BURK v. GIANT EAGLE, INC.
Plaintiff: OWEN BURK
Defendant: GIANT EAGLE, INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00815
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Nora Barry Fischer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order of Consolidation. This case is consolidated with 2:20-cv-754, the lead case. All pleadings, Motions and other papers hereafter filed shall be filed at 2:20-cv-754. The Clerk of Court shall mark this case closed Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 6/17/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cjo)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (Details more fully stated in said order). Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 6/4/20. (cjo)
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (cjo)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by OWEN BURK. GIANT EAGLE, INC. waiver sent on 6/4/2020, answer due 8/3/2020. (Anderson, Thomas)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GIANT EAGLE, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5657716), filed by OWEN BURK. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (elt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BURK v. GIANT EAGLE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GIANT EAGLE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OWEN BURK
Represented By: Thomas B. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?