SMARRA v. BOILERMAKER-BLACKSMITH NATIONAL PENSION TRUST et al
Plaintiff: SEAN SMARRA
Defendant: MICHAEL G. MORASH, BOILERMAKER-BLACKSMITH NATIONAL PENSION TRUST, DAVID J. ZACH, SCOTT ANDERSON, ROBERT LUNSFORD, JR., LARRY JANSEN, CHARLES HANCOCK, MARK VANDIVER, J. TOM BACA, JEFF BROWN, ERIC A. HEUSER, JOHN J. SKERMONT, LAWRENCE MCMANAMON, WARREN FAIRLEY, D. DAVID HAGGERTY, JR., JAMES PRESSLEY, TERRY ANCEL, RONNIE L. TRAXLER and ROBERT D. HUTSELL
Case Number: 2:2020cv00860
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: William S Stickman
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1104
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to TERRY ANCEL, SCOTT ANDERSON, J. TOM BACA, BOILERMAKER-BLACKSMITH NATIONAL PENSION TRUST, JEFF BROWN, WARREN FAIRLEY, D. DAVID HAGGERTY, JR, CHARLES HANCOCK, ERIC A. HEUSER, ROBERT D. HUTSELL, LARRY JANSEN, ROBERT LUNSFORD, JR, LAWRENCE MCMANAMON, MICHAEL G. MORASH, JAMES PRESSLEY, JOHN J. SKERMONT, RONNIE L. TRAXLER, MARK VANDIVER, DAVID J. ZACH (sdp)
June 17, 2020 Filing 3 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by SEAN SMARRA (Attachments: #1 Summons -Trust, #2 Summons -Trustees, #3 Summons -Ancel, #4 Summons -Anderson, #5 Summons -Baca, #6 Summons -Brown, #7 Summons -Fairley, #8 Summons -Haggerty, #9 Summons -Hancock, #10 Summons -Heuser, #11 Summons -Hutsell, #12 Summons -Jansen, #13 Summons -Lunsford, #14 Summons -McManamon, #15 Summons -Morash, #16 Summons -Pressley, #17 Summons -Skermont, #18 Summons -Traxler, #19 Summons -Vandiver, #20 Summons -Zach) (Balzarini, Michael)
June 16, 2020 Filing 2 ***ERROR - SUMMONS IMPROPERLY FORMATTED FOR ISSUE - ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE*** PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by SEAN SMARRA (Attachments: #1 Summons -Trust, #2 Summons -Bd of Trustees, #3 Summons -Ancel, #4 Summons -Anderson, #5 Summons -Baca, #6 Summons -Brown, #7 Summons -Fairley, #8 Summons Haggerty, #9 Summons -Hancock, #10 Summons -Heuser, #11 Summons -Hutsell, #12 Summons -Jansen, #13 Summons -Lunsford, #14 Summons -McManamon, #15 Summons -Morash, #16 Summons -Pressley, #17 Summons -Skremont, #18 Summons -Traxler, #19 Summons -Vandiver, #20 Summons -Zach) (Balzarini, Michael) Modified on 6/17/2020 (jjg).
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TERRY ANCEL, SCOTT ANDERSON, J. TOM BACA, BOILERMAKER-BLACKSMITH NATIONAL PENSION TRUST, JEFF BROWN, WARREN FAIRLEY, D. DAVID HAGGERTY, JR, CHARLES HANCOCK, ERIC A. HEUSER, ROBERT D. HUTSELL, LARRY JANSEN, ROBERT LUNSFORD, JR, LAWRENCE MCMANAMON, MICHAEL G. MORASH, JAMES PRESSLEY, JOHN J. SKERMONT, RONNIE L. TRAXLER, MARK VANDIVER, DAVID J. ZACH (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-567932), filed by SEAN SMARRA. (jd) Modified on 6/16/2020 (eca). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jd). Modified on 6/18/2020, to correct data entry error (jd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMARRA v. BOILERMAKER-BLACKSMITH NATIONAL PENSION TRUST et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL G. MORASH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOILERMAKER-BLACKSMITH NATIONAL PENSION TRUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID J. ZACH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT ANDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT LUNSFORD, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LARRY JANSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES HANCOCK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK VANDIVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. TOM BACA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFF BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC A. HEUSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN J. SKERMONT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAWRENCE MCMANAMON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARREN FAIRLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. DAVID HAGGERTY, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES PRESSLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERRY ANCEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONNIE L. TRAXLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT D. HUTSELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEAN SMARRA
Represented By: Michael Balzarini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?