CDL NUCLEAR TECHNOLOGIES, INC v. FIVE TOWNS HEART IMAGING MEDICAL, PC
Plaintiff: CDL NUCLEAR TECHNOLOGIES, INC
Defendant: FIVE TOWNS HEART IMAGING MEDICAL, PC and FIVE TOWNS HEART IMAGING PC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00783
Filed: May 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cathy Bissoon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2020 Filing 9 SEALED DOCUMENT by CDL NUCLEAR TECHNOLOGIES, INC. This document Sealed pursuant to 6 Order on Motion for Leave to File Documents Under Seal. (jv)
June 4, 2020 Filing 8 REDACTION Exhibit 1 to Complaint by CDL NUCLEAR TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (Leonard, Roy)
June 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan M. Seigworth on behalf of CDL NUCLEAR TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (Seigworth, Bryan)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting in part #4 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal an Exhibit to the Complaint. Plaintiff may file portions of the turnkey cardiac PET agreement at issue in this case under seal, consistent with In re Avandia Marketing Sales Practices & Products Liability Litigation. See 924 F.3d 662 (3d Cir. 2019) (presumptive right of access to judicial records is overcome by a showing that the type of information sought to be sealed would work a clearly defined and serious injury if disclosed). After receiving notice of this Order, you must provide the sealed document to the Clerk of Court both on paper and on disk, in pdf format. In the alternative, you may contact the Intake Section and make arrangements to email the pdf to the Clerk of Court. The sealed version of the document WILL NOT be docketed by the Clerk of Court until the party electronically files the redacted version of the documents (using Redacted Document event located under Other Documents), unless otherwise ordered by the Court. You are required to serve the sealed document on counsel using traditional service methods. The Court will review Plaintiff's redactions, (presumably those identified in Paragraph 12 of its Motion), and if it finds they are inconsistent with In re Avandia, it may order those portions be disclosed. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 6/1/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (wss)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 6/1/20. (jhi)
June 1, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to File Documents Under Seal by CDL NUCLEAR TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) (Leonard, Roy)
June 1, 2020 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CDL NUCLEAR TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (Leonard, Roy)
June 1, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to FIVE TOWNS HEART IMAGING MEDICAL, PC (jv)
June 1, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Complaint. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 6/8/2020. (jv)
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FIVE TOWNS HEART IMAGING MEDICAL, PC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5644363), filed by CDL NUCLEAR TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Summons as to FIVE TOWNS HEART IMAGING MEDICAL, PC) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CDL NUCLEAR TECHNOLOGIES, INC v. FIVE TOWNS HEART IMAGING MEDICAL, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIVE TOWNS HEART IMAGING MEDICAL, PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIVE TOWNS HEART IMAGING PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CDL NUCLEAR TECHNOLOGIES, INC
Represented By: Bryan M. Seigworth
Represented By: Roy E. Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?