THAR PROCESS, INC. v. SOUND WELLNESS, LLC
Plaintiff: THAR PROCESS, INC.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: SOUND WELLNESS, LLC
3Rd Party Defendant: PLANT SCIENCE LABORATORIES, LLC and MICHAEL BARNHART
Case Number: 2:2020cv00945
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Marilyn J Horan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Filing 28 BRIEF in Support re #27 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by THAR PROCESS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Sturm, Kerri)
August 19, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by THAR PROCESS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Conferral, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Proposed Order) (Sturm, Kerri)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Third-party Defendant Plant Science Laboratories shall respond to the Third-Party Complaint by 9/2/20. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 8/13/20. (jms)
August 12, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 Third Party Complaint, by PLANT SCIENCE LABORATORIES, LLC. (Agresti, Michael)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ORDER, in light of the #23 Amended Counterclaim filed by Defendant Sound Wellness, Plaintiff's #19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM is denied as moot. Plaintiff shall respond to the Amended Counterclaim in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 8/12/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jms)
August 5, 2020 Filing 23 AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM against THAR PROCESS, INC.., filed by SOUND WELLNESS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Payne, Matthew)
July 29, 2020 Filing 22 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by SOUND WELLNESS, LLC. MICHAEL BARNHART served on 7/22/2020, answer due 8/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Payne, Matthew)
July 29, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by SOUND WELLNESS, LLC. PLANT SCIENCE LABORATORIES, LLC served on 7/22/2020, answer due 8/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Payne, Matthew)
July 22, 2020 Filing 20 BRIEF in Support re #19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by THAR PROCESS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Sturm, Kerri)
July 22, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by THAR PROCESS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Conferral, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Proposed Order) (Sturm, Kerri)
July 22, 2020 Filing 18 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by THAR PROCESS, INC.. (Sturm, Kerri)
July 22, 2020 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to MICHAEL BARNHART (ma)
July 22, 2020 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to PLANT SCIENCE LABORATORIES, LLC (ma)
July 21, 2020 Filing 15 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by SOUND WELLNESS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Payne, Matthew)
July 21, 2020 Filing 14 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by SOUND WELLNESS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Payne, Matthew)
July 15, 2020 Filing 10 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against PLANT SCIENCE LABORATORIES, LLC, MICHAEL BARNHART, filed by SOUND WELLNESS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (Payne, Matthew)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Appearance by Richard L. Holzworth filed by SOUND WELLNESS, LLC. Attorney Richard L. Holzworth terminated. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 7/9/20. (jms)
July 8, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Appearance by Richard L. Holzworth by SOUND WELLNESS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Payne, Matthew)
July 8, 2020 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement identifying Jushi Holdings, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by SOUND WELLNESS, LLC. (Payne, Matthew)
July 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew S. Payne on behalf of SOUND WELLNESS, LLC. (Payne, Matthew)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 7/7/2020. (jgb)
July 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kerri Coriston Sturm on behalf of THAR PROCESS, INC.. (Sturm, Kerri)
July 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by James M Berent on behalf of THAR PROCESS, INC.. (Berent, James)
July 6, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 7/13/2020. (elt)
July 1, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against THAR PROCESS, INC. by SOUND WELLNESS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Holzworth, Richard)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny, case number GD No.: 20-005996 (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5712354), filed by SOUND WELLNESS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (elt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THAR PROCESS, INC. v. SOUND WELLNESS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THAR PROCESS, INC.
Represented By: James M Berent
Represented By: Kerri Coriston Sturm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: SOUND WELLNESS, LLC
Represented By: Richard L. Holzworth
Represented By: Matthew S. Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: PLANT SCIENCE LABORATORIES, LLC
Represented By: Michael A. Agresti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: MICHAEL BARNHART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?