GENERAL NUTRITION CORPORATION v. PET SMART, INC.
Plaintiff: GENERAL NUTRITION CORPORATION
Defendant: PET SMART, INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00935
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Nora Barry Fischer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to PET SMART, INC. (elt)
July 23, 2020 Filing 10 PRAECIPE to Reissue Summons by GENERAL NUTRITION CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Jacobs, Katie)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Peter J. Ennis terminated as counsel for GNC. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 7/10/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdk)
July 10, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Fridrikh V. Shrayber on behalf of GENERAL NUTRITION CORPORATION. (Shrayber, Fridrikh)
July 10, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by GENERAL NUTRITION CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ennis, Peter)
July 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Katie R. Jacobs on behalf of GENERAL NUTRITION CORPORATION. (Jacobs, Katie)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 7/6/20. (cjo)
July 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (cjo)
June 24, 2020 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement identifying GNC Holdings, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by GENERAL NUTRITION CORPORATION. (Ennis, Peter)
June 24, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 7/1/2020. (elt)
June 24, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to PET SMART, INC. (elt)
June 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PET SMART, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5708010), filed by GENERAL NUTRITION CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (elt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GENERAL NUTRITION CORPORATION v. PET SMART, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PET SMART, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GENERAL NUTRITION CORPORATION
Represented By: Peter J. Ennis
Represented By: Katie R. Jacobs
Represented By: Fridrikh V. Shrayber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?