings (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5624318), filed by FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, CHUBB GROUP OF INSURANCE COMPANIES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A part 1 of 2, #2 Exhibit A part 2 of 2, #3 Exhibit B part 1 of 5, #4 Exhibit B part 2 of 5, #5 Exhibit B part 3 of 5, #6 Exhibit B part 4 of 5, #7 Exhibit B part 5 of 5, #8 Exhibit C, #9 Civil Cover Sheet) (ma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BOWSER AUTOMOTIVE, INC. v. CHUBB GROUP OF INSURANCE COMPANIES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Jesse R. Loffler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHUBB GROUP OF INSURANCE COMPANIES
Represented By: Jesse R. Loffler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOWSER AUTOMOTIVE, INC.
Represented By: John P. Goodrich
Represented By: Jonathan Shub
Represented By: Scott B. Cooper
Represented By: James C. Haggerty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?