MARTINCIC et al v. A.O. SMITH CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: MERL WILLIAMS and DAVID MARTINCIC
Defendant: YUBA HEAT TRANSFER LLC, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, MW CUSTOM PAPERS, LLC, NORTH AMERICAN MANUFACTURING CO., BRAND INSULATIONS, INC., BW/IP, INC., UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION, SWINDELL-DRESSLER INTERNATIONAL COMPANY, COST COMPANY, SEALING SPECIALISTS & SERVICE CO., NOOTER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, LLC, ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS INC., CASHCO, INC., RILEY POWER, INC., APPLIED INDUSTRIAL TECHNOLOGIES, INC., ATWOOD & MORRILL CO., INC., FLOWSERVE CORPORATION, CLYDE UNION, INC., HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC., SANTA FE BRAUN, INC., ECODYNE CORPORATION, GRINNELL, LLC, BMI REFRACTORY SERVICES, INC., CARVER PUMP COMPANY, MAGNETEK, INC., ITT INDUSTRIES, INC., MCCARLS, INC., CLEAVER-BROOKS, BURNHAM LLC, CATERPILLAR, INC., SPX FLOW US, LLC, LINDBERG MPH, WYETH HOLDINGS CORPORATION, CBS CORPORATION, VELAN VALVE CORPORATION, YORK INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, THE LINTERN CORPORATION, VIKING PUMP, INC., ABB, INC., DRAVO CORPORATION, ALFA LAVAL, INC., SPIRAX SARCO, INC., ELLIOTT COMPANY, INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION, INDUCTOTHERM INDUSTRIES, INC., MCMASTER CARR SUPPLY, HAMWORTHY PEABODY COMBUSTION, INC., SEAL & DESIGN HIGBEE, INC., THE GORMAN-RUPP COMPANY, WTI RUST HOLDINGS, INC., WHEELABRATOR AIR POLLUTION CONTROL, INC., MINE SAFETY APPLIANCES COMPANY, SUNBEAM PRODUCTS, INC., OSRAM SYLVANIA, INC., AMETEK, INC., GOULD ELECTRONICS, INC., BLUE M. CORPORATION, GENUINE PARTS COMPANY, CARRIER CORPORATION, ATLAS INDUSTRIES, INC., A.R. WIFLEY & SONS, INC., WASHINGTON GROUP INTERNATIONAL, FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC., ERIKS NORTH AMERICA, SIMAKAS COMPANY, INC., BECHTEL CORPORATION, RUST ENGINEERING & CONSTRUCTION, INC., URBAN REDEVELOPMENT AUTHORITY OF PITTSBURGH, GOULDS PUMP, LLC, FLOWSERVE US, INC., BRIDGEVILLE AUTO PARTS, INC., BAKER HUGHES, WEST END CONTRACTING CORPORATION, COLUMBUS MCKINNON CORPORATION, HAMMOND VALVE COMPANY, LINDBERG, ALLEGHENY COUNTY, WARREN PUMPS, LLC, POWER PIPING COMPANY, PLASTICS ENGINEERING COMPANY, MUELLER STEAM SPECIALTY, CHICAGO PNEUMATIC TOOL COMPANY, LLC, MET-PRO CORPORATION, FOSTER WHEELER, LLC, GARDNER DENVER, INC., BEAZER EAST INC., ALLEGHENY COUNTY AIRPORT AUTHORITY, WT/HRC CORPORATION, EICHLEAY CORPORATION, MCNEIL (OHIO) CORPORATION, AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, PFAUDLER, INC., AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION, INC., MORGAN ENGINEERING SYSTEMS, INC., INDUSTRIAL RUBBER PRODUCTS, JOY GLOBAL UNDERGROUND MINING, LLC, WHEELING RUBBER PRODUCTS, INC., WEIL-MCLAIN COMPANY, THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY, AMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, EVOQUA WATER TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, ALLIED GLOVE CORPORATION, J.M. FOSTER, INC., ALCOA, INC., HUNTER SALES CORPORATION, I.U. NORTH AMERICA, INC., AURORA PUMPS, JOY GLOBAL SURFACE MINING, INC., AIRTEK, INC., HONEYWELL, INC., CRANE COMPANY, INC., METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, SPX COOLING TECHNOLOGIES, INC., TUTHILL CORPORATION, TENOVA INC., THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY, FMC CORPORATION, REUNION INDUSTRIES, INC., DONALD MCKAY SMITH, INC., SURFACE COMBUSTION, MCJUNKIN REDMAN CORPORATION, ERIE IRON CITY WORKS, INGERSOLL-RAND CORPORATION, NORTEK GLOBAL HVAC, LLC, MCWANE, INC., UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION, ROBINSON FANS, INC., STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS (USA), LLC, DICK CORPORATION, JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC., SAINT-GOBAIN ABRASIVES, INC., READING CRANE AND ENGINEERING COMPANY, THE NASH ENGINEERING COMPANY, ROBBINS & MYERS, INC., COST MANAGEMENT, LLC, SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC., A.O. SMITH CORPORATION, SAUER, INC., GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, DEZURIK, INC., BLOOM ENGINEERING COMPANY, INC., ARMSTRONG PUMPS, INC., OCEAN VIEW CAPITAL, M.S. JACOBS & ASSOCIATES, INC., TRANE U.S. INC., MOYNO, INC., ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC., MILWAUKEE VALVE COMPANY, LLC, DAP, INC., FLSMIDTH, INC., BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC, CLARK RELIANCE CORPORATION, RESEARCH-COTTRELL, INC., HOWDEN NORTH AMERICA, INC., GG OF FLORIDA, INC., SULZER PUMPS SOLUTIONS, INC., SUNDYNE, LLC, GREENE TWEED & COMPANY, FLUOR CORPORATION, PROCESS VALVE & EQUIPMENT CO., CARMEUSE LIME, INC., MEAD, CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION, RESCO HOLDINGS, LLC, EATON CORPORATION, RCH NEW CO. II LLC, NOOTER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, IMO INDUSTRIES, INC., ZURN INDUSTRIES, THE RUST ENGINEERING COMPANY, P&H MINING EQUIPMENT, COST CORPORATION, FLOWSERVE FSD CORP., Successor to Valtek International, CORE FURNACE SYSTEMS CORP., as Successor-in-interest to Salem Furnace Company, HARNISCHFEGER CORPORATION, MRC GLOBAL (US), INC., FULLER COMPANY, ROBERTSON CECO CORPORATION, an alleged successor to H.H. Robertson Company, GD-TEK, INC., NAGLE PUMPS, INC., WHITING CORPORATION, ATWOOD & MORRILL CO., INC. doing business as WEIR VALVES AND CONTROLS USA, INC., DURIRON COMPANY, INC., ALLIED SIGNAL, INC., as successor-in-interest to the Bendix Corporation, ALUMINUM COMPANY OF AMERICA, TRIANGLE PWC, INC., RAYTHEON ENGINEERS AND CONSTRUCTORS, INC., and all Its domestic subsidiaries including The Badger Company, Inc., THE MARLEY COOLING TOWER COMPANY, TRECO CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, AMERICAN STANDARD CORPORATION, SQUARE D COMPANY, HOWDEN BUFFALO, INC., AMERICAN CYANAMID, DEVALCO CORPORATION, INC., CATALYTIC CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, AJAX MAGNETHERMIC CORPORATION, DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION, TENOVA CORE INC., AQUA-CHEM, MET-PRO CORPORATION and its Dean Pump brand, d/b/a Met-Pro Global Pump Solutions, RILEY STOKER CORPORATION, CARBORUNDUM CORPORATION, AHLSTROM PUMPS, LLC, MARLEY COOLING TECHNOLOGIES, INC., JOY TECHNOLOGIES, INC., URS ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION, INC., IMO DELAVAL, INC., CLYDE UNION, INC. doing business as CLYDE UNION PUMPS, Individually and as successor-by-merger to Union Pump Company, MINNOTTE CONTRACTING CORPORATION, ELLIOTT TURBOMACHINERY CO., TECHINT TECHNOLOGIES, INC., WCI OUTDOOR PRODUCTS, INC., COOPER CAMERON CORPORATION, METROPOLITAN INSURANCE COMPANY, AMERICAN RADIATOR & STANDARD SANITARY, in its own right and as Successor to Westinghouse Airbrake and, The Gage Company, formerly known as Pittsburgh Gage and Supply Company, VIACOM, INC., as Successor by Merger to CBS Corp, f, NORTON COMPANY, DELAVAL TURBINE, INC. and MARLEY-WYLAIN COMPANY
Cross Defendant: I.U. NORTH AMERICAN, INC., ALCOA, INC, TRECO CONSTRUCTION SERVICES, INC., DELAVAL TURBINE, INC, HOWDEN BUFFALO, INC, ROBBINS & MYERS, INC and ERIE CITY IRON WORKS
Case Number: 2:2020cv00958
Filed: June 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
Presiding Judge: Joy Flowers Conti
Referring Judge: William S Stickman
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2020 Filing 467 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon J. Verdream on behalf of ALLEGHENY COUNTY AIRPORT AUTHORITY. (Verdream, Brandon)
October 22, 2020 Record complete for Appeal purposes. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified copy of the docket entries. (ma)
October 19, 2020 Filing 466 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST re #464 Notice of Appeal, by FOSTER WHEELER, LLC. Transcripts ordered: None. (Wolford, Dennis) Modified on 10/22/2020 (ma).
October 19, 2020 Filing 465 USCA Case Number 20-3068 for #464 Notice of Appeal, filed by FOSTER WHEELER, LLC. USCA Case Manager James (DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED AND CAN ONLY BE VIEWED BY COURT STAFF) (jk3)
October 8, 2020 Filing 464 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #463 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court by FOSTER WHEELER, LLC. Filing fee $505, receipt number APAWDC-5979702. Certificate of Appealability n/a. Court Reporter(s): n/a. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. The Transcript Purchase Order form will NOT be mailed to the parties. The form is available on the Court's internet site. (Wolford, Dennis)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 463 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion to Remand to State Court. This matter is REMANDED back to the Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 10/01/20. (eca)
October 1, 2020 Filing 462 MEMORANDUM OPINION on #3 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 10/01/20. (eca)
September 10, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #69 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 9/17/2020. (ma)
September 10, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #459 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 9/17/2020. (ma)
September 8, 2020 Filing 461 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by GG OF FLORIDA, INC.. (Schollaert, John)
September 8, 2020 Filing 460 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by GG OF FLORIDA, INC.. (Schollaert, John)
September 2, 2020 Filing 459 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Answers to Cross Claims, and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by MARLEY-WYLAIN COMPANY. (Jones, Christopher)
September 2, 2020 Filing 458 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by FLOWSERVE U.S., INC. (FLOWSERVE CORPORATION f/k/a Durametallic Corporation). (Cochran, Melissa) Modified on 9/3/2020 (ma).
September 2, 2020 Filing 457 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Cross Claim and Answer to Cross Claims by FLOWSERVE U.S., INC. (FLOWSERVE CORPORATION f/k/a Durametallic Corporation). (Cochran, Melissa) Modified on 9/3/2020 (ma).
September 2, 2020 Filing 456 Disclosure Statement identifying Rexnord LLC as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ZURN INDUSTRIES. (Miller, Edward)
September 2, 2020 Filing 455 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Cross Claim and Answer to Cross Claims by ZURN INDUSTRIES. (Miller, Edward)
September 2, 2020 Filing 454 Disclosure Statement identifying Ingersoll Rand Inc. and KKR & Co. L.P. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by GARDNER DENVER, INC.. (Miller, Edward)
September 2, 2020 Filing 453 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Cross Claim and Answer to Cross Claims by GARDNER DENVER, INC.. (Miller, Edward)
September 2, 2020 Filing 452 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by FLOWSERVE CORPORATION f/k/a Duriron Company, Inc. (Cochran, Melissa) Modified on 9/3/2020 (ma).
September 2, 2020 Filing 451 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Cross Claim and Answer to Cross Claims by FLOWSERVE CORPORATION f/k/a Duriron Company, Inc. (Cochran, Melissa) Modified on 9/3/2020 (ma).
September 2, 2020 Filing 450 Disclosure Statement identifying Carrier Global Corp. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CARRIER CORPORATION. (Cochran, Melissa)
September 2, 2020 Filing 449 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Cross Claim and Answer to Cross Claims by CARRIER CORPORATION. (Cochran, Melissa)
August 31, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #436 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Signature on document and filer do not match. CORRECTION: Attorney advised of signature requirements. Attorney to resubmit the document using the Errata event. (ma)
August 31, 2020 Filing 448 Disclosure Statement identifying Carmeuse Americas Holdings sprl and Carmeuse Americas sprl as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CARMEUSE LIME, INC.. (Gordon, Cathy)
August 31, 2020 Filing 447 NOTICE of Appearance by Cathy R. Gordon on behalf of CARMEUSE LIME, INC. (Gordon, Cathy) Modified on 9/3/2020 (ma).
August 31, 2020 Filing 446 Disclosure Statement identifying DRAVO 2018, INC. and CARMEUSE LIME, INC. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by DRAVO CORPORATION. (Gordon, Cathy) Modified on 9/3/2020 (ma).
August 28, 2020 Filing 445 Disclosure Statement identifying Komatsu Mining Corp. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by JOY GLOBAL UNDERGROUND MINING, LLC. (Miller, Edward)
August 28, 2020 Filing 444 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Cross Claim and Answer to Cross Claims by JOY GLOBAL UNDERGROUND MINING, LLC. (Miller, Edward)
August 28, 2020 Filing 443 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Answer to Crossclaims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by YORK INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION. (Arthur, Aaron)
August 28, 2020 Filing 442 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Answer to Crossclaims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC.. (Arthur, Aaron)
August 28, 2020 Filing 441 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Answer to Crossclaims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by ITT INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Arthur, Aaron)
August 28, 2020 Filing 440 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Answer to Crossclaims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by GRINNELL, LLC. (Arthur, Aaron)
August 28, 2020 Filing 439 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Answer to Crossclaims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by GOULDS PUMP, LLC. (Arthur, Aaron)
August 28, 2020 Filing 438 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Answer to Crossclaims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by ELLIOTT COMPANY. (Arthur, Aaron)
August 28, 2020 Filing 437 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Answer to Crossclaims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by SANTA FE BRAUN, INC.(individually and as successor to CF Braun & Co.). (Arthur, Aaron)
August 25, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #412 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #414 Answer to Crossclaim, #418 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim,. ERROR: Typed name omitted by s/. CORRECTION: Attorney advised of signature requirements. Attorney to resubmit with signature, using Errata event. CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #414 . ERROR: Incorrect document attached. Attached document is a duplicate of #412 CORRECTION: Attorney advised to refile the document, using the Errata event and attach the correct document. (ma)
August 25, 2020 Filing 436 NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Schollaert on behalf of GG OF FLORIDA, INC.. (Schollaert, John)
August 20, 2020 Filing 435 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, and Answer to Crossclaims, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION. (Koch, Nicholas)
August 19, 2020 Filing 434 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by PLASTICS ENGINEERING COMPANY. (Watson, Jennifer) Modified on 8/25/2020 (ma).
August 19, 2020 Filing 433 PLASTICS ENGINEERING COMPANY ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by PLASTICS ENGINEERING COMPANY. (Watson, Jennifer)
August 19, 2020 Filing 432 Disclosure Statement identifying VIKING PUMP, INC. as corporate parent or other affiliate,. (Watson, Jennifer)
August 19, 2020 Filing 431 VIKING PUMP, INC. ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by VIKING PUMP, INC.. (Watson, Jennifer)
August 19, 2020 Filing 430 Baker Hughes Holdings LLC (incorrectly identified as Baker Hughes, a GE Company, LLC) ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by BAKER HUGHES(a GE Company, LLC). (Keating, Philip)
August 19, 2020 Filing 429 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip P. Keating on behalf of BAKER HUGHES(a GE Company, LLC). (Keating, Philip)
August 19, 2020 Filing 428 Disclosure Statement identifying Baker Hughes Company and General Electric Company as corporate parent or other affiliate, by BAKER HUGHES(a GE Company, LLC). (Keating, Philip)
August 19, 2020 Filing 427 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by RCH NEW CO. II LLC. (Watson, Jennifer) Modified on 8/25/2020 (ma).
August 19, 2020 Filing 426 RCH NEWCO II, LLC, formerly known as Robertson Ceco Corporation, an alleged successor to H.H. Robertson Company ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by CHICAGO PNEUMATIC TOOL COMPANY, LLC. (Watson, Jennifer)
August 19, 2020 Filing 425 Disclosure Statement identifying Saint-Gobain Delaware Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate, by SAINT-GOBAIN ABRASIVES, INC.. (Watson, Jennifer) Modified on 8/25/2020 (ma).
August 19, 2020 Filing 424 SAINT-GOBAIN ABRASIVES, INC., f/k/a Norton Company ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by SAINT-GOBAIN ABRASIVES, INC.. (Watson, Jennifer)
August 19, 2020 Filing 423 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by MILWAUKEE VALVE COMPANY, LLC. (Watson, Jennifer) Modified on 8/25/2020 (ma).
August 19, 2020 Filing 422 Milwaukee Valve Company, Inc. n/k/a Milwaukee Valve Company, LLC ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by MCCARLS, INC.. (Watson, Jennifer)
August 19, 2020 Filing 421 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by MCCARLS, INC.. (Watson, Jennifer) Modified on 8/25/2020 (ma).
August 19, 2020 Filing 420 McCarl's, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by MCCARLS, INC.. (Watson, Jennifer)
August 19, 2020 Filing 419 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by I.U. NORTH AMERICA, INC., as successor by merger to The Garp Company, f/k/a The Gage Company, f/k/a Pittsburgh Gage and Supply Company. (Watson, Jennifer) Modified on 8/25/2020 (ma).
August 19, 2020 Filing 418 I.U. NORTH AMERICA, INC., as successor by merger to The Garp Company, f/k/a The Gage Company, f/k/a Pittsburgh Gage and Supply Company ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by I.U. NORTH AMERICA, INC.(as successor by merger to The Garp Company, formerly known as The Gage Company, formerly known as Pittsburgh Gage and Supply Company). (Watson, Jennifer)
August 19, 2020 Filing 417 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by DAP, INC.. (Watson, Jennifer) Modified on 8/25/2020 (ma).
August 19, 2020 Filing 416 DAP, INC. k/n/a LA MIRADA PRODUCTS CO., INC. ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by DAP, INC.. (Watson, Jennifer)
August 19, 2020 Filing 415 Disclosure Statement identifying AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO BUFFALO PUMPS, INC. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION. (Watson, Jennifer)
August 19, 2020 Filing 413 Disclosure Statement identifying HOWMET AEROSPACE INC. F/K/A ARCONIC INC. F/K/A ALCOA INC., as corporate parent or other affiliate,. (Watson, Jennifer)
August 19, 2020 Filing 412 HOWMET AEROSPACE INC. F/K/A ARCONIC INC. F/K/A ALCOA INC., ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by ALCOA, INC. (Watson, Jennifer)
August 18, 2020 Filing 411 Disclosure Statement identifying Schneider Electric Holdings, Inc., Schneider Electric Industries SAS, Schneider Electric Holding Amerique du Nord, and Schneider Electric SE as corporate parents by SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC. formerly known as Square D Company. (Saunders, Tausha) Modified on 8/19/2020 (ma).
August 17, 2020 Filing 410 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Zukowski on behalf of SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC. (Zukowski, Michael) Modified on 8/18/2020 (ma).
August 14, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #395 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 8/21/2020. (ma)
August 14, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re 389 Notice of Appearance, 390 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: The documents at 389 and 390 are duplicates of #376 and #373 respectively. CORRECTION: Duplicate documents removed from public view. These submissions will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This message is for informational purposes only. (ma)
August 14, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re 388 Notice of Appearance,. ERROR: Documents at #374 and 388 are duplicates. CORRECTION: Duplicate document 388 removed from public view. These submissions will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This message is for informational purposes only. (ma)
August 14, 2020 Filing 409 Disclosure Statement identifying Johnson Controls International plc successor to Tyco International Ltd. as corporate parent, Dodge & Cox as other affiliate, by YORK INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION. (Arthur, Aaron) Modified on 8/17/2020 (ma).
August 14, 2020 Filing 408 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Arthur on behalf of YORK INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION. (Arthur, Aaron)
August 14, 2020 Filing 407 Disclosure Statement identifying Johnson Controls International plc f/k/a Tyco International plc as corporate parent, Dodge & Cox as other affiliate, by JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC.. (Arthur, Aaron) Modified on 8/17/2020 (ma).
August 14, 2020 Filing 406 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Arthur on behalf of JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC.. (Arthur, Aaron)
August 14, 2020 Filing 405 Disclosure Statement identifying ITT Inc. as corporate parent, The Vanguard Group as other affiliate, by ITT INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Arthur, Aaron) Modified on 8/17/2020 (ma).
August 14, 2020 Filing 404 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Arthur on behalf of ITT INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Arthur, Aaron)
August 14, 2020 Filing 403 Disclosure Statement identifying Johnson Controls International plc f/k/a Tyco International plc as corporate parent, Dodge & Cox as other affiliate, by GRINNELL, LLC. (Arthur, Aaron) Modified on 8/17/2020 (ma).
August 14, 2020 Filing 402 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Arthur on behalf of GRINNELL, LLC. (Arthur, Aaron)
August 14, 2020 Filing 401 Disclosure Statement identifying ITT Inc. as corporate parent, The Vanguard Group as other affiliate, by GOULDS PUMP, LLC. (Arthur, Aaron) Modified on 8/17/2020 (ma).
August 14, 2020 Filing 400 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Arthur on behalf of GOULDS PUMP, LLC. (Arthur, Aaron)
August 14, 2020 Filing 399 Disclosure Statement identifying Elliott Group Holdings, Inc.; Ebara Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ELLIOTT COMPANY. (Arthur, Aaron)
August 14, 2020 Filing 398 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Arthur on behalf of ELLIOTT COMPANY. (Arthur, Aaron)
August 14, 2020 Filing 397 Disclosure Statement identifying 15375 Memorial Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate, by SANTA FE BRAUN, INC.(individually and as successor to CF Braun & Co.). (Arthur, Aaron)
August 14, 2020 Filing 396 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Arthur on behalf of SANTA FE BRAUN, INC.(individually and as successor to CF Braun & Co.). (Arthur, Aaron)
August 13, 2020 Filing 395 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, First CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Affirmative Defenses and Cross-Claims against All Defendants by SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC.. (Saunders, Tausha)
August 13, 2020 Filing 394 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM Reply to Crossclaims against All Defendants by INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION. (Schaper, Joseph)
August 13, 2020 Filing 393 Disclosure Statement identifying Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate by INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION (Schaper, Joseph) Modified on 8/14/2020 (ma).
August 13, 2020 Filing 391 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph R. Schaper on behalf of INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION. (Schaper, Joseph) Modified on 8/14/2020 (ma).
August 12, 2020 Filing 387 Disclosure Statement identifying Carmeuse Lime, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by DRAVO CORPORATION. (Gordon, Cathy)
August 12, 2020 Filing 386 NOTICE of Appearance by Cathy R. Gordon on behalf of DRAVO CORPORATION. (Gordon, Cathy)
August 11, 2020 Filing 385 Disclosure Statement identifying Schlumberger BV and Schlumberger Limited as corporate parent or other affiliate by CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION. (Koch, Nicholas) Modified on 8/14/2020 (ma).
August 11, 2020 Filing 384 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas J. Koch on behalf of CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION. (Koch, Nicholas) Modified on 8/14/2020 (ma).
August 11, 2020 Filing 383 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate by SEALING SPECIALISTS & SERVICE CO. (Geis, Dennis) Modified on 8/14/2020 (ma).
August 11, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #370 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #367 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 8/18/2020. (ma)
August 11, 2020 Filing 382 ANSWER to #9 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim and All Present and Future Crossclaims by SEALING SPECIALISTS & SERVICE CO.. (Geis, Dennis)
August 11, 2020 Filing 381 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer E. Watson on behalf of ALCOA, INC. (Watson, Jennifer) Modified on 8/14/2020 (ma).
August 11, 2020 Filing 380 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer E. Watson on behalf of MILWAUKEE VALVE COMPANY, LLC. (Watson, Jennifer)
August 11, 2020 Filing 379 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer E. Watson on behalf of PLASTICS ENGINEERING COMPANY. (Watson, Jennifer) Modified on 8/14/2020 (ma).
August 11, 2020 Filing 378 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer E. Watson on behalf of VIKING PUMP, INC. (Watson, Jennifer) Modified on 8/14/2020 (ma).
August 11, 2020 Filing 377 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer E. Watson on behalf of SAINT-GOBAIN ABRASIVES, INC.. (Watson, Jennifer)
August 11, 2020 Filing 376 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer E. Watson on behalf of AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION. (Watson, Jennifer) Modified on 8/14/2020 (ma).
August 11, 2020 Filing 375 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer E. Watson on behalf of DAP, INC.. (Watson, Jennifer)
August 11, 2020 Filing 374 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer E. Watson on behalf of I.U. NORTH AMERICA, INC. (Watson, Jennifer) Modified on 8/14/2020 (ma).
August 11, 2020 Filing 373 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer E. Watson on behalf of MCCARL'S, INC. (Watson, Jennifer) Modified on 8/14/2020 (ma).
August 11, 2020 Filing 372 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis J. Geis, Jr. on behalf of SEALING SPECIALISTS & SERVICE CO. (Geis, Dennis) Modified on 8/14/2020 (ma).
August 11, 2020 Filing 371 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by EATON CORPORATION(as successor-in-interest to Cutler-Hammer, Inc., n/k/a/ Eaton Electrical Inc.) Answer due from EATON CORPORATION(as successor-in-interest to Cutler-Hammer, Inc., n/k/a/ Eaton Electrical Inc.) on 8/11/2020. (Margolin, Erin) Modified on 8/24/2020 (ept).
August 11, 2020 Filing 370 Eaton Corporation ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, First CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Affirmative Defenses and Cross-Claims against All Defendants by EATON CORPORATION(as successor-in-interest to Cutler-Hammer, Inc., n/k/a/ Eaton Electrical Inc.). (Margolin, Erin)
August 10, 2020 Filing 369 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Margolin on behalf of EATON CORPORATION. (Margolin, Erin) Modified on 8/11/2020 (ma).
August 10, 2020 Filing 368 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by ECODYNE CORPORATION Answer due from ECODYNE CORPORATION on 8/11/2020. (Margolin, Erin)
August 10, 2020 Filing 367 Ecodyne Corporation ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, First CROSSCLAIM and Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Cross-Claims against All Defendants by ECODYNE CORPORATION. (Margolin, Erin)
August 10, 2020 Filing 366 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Margolin on behalf of ECODYNE CORPORATION. (Margolin, Erin)
August 10, 2020 Filing 365 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer Answer due from MCWANE, INC. on 8/11/2020. (Margolin, Erin)
August 10, 2020 Filing 364 Def Manchester Tank, div. of McWane's ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, First CROSSCLAIM and Answer and Affiirmative Defenses to All Cross-Claims against All Defendants by MCWANE, INC.. (Margolin, Erin)
August 10, 2020 Filing 363 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by MCWANE, INC.. (Margolin, Erin)
August 10, 2020 Filing 362 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Margolin on behalf of MCWANE, INC.. (Margolin, Erin)
August 6, 2020 Filing 361 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and answer to all Crossclaims against All Defendants by FLOWSERVE US, INC.. (Turlik, John)
August 6, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #323 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 8/13/2020. (ma)
August 4, 2020 Filing 360 Fluor Constructors International, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Crossclaims against All Defendants by FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL. (Petrina, Joseph)
August 4, 2020 Filing 359 Disclosure Statement identifying Fluor Corporation, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL. (Petrina, Joseph)
August 4, 2020 Filing 358 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph R. Petrina on behalf of FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL. (Petrina, Joseph)
August 4, 2020 Filing 357 ANSWER to Complaint with affirmative defenses, answer to all crossclaims, jury demand, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by NORTEK GLOBAL HVAC, LLC(as successor by merger to Reznor, LLC). (Turlik, John)
August 4, 2020 Filing 356 Fluor Enterprises, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Crossclaims against All Defendants by FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC.. (Petrina, Joseph)
August 4, 2020 Filing 355 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM with Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Crossclaims and Jury Demand against All Defendants by BW/IP, INC.. (Turlik, John)
August 4, 2020 Filing 354 Disclosure Statement identifying Fluor Corporation, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC. (Petrina, Joseph) Modified on 8/6/2020 (ma).
August 4, 2020 Filing 353 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph R. Petrina on behalf of FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC. (Petrina, Joseph) Modified on 8/6/2020 (ma).
August 4, 2020 Filing 352 Fluor Corporation ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Crossclaims against All Defendants by FLUOR CORPORATION. (Petrina, Joseph)
August 4, 2020 Filing 351 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by FLUOR CORPORATION. (Petrina, Joseph)
August 4, 2020 Filing 350 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph R. Petrina on behalf of FLUOR CORPORATION. (Petrina, Joseph)
August 4, 2020 Judge William S. Stickman presiding. (nll)
August 4, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #228 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #231 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #234 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 8/11/2020. (ma)
August 3, 2020 Filing 349 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by WARREN PUMPS, LLC. (Vugrinovich, Danielle)
August 3, 2020 Filing 348 Disclosure Statement identifying International S.a. r.l. Luxembourg as corporate parent or other affiliate, by PFAUDLER, INC.. (Lowery, Katherine) Modified on 8/6/2020 (ma).
August 3, 2020 Filing 347 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, and Reply to Crossclaims by PFAUDLER, INC.. (Lowery, Katherine)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge recused. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 8/3/2020. (mqe)
August 3, 2020 Filing 345 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by YUBA HEAT TRANSFER LLC. (Cerrone, Shannan)
August 3, 2020 Filing 344 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannan Cerrone on behalf of YUBA HEAT TRANSFER LLC. (Cerrone, Shannan)
August 3, 2020 Filing 343 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by YUBA HEAT TRANSFER LLC. (Cerrone, Shannan) Modified on 8/6/2020 (ma).
August 3, 2020 Filing 342 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ERIKS NORTH AMERICA(as successor-in-interest to Lewis-Goetz and Company, Inc., f/k/a Gooding Rubber Company). (Vey, Paul)
July 31, 2020 Filing 341 Disclosure Statement identifying Fives North American Combustion, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate,. (Cerrone, Shannan)
July 31, 2020 Filing 340 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by NORTH AMERICAN MANUFACTURING CO.. (Cerrone, Shannan) Modified on 8/6/2020 (ma).
July 31, 2020 Filing 339 ANSWER to Complaint WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND ANSWERS TO CROSS CLAIMS, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by FLOWSERVE US, INC.(solely as successor to Nordstrom Audco, Edward Valves, Inc., Nordstrom Valves, Inc., and Rockwell Manufacturing Company). (Beck, Deborah)
July 31, 2020 Filing 338 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannan Cerrone on behalf of NORTH AMERICAN MANUFACTURING CO. (Cerrone, Shannan) Modified on 8/1/2020 (ma).
July 31, 2020 Filing 337 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard C. Polley on behalf of NORTH AMERICAN MANUFACTURING CO.. (Polley, Richard)
July 31, 2020 Filing 336 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard C. Polley on behalf of ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Polley, Richard) Modified on 8/1/2020 (ma).
July 31, 2020 Filing 335 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Cerrone, Shannan)
July 31, 2020 Filing 334 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Cerrone, Shannan) Modified on 8/6/2020 (ma).
July 31, 2020 Filing 333 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannan Cerrone on behalf of ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Cerrone, Shannan) Modified on 8/1/2020 (ma).
July 30, 2020 Filing 332 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by MW CUSTOM PAPERS, LLC. (Vugrinovich, Danielle)
July 30, 2020 Filing 331 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by FLSMIDTH, INC.. (Vugrinovich, Danielle)
July 30, 2020 Filing 330 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by SUNBEAM PRODUCTS, INC.(as successor-in-interest to Sunbeam Corporation). (Vugrinovich, Danielle)
July 30, 2020 Filing 329 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by CASHCO, INC.. (Vugrinovich, Danielle)
July 30, 2020 Filing 328 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by SAUER, INC.. (Lamm, David)
July 30, 2020 Filing 327 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by AMETEK, INC.. (Lamm, David)
July 30, 2020 Filing 326 Disclosure Statement identifying FLSmidth USA Inc. as corporate parent, FLSMidth Dorr-Oliver Inc. as other affiliate, by FLSMIDTH, INC. as successor-in-interest to Keeler-Dorr-Oliver Boiler Company (Schaper, Joseph) Modified on 8/1/2020 (ma).
July 30, 2020 Filing 325 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmatiive Defenses, and CROSSCLAIM Reply to Crossclaims against All Defendants by FLSMIDTH, INC.. (Schaper, Joseph)
July 30, 2020 Filing 324 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph R. Schaper on behalf of FLSMIDTH, INC., as successor-in-interest to Keeler-Dorr-Oliver Boiler Company. (Schaper, Joseph) Modified on 8/1/2020 (ma).
July 30, 2020 Filing 323 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by GENUINE PARTS COMPANY. (Arriaga, Alba) Modified on 8/6/2020 (ma).
July 29, 2020 Filing 322 Disclosure Statement identifying Velan Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by VELAN VALVE CORPORATION. (Schaper, Joseph)
July 29, 2020 Filing 321 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph R. Schaper on behalf of VELAN VALVE CORPORATION. (Schaper, Joseph)
July 29, 2020 Filing 320 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by VELAN VALVE CORPORATION. (Schaper, Joseph)
July 29, 2020 Filing 319 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, Reply to All Cross-claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by COST COMPANY, COST MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Murphy, G. Richard)
July 29, 2020 Filing 318 Disclosure Statement identifying Pentair as corporate parent, General Signal Corporation and SPX Corp. other affiliate, by AURORA PUMPS. (Schaper, Joseph) Modified on 7/30/2020 (ma). Modified on 8/6/2020 (ma).
July 29, 2020 Filing 317 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Reply to Cross-Claims against All Defendants, by AURORA PUMPS. (Schaper, Joseph) Modified on 8/6/2020 (ma).
July 29, 2020 Filing 316 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Schaper on behalf of AURORA PUMPS. (Schaper, Joseph) Modified on 7/30/2020 (ma).
July 29, 2020 Filing 315 Disclosure Statement identifying FLS US Holdings Inc., FLSmidth A/S, and FLSmidth and Co. A/S as corporate parent or other affiliate, by FLSMIDTH, INC f/k/a Fuller Company. (Vugrinovich, Danielle) Modified on 8/1/2020 (ma).
July 29, 2020 Filing 314 Disclosure Statement identifying Colfax Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate, by WARREN PUMPS, LLC. (Vugrinovich, Danielle)
July 29, 2020 Filing 313 Disclosure Statement identifying Sunbeam Americas Holdings, LLC, Jarden Corporation, and Newell Brands Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by SUNBEAM PRODUCTS, INC.(as successor-in-interest to Sunbeam Corporation). (Vugrinovich, Danielle) Modified on 7/30/2020 (ma).
July 29, 2020 Filing 312 Disclosure Statement identifying WestRock MWV, LLC and WestRock Company as corporate parent or other affiliate, by MW CUSTOM PAPERS, LLC. (Vugrinovich, Danielle) Modified on 7/30/2020 (ma).
July 29, 2020 Filing 311 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CASHCO, INC.. (Vugrinovich, Danielle)
July 28, 2020 Filing 310 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 Motion to Remand to State Court, #299 Brief in Opposition to Motion, #4 Brief in Support of Motion filed by DAVID MARTINCIC, MERL WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Reaser Remand Order) (Shipp, Jason)
July 28, 2020 Filing 309 Disclosure Statement identifying Komatsu Mining Corp., Komatsu America Corp., and Komatsu Ltd. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by JOY GLOBAL SURFACE MINING, INC.. (Lamm, David) Modified on 7/29/2020 (ma).
July 28, 2020 Filing 308 Disclosure Statement identifying none as corporate parent or other affiliate, by MORGAN ENGINEERING SYSTEMS, INC.. (Breneman, Matthew)
July 28, 2020 Filing 307 Morgan Engineering Systems, INC.'s ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Cross Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by MORGAN ENGINEERING SYSTEMS, INC.. (Breneman, Matthew) Modified on 8/6/2020 (ma).
July 28, 2020 Filing 306 Disclosure Statement identifying Flowserve Corporation as corporate parent, Valtek other affiliate, by FLOWSERVE US, INC. fka FLOWSERVE FSD Corp., Successor to Valtek International (Turlik, John) Modified on 7/29/2020 (ma).
July 28, 2020 Filing 305 NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Turlik on behalf of FLOWSERVE US, INC. f/k/a FLOWSERVE FSD CORP. (Turlik, John) Modified on 7/30/2020 (ma).
July 28, 2020 Filing 304 Disclosure Statement identifying Flowserve Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate, by BW/IP, INC. (Turlik, John) Modified on 7/29/2020 (ma).
July 28, 2020 Filing 303 NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Turlik on behalf of BW/IP, INC. (Turlik, John) Modified on 7/30/2020 (ma).
July 28, 2020 Filing 302 Disclosure Statement identifying Nortek, Inc. and Melrose PLC, as corporate parent or other affiliate by NORTEK GLOBAL HVAC, LLC. (Turlik, John) Modified on 7/29/2020 (ma).
July 28, 2020 Filing 301 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Breneman on behalf of MORGAN ENGINEERING SYSTEMS, INC.. (Breneman, Matthew)
July 28, 2020 Filing 300 NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Turlik on behalf of NORTEK GLOBAL HAVAC, LLC. (Turlik, John) Modified on 7/30/2020 (ma).
July 28, 2020 Filing 299 BRIEF in Opposition re #3 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by FOSTER WHEELER, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit) (Wolford, Dennis)
July 27, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #265 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Multiple attorneys listed on Notice with no signatures. CORRECTION: Each attorney should file a Notice of Appearance. (ma)
July 27, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #253 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Documents are duplicates. CORRECTION: This document is a duplicate of #250 . These submissions will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This message is for informational purposes only., CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE. ERROR: Signature on document and filer do not match. CORRECTION: Attorney advised of signature requirements. Attorney to resubmit the document using the Errata event. (ma)
July 27, 2020 Filing 298 Disclosure Statement identifying MRC Global Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by MCJUNKIN REDMAN CORPORATION. (Breneman, Matthew)
July 27, 2020 Filing 297 MRC Global (US) Inc.'s (formerly known as McJunkin Red Man Corporation) ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Cross Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by MCJUNKIN REDMAN CORPORATION. (Breneman, Matthew) Modified on 8/6/2020 (ma).
July 27, 2020 Filing 296 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Breneman on behalf of MCJUNKIN REDMAN CORPORATION. (Breneman, Matthew)
July 27, 2020 Filing 295 Disclosure Statement identifying none as corporate parent or other affiliate, by HAMMOND VALVE COMPANY. (Breneman, Matthew)
July 27, 2020 Filing 294 Rain Bird Corporation, as Successor to Hammond Valve Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Cross Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by HAMMOND VALVE COMPANY. (Breneman, Matthew) Modified on 8/6/2020 (ma).
July 27, 2020 Filing 293 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Breneman on behalf of HAMMOND VALVE COMPANY. (Breneman, Matthew)
July 27, 2020 Filing 292 Disclosure Statement identifying none as corporate parent or other affiliate, by M.S. JACOBS & ASSOCIATES, INC.. (Breneman, Matthew)
July 27, 2020 Filing 291 M.S. Jacobs & Associates, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by M.S. JACOBS & ASSOCIATES, INC.. (Breneman, Matthew) Modified on 8/6/2020 (ma).
July 27, 2020 Filing 290 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Breneman on behalf of M.S. JACOBS & ASSOCIATES, INC.. (Breneman, Matthew)
July 24, 2020 Filing 288 NOTICE of Appearance by David Emil Lamm on behalf of AMETEK, INC.. (Lamm, David)
July 24, 2020 Filing 287 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIMS and Answer to Crossclaims by ERIKS NORTH AMERICA(as successor-in-interest to Lewis-Goetz and Company, Inc., f/k/a Gooding Rubber Company). (Vey, Paul) Modified on 8/6/2020 (ma).
July 24, 2020 Filing 286 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIMS, and Answer to Crossclaims by SAUER, INC.. (Vey, Paul) Modified on 8/6/2020 (ma).
July 24, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #244 Disclosure Statement, #249 Disclosure Statement, #246 Disclosure Statement, #248 Disclosure Statement, #245 Disclosure Statement, #247 Disclosure Statement, #243 Disclosure Statement. ERROR: Signature on document and filer do not match. CORRECTION: Attorney advised of signature requirements. Attorney to resubmit the document using the Errata event. (ma)
July 24, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #224 Notice of Appearance, #233 Notice of Appearance, #230 Notice of Appearance, #223 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Multiple attorneys listed on Notice with no signatures. CORRECTION: Each attorney should file a Notice of Appearance. (ma)
July 24, 2020 Filing 285 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIMS, Answer to Crossclaims by JOY GLOBAL SURFACE MINING, INC.. (Vey, Paul) Modified on 8/6/2020 (ma).
July 24, 2020 Filing 284 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIMS, Answer to Crossclaims by AMETEK, INC. (Vey, Paul) Modified on 8/6/2020 (ma). Modified on 8/6/2020 (ma).
July 24, 2020 Filing 283 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul K. Vey on behalf of ERIKS NORTH AMERICA(as successor-in-interest to Lewis-Goetz and Company, Inc., f/k/a Gooding Rubber Company). (Vey, Paul)
July 24, 2020 Filing 282 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul K. Vey on behalf of SAUER, INC.. (Vey, Paul)
July 24, 2020 Filing 281 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul K. Vey on behalf of JOY GLOBAL SURFACE MINING, INC.. (Vey, Paul)
July 24, 2020 Filing 280 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul K. Vey on behalf of AMETEK, INC.. (Vey, Paul)
July 24, 2020 Filing 279 NOTICE of Appearance by David Emil Lamm on behalf of ERIKS NORTH AMERICA(as successor-in-interest to Lewis-Goetz and Company, Inc., f/k/a Gooding Rubber Company). (Lamm, David)
July 24, 2020 Filing 278 Chicago Pneumatic Tool Company LLC's ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Crossclaims and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by CHICAGO PNEUMATIC TOOL COMPANY, LLC. (Zeli, Ryan)
July 24, 2020 Filing 277 NOTICE of Appearance by David Emil Lamm on behalf of SAUER, INC.. (Lamm, David)
July 24, 2020 Filing 276 NOTICE of Appearance by David Emil Lamm on behalf of JOY GLOBAL SURFACE MINING, INC.. (Lamm, David)
July 24, 2020 Filing 275 NOTICE of Appearance by David Emil Lamm on behalf of AMETEK, INC.. (Lamm, David)
July 24, 2020 Filing 274 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent, Atlas Copco North America LLC, Atlas Copco USA Holdings Inc., and Atlas Copco AB as other affiliate, by CHICAGO PNEUMATIC TOOL COMPANY, LLC. (Zeli, Ryan) Modified on 7/29/2020 (ma).
July 24, 2020 Filing 273 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Anthony Zeli and Joni M. Mangino on behalf of CHICAGO PNEUMATIC TOOL COMPANY, LLC. (Zeli, Ryan) Modified on 7/29/2020 (ma).
July 24, 2020 Filing 272 Disclosure Statement identifying Clyde Union (US), Inc. and AP Boardwalk, L.P. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CLYDE UNION, INC.. (Lamperski, Vincent) Modified on 7/29/2020 (ma).
July 24, 2020 Filing 271 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Answer to Co-Defendants' Crossclaims against All Defendants by MINE SAFETY APPLIANCES COMPANY, MINE SAFETY APPLIANCES COMPANY. (Butcher, Joseph)
July 24, 2020 Filing 270 Disclosure Statement identifying OSRAM GmbH, OSRAM Licht AG, OSRAM Beteiligungen GmbH as corporate parent, AMS AG as other affiliate, by OSRAM SYLVANIA, INC.(in its own right and as Successor-in-interest to GTE Products Corporation, The Clark Controller Company and A.O. Smith Corporation). (Lamperski, Vincent) Modified on 7/29/2020 (ma).
July 24, 2020 Filing 269 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by MUELLER STEAM SPECIALTY. (Lamperski, Vincent)
July 23, 2020 Filing 268 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent, Blackrock as other affiliate, by GENUINE PARTS COMPANY. (Arriaga, Alba) Modified on 7/29/2020 (ma).
July 22, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #205 Notice of Appearance, #202 Notice of Appearance, #204 Notice of Appearance, #207 Notice of Appearance, #208 Notice of Appearance, #206 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Multiple attorneys listed on Notice with no signatures. CORRECTION: Each attorney should file a Notice of Appearance. (ma)
July 22, 2020 Filing 267 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate by TUTHILL CORPORATION. (Chapman, Matthew) Modified on 7/29/2020 (ma).
July 22, 2020 Filing 266 ANSWER to Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Cross-claims, CROSS-CLAIM against All Defendants by TUTHILL CORPORATION. (Chapman, Matthew) Modified on 8/4/2020 (ma).
July 22, 2020 Filing 265 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew G. Chapman on behalf of TUTHILL CORPORATION. (Chapman, Matthew)
July 21, 2020 Filing 264 Ajax Magnethermic Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Crossclaims,, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by AJAX MAGNETHERMIC CORPORATION. (Witte, William)
July 21, 2020 Filing 263 Disclosure Statement identifying SA Armstrong Limited as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ARMSTRONG PUMPS, INC. (Warhola, Adam) Modified on 7/22/2020 (ma).
July 21, 2020 Filing 262 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam J. Warhola on behalf of ARMSTRONG PUMPS, INC. (Warhola, Adam) Modified on 7/27/2020 (ma).
July 21, 2020 Filing 261 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Parties by ARMSTRONG PUMPS, INC.. (Warhola, Adam)
July 21, 2020 Filing 260 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick A. Hewitt on behalf of GENUINE PARTS COMPANY. (Hewitt, Patrick)
July 21, 2020 Filing 259 NOTICE of Appearance by Alba E Arriaga on behalf of GENUINE PARTS COMPANY. (Arriaga, Alba)
July 21, 2020 Filing 258 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by HOWDEN NORTH AMERICA, INC.. (Arriaga, Alba)
July 21, 2020 Filing 257 Disclosure Statement identifying Buffalo Forge Company as corporate parent or other affiliate, by HOWDEN NORTH AMERICA, INC.. (Arriaga, Alba)
July 21, 2020 Filing 256 NOTICE of Appearance by Alba E Arriaga on behalf of HOWDEN NORTH AMERICA, INC.. (Arriaga, Alba)
July 21, 2020 Filing 255 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by HONEYWELL, INC.. (Santos, Eric)
July 21, 2020 Filing 254 Magnetek, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Crossclaims,, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by MAGNETEK, INC.. (Witte, William)
July 21, 2020 Filing 253 NOTICE of Appearance. (Polley, Richard)
July 21, 2020 Filing 252 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by AIRTEK, INC. (Wiese, Elizabeth) Modified on 7/22/2020 (ma).
July 21, 2020 Filing 251 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defensesand CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by AIRTEK, INC.. (Wiese, Elizabeth) Modified on 8/4/2020 (ma).
July 21, 2020 Filing 250 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Wiese on behalf of AIRTEK, INC. (Wiese, Elizabeth) Modified on 7/27/2020 (ma).
July 21, 2020 Filing 249 Disclosure Statement identifying Sundyne US Purchaser, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by SUNDYNE, LLC. (O'Connell, Edward)
July 21, 2020 Filing 248 Disclosure Statement identifying Grant Prideco, Inc., National Oilwell Varco, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ROBBINS & MYERS, INC. (O'Connell, Edward) Modified on 7/22/2020 (ma). Modified on 7/24/2020 (ma).
July 21, 2020 Filing 247 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by POWER PIPING COMPANY. (O'Connell, Edward) Modified on 7/22/2020 (ma).
July 21, 2020 Filing 246 Disclosure Statement identifying Robbins & Myers Holdings, LLC, Robbins & Myers, Inc., Grant Prideco, Inc., National Oilwell Varco, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by MOYNO, INC. (O'Connell, Edward) Modified on 7/22/2020 (ma). Modified on 7/24/2020 (ma).
July 21, 2020 Filing 245 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by MCMASTER CARR SUPPLY. (O'Connell, Edward) Modified on 7/22/2020 (ma).
July 21, 2020 Filing 244 Disclosure Statement identifying Bloom Engineering Holdings, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by BLOOM ENGINEERING COMPANY, INC. (O'Connell, Edward) Modified on 7/22/2020 (ma). Modified on 7/24/2020 (ma).
July 21, 2020 Filing 243 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate by ALLIED GLOVE CORPORATION. (O'Connell, Edward) Modified on 7/21/2020 (ma).
July 21, 2020 Filing 242 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Waldinger on behalf of EVOQUA WATER TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. (Waldinger, Ashley)
July 21, 2020 Filing 241 NOTICE of Appearance by Bridget L. Baranyai on behalf of EVOQUA WATER TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. (Baranyai, Bridget)
July 21, 2020 Filing 240 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam J. Warhola on behalf of EVOQUA WATER TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. (Warhola, Adam)
July 20, 2020 Filing 239 Disclosure Statement identifying California Coastal Communities as corporate parent or other affiliate, by WT/HRC CORPORATION. (O'Connell, Edward) Modified on 7/24/2020 (ma).
July 20, 2020 Filing 238 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by SIMAKAS COMPANY, INC.. (O'Connell, Edward)
July 20, 2020 Filing 237 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ROBINSON FANS, INC.. (O'Connell, Edward)
July 20, 2020 Filing 236 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by MCNEIL (OHIO) CORPORATION. (O'Connell, Edward)
July 20, 2020 Filing 235 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate by ABB, INC. (O'Connell, Edward) Modified on 7/21/2020 (ma).
July 20, 2020 Filing 234 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by SEALING SPECIALISTS & SERVICE CO.. (English, Jason) Modified on 8/4/2020 (ma).
July 20, 2020 Filing 233 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason M. English on behalf of SEALING SPECIALISTS & SERVICE CO. (English, Jason) Modified on 7/24/2020 (ma).
July 20, 2020 Filing 232 Honeywell Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by HONEYWELL, INC.. (Santos, Eric)
July 20, 2020 Filing 231 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by INDUSTRIAL RUBBER PRODUCTS. (English, Jason) Modified on 8/4/2020 (ma).
July 20, 2020 Filing 230 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason M. English on behalf of INDUSTRIAL RUBBER PRODUCTS. (English, Jason) Modified on 7/24/2020 (ma).
July 20, 2020 Filing 229 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric W. Santos on behalf of HONEYWELL, INC.. (Santos, Eric)
July 20, 2020 Filing 228 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by WASHINGTON GROUP INTERNATIONAL. (English, Jason) Modified on 8/4/2020 (ma).
July 20, 2020 Filing 227 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason English on behalf of WASHINGTON GROUP INTERNATIONAL. (English, Jason) Modified on 7/24/2020 (ma).
July 19, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #80 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #87 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #79 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim. ERROR: Signature on document and filer do not match. CORRECTION: Attorney advised of signature requirements. Attorney to resubmit the document using the Errata event. (ma)
July 17, 2020 Filing 226 Disclosure Statement identifying JX Nippon Mining & Metals Corp. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by GOULD ELECTRONICS INC.. (Jones, Christopher)
July 17, 2020 Filing 225 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Answers to Cross Claims, and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by GOULD ELECTRONICS INC.. (Jones, Christopher)
July 17, 2020 Filing 224 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard C. Polley on behalf of NAGLE PUMPS, INC.. (Polley, Richard)
July 17, 2020 Filing 223 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard C. Polley on behalf of DICK CORPORATION. (Polley, Richard) Modified on 7/24/2020 (ma).
July 17, 2020 Filing 222 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric L. Horne on behalf of CBS CORPORATION. (Horne, Eric)
July 17, 2020 Filing 221 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by COLUMBUS MCKINNON CORPORATION. (Ward, Kevin)
July 17, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #200 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Multiple attorneys listed on Notice with no signatures. CORRECTION: Each attorney should file a Notice of Appearance. (ma)
July 17, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re 194 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Documents #191 and 194 are duplicates. CORRECTION: Duplicate document No. 194 terminated. These submissions will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This message is for informational purposes only. (ma)
July 17, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re 190 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Documents #181 and 190 are duplicates. CORRECTION: Duplicate document No. 190 terminated. These submissions will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This message is for informational purposes only. (ma)
July 17, 2020 Filing 220 Disclosure Statement identifying BlackRock, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate by THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY. (Friedman, Julie) Modified on 7/19/2020 (ma).
July 16, 2020 Filing 219 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by WEST END CONTRACTING CORPORATION. (Scheuring, Gregory)
July 16, 2020 Filing 218 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by THE GORMAN-RUPP COMPANY. (Scheuring, Gregory)
July 16, 2020 Filing 217 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by DONALD MCKAY SMITH, INC. (Scheuring, Gregory) Modified on 7/19/2020 (ma).
July 16, 2020 Filing 216 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Affirmative Defenses, Answers to Cross Claims, and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by WEST END CONTRACTING CORPORATION. (Scheuring, Gregory)
July 16, 2020 Filing 215 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory C Scheuring on behalf of WEST END CONTRACTING CORPORATION. (Scheuring, Gregory)
July 16, 2020 Filing 214 Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Cleaver-Holdings, Inc as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CLEAVER-BROOKS. (Lamperski, Vincent)
July 16, 2020 Filing 213 Disclosure Statement identifying WestRock MWV, LLC and WestRock Company as corporate parent or other affiliate by MW CUSTOM PAPERS, LLC. (Vugrinovich, Danielle) Modified on 7/19/2020 (ma).
July 16, 2020 Filing 212 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by MCWANE, INC.. (Vugrinovich, Danielle)
July 16, 2020 Filing 211 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by PROCESS VALVE & EQUIPMENT CO.. (Viola, Alison )
July 16, 2020 Filing 210 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Crossclaim, and Answer to Crossclaims by PROCESS VALVE & EQUIPMENT CO.. (Viola, Alison )
July 16, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #140 Notice of Appearance, #144 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Additional attorney listed on Notice with no signature. CORRECTION: Each attorney should file a Notice of Appearance. (ma)
July 16, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #127 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Multiple attorneys listed on Notice with no signatures. CORRECTION: Each attorney should file a Notice of Appearance. (ma)
July 16, 2020 Filing 209 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis R. McEwen on behalf of BECHTEL CORPORATION. (McEwen, Dennis)
July 16, 2020 Filing 208 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine A. Lowery on behalf of UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION. (Lowery, Katherine)
July 16, 2020 Filing 207 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine A. Lowery on behalf of STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS (USA), LLC. (Lowery, Katherine)
July 16, 2020 Filing 206 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine A. Lowery on behalf of SWINDELL-DRESSLER INTERNATIONAL COMPANY. (Lowery, Katherine) Modified on 7/19/2020 (ma).
July 16, 2020 Filing 205 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine A. Lowery on behalf of PFAUDLER, INC.. (Lowery, Katherine)
July 16, 2020 Filing 204 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine A. Lowery on behalf of FMC CORPORATION. (Lowery, Katherine)
July 16, 2020 Filing 203 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeanette H. Ho on behalf of COST COMPANY and COST MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Ho, Jeanette) Modified on 7/19/2020 (ma).
July 16, 2020 Filing 202 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine A. Lowery on behalf of CARVER PUMP COMPANY. (Lowery, Katherine)
July 16, 2020 Filing 201 Errata re 173 Notice of Appearance Reason for Correction: Missing Electronic Signature. (Beck, Deborah)
July 16, 2020 Filing 200 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine A. Lowery on behalf of ALFA LAVAL, INC.. (Lowery, Katherine)
July 15, 2020 Filing 199 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Affirmative Defenses, Answers to Cross Claims, and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by THE GORMAN-RUPP COMPANY. (Scheuring, Gregory)
July 15, 2020 Filing 198 Disclosure Statement identifying National Amusements Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CBS CORPORATION. (Sinclair, Daniel)
July 15, 2020 Filing 197 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Crossclaim, and Answer to all Crossclaims by CBS CORPORATION. (Sinclair, Daniel)
July 15, 2020 Filing 196 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by BECHTEL CORPORATION. (Viola, Alison )
July 15, 2020 Filing 195 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Crossclaim, and Answer to all Crossclaims by BECHTEL CORPORATION. (Viola, Alison )
July 15, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #174 Disclosure Statement, 173 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Typed name omitted by s/. CORRECTION: Attorney advised of signature requirements. Attorney to resubmit with signature, using Errata event. This message is for informational purposes only. (ma)
July 15, 2020 Filing 193 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher T. Yoskosky on behalf of WEST END CONTRACTING CORPORATION. (Yoskosky, Christopher)
July 15, 2020 Filing 192 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Answers to Cross Claims, and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by DONALD MCKAY SMITH, INC.. (Yoskosky, Christopher)
July 15, 2020 Filing 191 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Scheuring on behalf of THE GORMAN-RUPP COMPANY. (Scheuring, Gregory) Modified on 7/17/2020 (ma).
July 15, 2020 Filing 189 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric K. Faulk on behalf of IMO INDUSTRIES, INC. (Falk, Eric) Modified on 7/17/2020 (ma).
July 15, 2020 Filing 188 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric K. Falk on behalf of RILEY POWER, INC. (Falk, Eric) Modified on 7/17/2020 (ma).
July 15, 2020 Filing 187 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric K. Falk on behalf of HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Falk, Eric)
July 15, 2020 Filing 186 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric K. Falk on behalf of PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION. (Falk, Eric)
July 14, 2020 Filing 185 ANSWER to Complaint and Answer to All Crossclaims by INDUCTOTHERM INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Stanek, Francis)
July 14, 2020 Filing 184 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by INDUCTOTHERM INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Stanek, Francis)
July 14, 2020 Filing 183 NOTICE of Appearance by Francis J. Stanek on behalf of INDUCTOTHERM INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Stanek, Francis)
July 14, 2020 Filing 182 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Scheuring on behalf of DONALD MCKAY SMITH, INC. (Scheuring, Gregory) Modified on 7/17/2020 (ma).
July 14, 2020 Filing 181 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Yoskosky on behalf of DONALD MCKAY SMITH, INC. (Yoskosky, Christopher) Modified on 7/17/2020 (ma).
July 14, 2020 Filing 180 Disclosure Statement identifying Burnham Holdings, Inc., as corporate parent or other affiliate, by BURNHAM LLC. (Lamperski, Vincent)
July 14, 2020 Filing 179 Answer to crossclaims of all defendants ANSWER to Complaint by SPX COOLING TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (Wimer, Matthew)
July 14, 2020 Filing 178 Answer and Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to Complaint by SPX COOLING TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (Wimer, Matthew)
July 14, 2020 Filing 177 Disclosure Statement identifying SPX Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate by SPX COOLING TECHNOLOGIES, INC. (Wimer, Matthew) Modified on 7/15/2020 (ma).
July 14, 2020 Filing 176 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Wimer on behalf of SPX COOLING TECHNOLOGIES, INC.. (Wimer, Matthew)
July 14, 2020 Filing 175 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth T. Newman on behalf of COST COMPANY. (Newman, Kenneth)
July 14, 2020 Filing 174 Disclosure Statement identifying Flowserve Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate, by FLOWSERVE US, INC.(solely as successor to Nordstrom Audco, Edward Valves, Inc., Nordstrom Valves, Inc., and Rockwell Manufacturing Company). (Beck, Deborah)
July 14, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #103 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #105 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #118 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #71 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #69 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #77 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #72 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #78 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #101 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #80 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #87 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #141 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, #102 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #104 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #75 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #70 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #79 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #74 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, #76 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 7/21/2020. (ma)
July 14, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #68 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 7/21/2020. (ma)
July 13, 2020 Filing 172 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by COST MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Murphy, G. Richard)
July 13, 2020 Filing 171 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by COST COMPANY. (Murphy, G. Richard)
July 13, 2020 Filing 170 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth T. Newman on behalf of COST COMPANY and COST MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Newman, Kenneth) Modified on 7/14/2020 (ma).
July 13, 2020 Filing 169 NOTICE of Appearance by G. Richard Murphy on behalf of COST MANAGEMENT, LLC. (Murphy, G. Richard)
July 13, 2020 Filing 168 NOTICE of Appearance by G. Richard Murphy on behalf of COST COMPANY. (Murphy, G. Richard)
July 13, 2020 Filing 167 Disclosure Statement identifying Columbus McKinnon Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate, by MAGNETEK, INC.. (Witte, William)
July 13, 2020 Filing 166 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph L. Orszulak, II on behalf of MAGNETEK, INC.. (Orszulak, Joseph)
July 13, 2020 Filing 165 NOTICE of Appearance by William J. Witte on behalf of MAGNETEK, INC.. (Witte, William)
July 13, 2020 Filing 164 NOTICE of Appearance by John C. McMeekin, II on behalf of THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY. (McMeekin, John)
July 10, 2020 Filing 163 Disclosure Statement identifying TPS, LLC as corporate parent or other affiliate, by BLUE M. CORPORATION. (Schaper, Joseph) Modified on 7/13/2020 (ma).
July 10, 2020 Filing 162 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Reply to Cross-Claims against All Defendants, by BLUE M. CORPORATION. (Schaper, Joseph) Modified on 8/3/2020 (ma).
July 10, 2020 Filing 161 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Schaper on behalf of BLUE M. CORPORATION (Schaper, Joseph) Modified on 7/16/2020 (ma). Modified on 7/17/2020 (ma).
July 10, 2020 Filing 160 Disclosure Statement identifying Lightnin as a brand within SPX FLOW US, LLC, and no corporate parent for SPX FLOW US, LLC. (Schaper, Joseph) Modified on 7/12/2020 (ma). Modified on 7/13/2020 (ma).
July 10, 2020 Filing 159 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Reply to Cross-Claims against All Defendants, by SPX FLOW US, LLC. (Schaper, Joseph) Modified on 8/3/2020 (ma).
July 10, 2020 Filing 158 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Schaper on behalf of SPX FLOW US, LLC. (Schaper, Joseph) Modified on 7/17/2020 (ma).
July 10, 2020 Filing 157 Disclosure Statement identifying Pfizer, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by WYETH HOLDINGS CORPORATION. (Schaper, Joseph)
July 10, 2020 Filing 156 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Reply to Cross-Claims against All Defendants, by WYETH HOLDINGS CORPORATION. (Schaper, Joseph) Modified on 8/3/2020 (ma).
July 10, 2020 Filing 155 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph R. Schaper on behalf of WYETH HOLDINGS CORPORATION. (Schaper, Joseph)
July 10, 2020 Filing 154 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate by DEZURIK, INC. (Schaper, Joseph) Modified on 7/12/2020 (ma).
July 10, 2020 Filing 153 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Reply to Cross-Claims against All Defendants, by DEZURIK, INC.. (Schaper, Joseph) Modified on 8/3/2020 (ma).
July 10, 2020 Filing 152 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph R. Schaper on behalf of DEZURIK, INC.. (Schaper, Joseph)
July 10, 2020 Filing 151 Disclosure Statement identifying TPS, LLC as corporate parent or other affiliate by LINDBERG MPH. (Schaper, Joseph) Modified on 7/12/2020 (ma). Modified on 7/13/2020 (ma).
July 10, 2020 Filing 150 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Reply to Cross-Claims against All Defendants, by LINDBERG MPH. (Schaper, Joseph) Modified on 8/3/2020 (ma).
July 10, 2020 Filing 149 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph R. Schaper on behalf of LINDBERG MPH. (Schaper, Joseph)
July 10, 2020 Filing 148 Disclosure Statement identifying TPS, LLC as corporate parent or other affiliate by LINDBERG. (Schaper, Joseph) Modified on 7/12/2020 (ma). Modified on 7/13/2020 (ma).
July 10, 2020 Filing 147 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM and Reply to Cross-Claims against All Defendants, by LINDBERG. (Schaper, Joseph) Modified on 8/3/2020 (ma).
July 10, 2020 Filing 146 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph R. Schaper on behalf of LINDBERG. (Schaper, Joseph)
July 10, 2020 Filing 145 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by DICK CORPORATION. (Baranyai, Bridget)
July 10, 2020 Filing 144 NOTICE of Appearance by Bridget L. Baranyai on behalf of DICK CORPORATION. (Baranyai, Bridget)
July 10, 2020 Filing 143 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by DICK CORPORATION. (Baranyai, Bridget)
July 10, 2020 Filing 142 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Nord Friedman on behalf of THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY. (Friedman, Julie)
July 10, 2020 Filing 141 The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company's ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Omnibus Answer to Crossclaims of Co-Defendants, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY. (Friedman, Julie)
July 10, 2020 Filing 140 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam J. Warhola on behalf of NAGLE PUMPS, INC.. (Warhola, Adam)
July 10, 2020 Filing 139 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by NAGLE PUMPS, INC.. (Warhola, Adam)
July 10, 2020 Filing 138 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by NAGLE PUMPS, INC.. (Warhola, Adam)
July 10, 2020 Filing 137 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Nord Friedman on behalf of PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION. (Friedman, Julie)
July 10, 2020 Filing 136 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION. (Friedman, Julie)
July 10, 2020 Filing 135 Parker Hannifin Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Omnibus Answer to Crossclaims of Co-Defendants, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION. (Friedman, Julie)
July 10, 2020 Filing 134 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert L. Hogan on behalf of RILEY POWER, INC. (Hogan, Robert) Modified on 7/14/2020 (ma).
July 10, 2020 Filing 133 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Nord Frieman on behalf of RILEY POWER, INC. (Friedman, Julie) Modified on 7/14/2020 (ma).
July 10, 2020 Filing 132 Disclosure Statement identifying Wholly owned by Babcock Power Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate by RILEY POWER, INC. (Friedman, Julie) Modified on 7/12/2020 (ma).
July 10, 2020 Filing 131 Riley Power Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Omnibus Answer to Crossclaims of Co-Defendants, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by RILEY POWER, INC.. (Friedman, Julie)
July 10, 2020 Filing 130 Disclosure Statement identifying EWT Holdings II Corp., EWT Holdings III Corp., and Evoqua Water Technologies Corp. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by EVOQUA WATER TECHNOLOGIES, LLC (in its Own right and as successor-in-interest to Wallace & Tiernan). (Warhola, Adam) Modified on 7/13/2020 (ma).
July 10, 2020 Filing 129 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Nord Friedman on behalf IMO INDUSTRIES, INC. (Friedman, Julie) Modified on 7/14/2020 (ma).
July 10, 2020 Filing 128 Disclosure Statement identifying Colfax Corporation, Colfax Fluid Handling LLC, and IMO Holdings, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate by IMO INDUSTRIES, INC. (Friedman, Julie) Modified on 7/12/2020 (ma).
July 10, 2020 Filing 127 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam J. Warhola on behalf of EVOQUA WATER TECHNOLOGIES, LLC (in its Own right and as successor-in-interest to Wallace & Tiernan). (Warhola, Adam)
July 10, 2020 Filing 126 IMO Industries, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Omnibus Answer to Crossclaims of Co-Defendants, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by IMO INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Friedman, Julie)
July 10, 2020 Filing 125 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by EVOQUA WATER TECHNOLOGIES, LLC(in its Own right and as successor-in-interest to Wallace & Tiernan). (Warhola, Adam)
July 10, 2020 Filing 124 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie Nord Friedman on behalf of HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Friedman, Julie)
July 10, 2020 Filing 123 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Friedman, Julie)
July 10, 2020 Filing 122 Honeywell International Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Omnibus Answer to Crossclaims of Co-Defendants, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Friedman, Julie)
July 9, 2020 Filing 121 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin M. Ward on behalf of COLUMBUS MCKINNON CORPORATION. (Ward, Kevin)
July 9, 2020 Filing 120 Disclosure Statement identifying MSA Safety Incorporated as corporate parent or other affiliate by MINE SAFETY APPLIANCES COMPANY. (Butcher, Joseph) Modified on 7/12/2020 (ma).
July 9, 2020 Filing 119 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph F. Butcher on behalf of MINE SAFETY APPLIANCES COMPANY. (Butcher, Joseph) Modified on 7/14/2020 (ma).
July 9, 2020 Filing 118 ANSWER to Complaint , AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, ANSWER TO CROSS-CLAIMS, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by COLUMBUS MCKINNON CORPORATION. (Ward, Kevin)
July 8, 2020 Filing 117 Research-Cottrell, Inc., n/k/a AWT Air Company, Inc. ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Answer to CrossClaims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by RESEARCH-COTTRELL, INC.. (Orszulak, Joseph)
July 8, 2020 Filing 116 Disclosure Statement identifying Veolia Environnement S.A., a publicly owned French corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate, by RESEARCH-COTTRELL, INC. (Orszulak, Joseph) Modified on 7/12/2020 (ma).
July 8, 2020 Filing 115 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph L. Orszulak, II on behalf of RESEARCH-COTTRELL, INC. (Orszulak, Joseph) Modified on 7/14/2020 (ma).
July 7, 2020 Filing 114 Disclosure Statement identifying HBMA Holdings LLC and HeidelbergCement AG as corporate parent or other affiliate, by BEAZER EAST INC.. (Leight, Robert) Modified on 7/13/2020 (ma).
July 7, 2020 Filing 113 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by BEAZER EAST INC.. (Leight, Robert)
July 7, 2020 Filing 112 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by A.O. SMITH CORPORATION. (Lamperski, Vincent)
July 7, 2020 Filing 111 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by OCEAN VIEW CAPITAL. (Lamperski, Vincent)
July 7, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #56 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Signature on document and filer do not match. CORRECTION: Attorney advised of signature requirements. Attorney to resubmit the document using the Errata event. (ma)
July 7, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #50 Disclosure Statement. ERROR: Caption and/or Case number of document does not match caption and/or case number of case. CORRECTION: Attorney is directed to file an Errata with corrected caption/and or case number. (ma)
July 7, 2020 Filing 110 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CRANE COMPANY, INC.. (Ross, Michael)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #3 Motion to Remand to State Court: Foster Wheeler LLC Response to Motion due by 7/28/2020. Plaintiffs' Reply due by 8/4/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 7/7/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (spc)
July 7, 2020 Filing 108 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate by CATERPILLAR, INC. . (Smallwood, Edward) Modified on 7/14/2020 (ma).
July 7, 2020 Filing 107 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by CATERPILLAR, INC.. (Smallwood, Edward)
July 6, 2020 Filing 106 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and Answer to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by OCEAN VIEW CAPITAL. (Lamperski, Vincent)
July 6, 2020 Filing 105 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and Answer to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by OSRAM SYLVANIA, INC.(in its own right and as Successor-in-interest to GTE Products Corporation, The Clark Controller Company and A.O. Smith Corporation). (Lamperski, Vincent)
July 6, 2020 Filing 104 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and Answer to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by MUELLER STEAM SPECIALTY. (Lamperski, Vincent)
July 6, 2020 Filing 103 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and Answer to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by CLYDE UNION, INC.. (Lamperski, Vincent)
July 6, 2020 Filing 102 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and Answer to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by BURNHAM LLC. (Lamperski, Vincent)
July 6, 2020 Filing 101 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and Answer to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by CLEAVER-BROOKS. (Lamperski, Vincent)
July 6, 2020 Filing 100 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and Answer to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by A.O. SMITH CORPORATION. (Lamperski, Vincent)
July 6, 2020 Filing 99 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and Answer to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by WHEELING RUBBER PRODUCTS, INC.. (Smallwood, Edward)
July 6, 2020 Filing 98 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and Answer to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by J.M. FOSTER, INC.. (Smallwood, Edward)
July 6, 2020 Filing 97 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and Answer to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by THE NASH ENGINEERING COMPANY. (Smallwood, Edward)
July 6, 2020 Filing 96 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and Answer to Cross-Claims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by HUNTER SALES CORPORATION. (Evans, Steven)
July 6, 2020 Filing 95 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY. (Smallwood, Edward)
July 6, 2020 Filing 94 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by HUNTER SALES CORPORATION. (Evans, Steven)
July 6, 2020 Filing 93 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by J.M. FOSTER, INC.. (Smallwood, Edward)
July 6, 2020 Filing 92 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by WHEELING RUBBER PRODUCTS, INC.. (Smallwood, Edward)
July 6, 2020 Filing 91 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by AJAX MAGNETHERMIC CORPORATION. (Witte, William)
July 6, 2020 Filing 90 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY. (Smallwood, Edward)
July 6, 2020 Filing 89 Disclosure Statement identifying Nash Holdings LLC as corporate parent or other affiliate, by THE NASH ENGINEERING COMPANY. (Smallwood, Edward)
July 6, 2020 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph L. Orszulak, II on behalf of AJAX MAGNETHERMIC CORPORATION. (Orszulak, Joseph)
July 6, 2020 Filing 87 ANSWER to Complaint OF PLAINTIFF, REPLY TO ALL CROSS-CLAIMS, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by MCNEIL (OHIO) CORPORATION. (Huetter, Glenn)
July 6, 2020 Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by William J. Witte on behalf of AJAX MAGNETHERMIC CORPORATION. (Witte, William)
July 6, 2020 Filing 85 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by REUNION INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Smallwood, Edward)
July 6, 2020 Filing 84 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by REUNION INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Smallwood, Edward)
July 6, 2020 Filing 83 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by AMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION. (Smallwood, Edward)
July 6, 2020 Filing 82 Disclosure Statement identifying National Oilwell Varco, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by AMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION. (Smallwood, Edward)
July 6, 2020 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by Colby S Bryson on behalf of CATERPILLAR, INC., CATERPILLAR, INC.. (Bryson, Colby)
July 6, 2020 Filing 80 ANSWER to Complaint OF PLAINTIFF, REPLY TO ALL CROSS-CLAIMS, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by SUNDYNE, LLC. (Huetter, Glenn)
July 6, 2020 Filing 79 ANSWER to Complaint OF PLAINTIFF, REPLY TO ALL CROSS-CLAIMS, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by ROBBINS & MYERS, INC.. (Huetter, Glenn)
July 6, 2020 Filing 78 ANSWER to Complaint OF PLAINTIFF, REPLY TO ALL CROSS-CLAIMS, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by POWER PIPING COMPANY. (Huetter, Glenn)
July 6, 2020 Filing 77 ANSWER to Complaint OF PLAINTIFF, REPLY TO ALL CROSS-CLAIMS, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by MOYNO, INC.. (Huetter, Glenn)
July 6, 2020 Filing 76 ANSWER to Complaint OF PLAINTIFF, REPLY TO ALL CROSS-CLAIMS, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by MCMASTER CARR SUPPLY. (Huetter, Glenn)
July 6, 2020 Filing 75 ANSWER to Complaint OF PLAINTIFF, REPLY TO ALL CROSS-CLAIMS, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by BLOOM ENGINEERING COMPANY, INC.. (Huetter, Glenn)
July 6, 2020 Filing 74 ANSWER to Complaint OF PLAINTIFF, REPLY TO ALL CROSS-CLAIMS, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by ALLIED GLOVE CORPORATION. (Huetter, Glenn)
July 6, 2020 Filing 73 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Neft, Bryan)
July 6, 2020 Filing 72 ANSWER to Complaint OF PLAINTIFF, REPLY TO ALL CROSS-CLAIMS, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by WT/HRC CORPORATION. (Huetter, Glenn)
July 6, 2020 Filing 71 ANSWER to Complaint OF PLAINTIFF, REPLY TO ALL CROSS-CLAIMS, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by SIMAKAS COMPANY, INC.. (Huetter, Glenn)
July 6, 2020 Filing 70 ANSWER to Complaint OF PLAINTIFF, REPLY TO ALL CROSS-CLAIMS, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by ROBINSON FANS, INC.. (Huetter, Glenn)
July 6, 2020 Filing 69 ANSWER to Complaint OF PLAINTIFF, REPLY TO ALL CROSS-CLAIMS, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by BMI REFRACTORY SERVICES, INC.. (Huetter, Glenn)
July 6, 2020 Filing 68 ABB, INC.'S ANSWER to Complaint OF PLAINTIFF, REPLY TO ALL CROSS-CLAIMS, and CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by ABB, INC.. (Huetter, Glenn)
July 6, 2020 Filing 67 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Answer to Cross-Claims and, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by ATLAS INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Smith, Kelly)
July 6, 2020 Filing 66 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Neft, Bryan)
July 2, 2020 Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge is added. (cmc)
July 2, 2020 Judge Joy Flowers Conti no longer assigned to case. (cmc)
July 2, 2020 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew F. Adomitis on behalf of OCEAN VIEW CAPITAL. (Adomitis, Andrew)
July 2, 2020 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew F. Adomitis on behalf of OSRAM SYLVANIA, INC.. (Adomitis, Andrew)
July 2, 2020 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew F. Adomitis on behalf of CLYDE UNION, INC.. (Adomitis, Andrew)
July 2, 2020 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew F. Adomitis on behalf of BURNHAM LLC. (Adomitis, Andrew)
July 2, 2020 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew F. Adomitis on behalf of A.O. SMITH CORPORATION. (Adomitis, Andrew)
July 2, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew F. Adomitis on behalf of MUELLER STEAM SPECIALTY. (Adomitis, Andrew)
July 2, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew F. Adomitis on behalf of CLEAVER-BROOKS. (Adomitis, Andrew)
July 2, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent P. Lamperski on behalf of OCEAN VIEW CAPITAL. (Lamperski, Vincent)
July 2, 2020 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent P. Lamperski on behalf of OSRAM SYLVANIA, INC.. (Lamperski, Vincent)
July 2, 2020 Filing 56 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent P. Lamperski on behalf of CLYDE UNION, INC.. (Lamperski, Vincent)
July 2, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent P. Lamperski on behalf of BURNHAM LLC. (Lamperski, Vincent)
July 2, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent P. Lamperski on behalf of A.O. SMITH CORPORATION. (Lamperski, Vincent)
July 2, 2020 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent P. Lamperski on behalf of MUELLER STEAM SPECIALTY. (Lamperski, Vincent)
July 2, 2020 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent P. Lamperski on behalf of CLEAVER-BROOKS. (Lamperski, Vincent)
July 2, 2020 Filing 51 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Co-Defendants by UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION. (Johnston, J.) Modified on 7/6/2020 (ma).
July 1, 2020 Filing 50 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ATLAS INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Smith, Kelly)
July 1, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward A. Smallwood on behalf of CATERPILLAR, INC.. (Smallwood, Edward)
July 1, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward A. Smallwood on behalf of REUNION INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Smallwood, Edward)
July 1, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward A. Smallwood on behalf of AMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION. (Smallwood, Edward)
July 1, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua M. Brick on behalf of CATERPILLAR, INC.. (Brick, Joshua)
July 1, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua M. Brick on behalf of REUNION INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Brick, Joshua)
July 1, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua M. Brick on behalf of AMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION. (Brick, Joshua)
July 1, 2020 Filing 43 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by MCWANE, INC. Answer due from MCWANE, INC. on 8/3/2020. (Vugrinovich, Danielle)
July 1, 2020 Filing 42 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by ECODYNE CORPORATION Answer due from ECODYNE CORPORATION on 8/3/2020. (Vugrinovich, Danielle)
July 1, 2020 Filing 41 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by EATON CORPORATION Answer due from EATON CORPORATION on 8/3/2020. (Vugrinovich, Danielle)
July 1, 2020 Filing 40 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by WARREN PUMPS, LLC Answer due from WARREN PUMPS, LLC on 8/3/2020. (Vugrinovich, Danielle)
July 1, 2020 Filing 39 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by SUNBEAM PRODUCTS, INC. Answer due from SUNBEAM PRODUCTS, INC. on 8/3/2020. (Vugrinovich, Danielle)
July 1, 2020 Filing 38 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by MW CUSTOM PAPERS, LLC Answer due from MW CUSTOM PAPERS, LLC on 8/3/2020. (Vugrinovich, Danielle)
July 1, 2020 Filing 37 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by FLSMIDTH, INC. (f/k/a Fuller Company) Answer due from FLSMIDTH, INC.(f/k/a Fuller Company) on 8/3/2020. (Vugrinovich, Danielle) Modified on 7/2/2020 (ma).
July 1, 2020 Filing 36 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by CASHCO, INC. Answer due from CASHCO, INC. on 8/3/2020. (Vugrinovich, Danielle)
July 1, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly L Smith on behalf of ATLAS INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Smith, Kelly)
July 1, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly L Smith on behalf of HUNTER SALES CORPORATION. (Smith, Kelly)
July 1, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah M. Czypinski on behalf of CRANE COMPANY, INC.. (Czypinski, Sarah)
July 1, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Ross on behalf of CRANE COMPANY, INC.. (Ross, Michael)
July 1, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward A. Smallwood on behalf of THE NASH ENGINEERING COMPANY. (Smallwood, Edward)
July 1, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward A. Smallwood on behalf of J.M. FOSTER, INC.. (Smallwood, Edward)
July 1, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward A. Smallwood on behalf of THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY. (Smallwood, Edward)
July 1, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis F. Wolford on behalf of FOSTER WHEELER, LLC. (Wolford, Dennis)
July 1, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward A. Smallwood on behalf of WHEELING RUBBER PRODUCTS, INC.. (Smallwood, Edward)
July 1, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven D. Evans on behalf of THE NASH ENGINEERING COMPANY. (Evans, Steven)
July 1, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven D. Evans on behalf of J.M. FOSTER, INC.. (Evans, Steven)
July 1, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven D. Evans on behalf of THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY. (Evans, Steven)
July 1, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven D. Evans on behalf of WHEELING RUBBER PRODUCTS, INC.. (Evans, Steven)
July 1, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven D. Evans on behalf of HUNTER SALES CORPORATION. (Evans, Steven)
July 1, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Answer to All Crossclaims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by GREENE TWEED & COMPANY. (Wolford, Dennis)
July 1, 2020 Filing 20 Disclosure Statement identifying Greene Tweed of Delaware, LLC as corporate parent or other affiliate, by GREENE TWEED & COMPANY. (Wolford, Dennis)
July 1, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis F. Wolford on behalf of GREENE TWEED & COMPANY. (Wolford, Dennis)
July 1, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle M. Vugrinovich on behalf of MCWANE, INC.. (Vugrinovich, Danielle)
July 1, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle M. Vugrinovich on behalf of ECODYNE CORPORATION. (Vugrinovich, Danielle)
July 1, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle M. Vugrinovich on behalf of EATON CORPORATION. (Vugrinovich, Danielle)
July 1, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle M. Vugrinovich on behalf of WARREN PUMPS, LLC. (Vugrinovich, Danielle)
July 1, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle M. Vugrinovich on behalf of SUNBEAM PRODUCTS, INC.. (Vugrinovich, Danielle)
July 1, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle M. Vugrinovich on behalf of MW CUSTOM PAPERS, LLC. (Vugrinovich, Danielle)
July 1, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle M. Vugrinovich on behalf of FLSMIDTH, INC.. (Vugrinovich, Danielle)
July 1, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle M. Vugrinovich on behalf of CASHCO, INC.. (Vugrinovich, Danielle)
July 1, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Bankruptcy Filing and Stay of Proceedings by INGERSOLL-RAND CORPORATION, TRANE U.S. INC. (Smallwood, Edward)
July 1, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, Answer to All Crossclaims, CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by FOSTER WHEELER, LLC. (Wolford, Dennis)
July 1, 2020 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement identifying Foster Wheeler AG (Switzerland), Foster Wheeler Ltd. (Bermuda), Foster Wheeler Holdings Ltd. (Bermuda), Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation (Delaware), and FMR LLC as corporate parents or other affiliates, by FOSTER WHEELER, LLC. (Wolford, Dennis) Modified on 7/2/2020 (ma).
July 1, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Lawson Johnston on behalf of UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION. (Johnston, J.)
July 1, 2020 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION. (Clements, Scott)
July 1, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott D. Clements on behalf of UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION. (Clements, Scott)
June 29, 2020 Filing 4 BRIEF in Support re #3 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by DAVID MARTINCIC, MERL WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A--Scott Complaint) (Shipp, Jason)
June 29, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Remand to State Court by DAVID MARTINCIC, MERL WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Shipp, Jason)
June 29, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason T. Shipp on behalf of DAVID MARTINCIC, MERL WILLIAMS. (Shipp, Jason)
June 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County, case number GD-20-005567 Copies attached: State Court Complaint (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5717480), filed by FOSTER WHEELER, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (ma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARTINCIC et al v. A.O. SMITH CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YUBA HEAT TRANSFER LLC
Represented By: Shannan Cerrone
Represented By: Shannan Noe Cerrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL
Represented By: Joseph R. Petrina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MW CUSTOM PAPERS, LLC
Represented By: Danielle M. Vugrinovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTH AMERICAN MANUFACTURING CO.
Represented By: Richard C. Polley
Represented By: Shannan Cerrone
Represented By: Shannan Noe Cerrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRAND INSULATIONS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP, INC.
Represented By: John A. Turlik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION
Represented By: Scott D. Clements
Represented By: J. Lawson Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SWINDELL-DRESSLER INTERNATIONAL COMPANY
Represented By: Katherine A. Lowery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COST COMPANY
Represented By: Jeanette H. Ho
Represented By: Kenneth T. Newman
Represented By: G. Richard Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEALING SPECIALISTS & SERVICE CO.
Represented By: Jason M. English
Represented By: Dennis J. Geis, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOOTER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CASHCO, INC.
Represented By: Danielle M. Vugrinovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RILEY POWER, INC.
Represented By: Eric K. Falk
Represented By: Robert L Hogan
Represented By: Julie Nord Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APPLIED INDUSTRIAL TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATWOOD & MORRILL CO., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLOWSERVE CORPORATION
Represented By: Melissa Devich Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLYDE UNION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: Julie Nord Friedman
Represented By: Eric K. Falk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANTA FE BRAUN, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ECODYNE CORPORATION
Represented By: Danielle M. Vugrinovich
Represented By: Erin Margolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRINNELL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMI REFRACTORY SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Glenn A. Huetter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARVER PUMP COMPANY
Represented By: Katherine A. Lowery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAGNETEK, INC.
Represented By: Joseph L. Orszulak, II
Represented By: William J. Witte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: Aaron Arthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCCARLS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEAVER-BROOKS
Represented By: Andrew F. Adomitis
Represented By: Vincent P. Lamperski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BURNHAM LLC
Represented By: Andrew F. Adomitis
Represented By: Vincent P. Lamperski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CATERPILLAR, INC.
Represented By: Joshua M. Brick
Represented By: Colby S Bryson
Represented By: Edward A. Smallwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPX FLOW US, LLC
Represented By: Joseph R. Schaper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINDBERG MPH
Represented By: Joseph R. Schaper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WYETH HOLDINGS CORPORATION
Represented By: Joseph R. Schaper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS CORPORATION
Represented By: Daniel J. Sinclair
Represented By: Eric L. Horne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VELAN VALVE CORPORATION
Represented By: Joseph R. Schaper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YORK INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION
Represented By: Aaron Arthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE LINTERN CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIKING PUMP, INC.
Represented By: Jennifer E. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABB, INC.
Represented By: Edward O'Connell
Represented By: Glenn A. Huetter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DRAVO CORPORATION
Represented By: Cathy R. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALFA LAVAL, INC.
Represented By: Katherine A. Lowery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPIRAX SARCO, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELLIOTT COMPANY
Represented By: Aaron Arthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDUSTRIAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION
Represented By: Joseph R. Schaper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDUCTOTHERM INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: Francis J. Stanek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCMASTER CARR SUPPLY
Represented By: Abby K. Hahn
Represented By: Glenn A. Huetter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAMWORTHY PEABODY COMBUSTION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEAL & DESIGN HIGBEE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE GORMAN-RUPP COMPANY
Represented By: Gregory C Scheuring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WTI RUST HOLDINGS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WHEELABRATOR AIR POLLUTION CONTROL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MINE SAFETY APPLIANCES COMPANY
Represented By: Joseph F. Butcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUNBEAM PRODUCTS, INC.
Represented By: Danielle M. Vugrinovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OSRAM SYLVANIA, INC.
Represented By: Andrew F. Adomitis
Represented By: Vincent P. Lamperski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMETEK, INC.
Represented By: David Emil Lamm
Represented By: Paul K. Vey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOULD ELECTRONICS, INC.
Represented By: Christopher H. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLUE M. CORPORATION
Represented By: Joseph R. Schaper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENUINE PARTS COMPANY
Represented By: Alba E Arriaga
Represented By: Patrick A. Hewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARRIER CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATLAS INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: Kelly L Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.R. WIFLEY & SONS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WASHINGTON GROUP INTERNATIONAL
Represented By: Jason M. English
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC.
Represented By: Joseph R. Petrina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIKS NORTH AMERICA
Represented By: David Emil Lamm
Represented By: Paul K. Vey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIMAKAS COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: Edward O'Connell
Represented By: Glenn A. Huetter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BECHTEL CORPORATION
Represented By: Dennis R. McEwen
Represented By: Alison R. Viola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUST ENGINEERING & CONSTRUCTION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: URBAN REDEVELOPMENT AUTHORITY OF PITTSBURGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOULDS PUMP, LLC
Represented By: Aaron Arthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLOWSERVE US, INC.
Represented By: John A. Turlik
Represented By: Deborah A. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIDGEVILLE AUTO PARTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAKER HUGHES
Represented By: Philip P. Keating
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEST END CONTRACTING CORPORATION
Represented By: Gregory C Scheuring
Represented By: Christopher T. Yoskosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLUMBUS MCKINNON CORPORATION
Represented By: Kevin M. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAMMOND VALVE COMPANY
Represented By: Matthew Breneman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINDBERG
Represented By: Joseph R. Schaper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLEGHENY COUNTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARREN PUMPS, LLC
Represented By: Danielle M. Vugrinovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: POWER PIPING COMPANY
Represented By: Abby K. Hahn
Represented By: Glenn A. Huetter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLASTICS ENGINEERING COMPANY
Represented By: Jennifer E. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUELLER STEAM SPECIALTY
Represented By: Andrew F. Adomitis
Represented By: Vincent P. Lamperski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHICAGO PNEUMATIC TOOL COMPANY, LLC
Represented By: Joni M. Mangino
Represented By: Ryan Anthony Zeli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MET-PRO CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOSTER WHEELER, LLC
Represented By: Dennis F. Wolford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARDNER DENVER, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEAZER EAST INC.
Represented By: Robert R. Leight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLEGHENY COUNTY AIRPORT AUTHORITY
Represented By: Brandon J. Verdream
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WT/HRC CORPORATION
Represented By: Edward O'Connell
Represented By: Glenn A. Huetter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EICHLEAY CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCNEIL (OHIO) CORPORATION
Represented By: Edward O'Connell
Represented By: Glenn A. Huetter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION
Represented By: Jennifer E. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PFAUDLER, INC.
Represented By: Katherine A. Lowery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AECOM ENERGY & CONSTRUCTION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORGAN ENGINEERING SYSTEMS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDUSTRIAL RUBBER PRODUCTS
Represented By: Jason M. English
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOY GLOBAL UNDERGROUND MINING, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WHEELING RUBBER PRODUCTS, INC.
Represented By: Steven D. Evans
Represented By: Edward A. Smallwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEIL-MCLAIN COMPANY
Represented By: Christopher H. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY
Represented By: Julie Nord Friedman
Represented By: John C. McMeekin, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION
Represented By: Joshua M. Brick
Represented By: Edward A. Smallwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVOQUA WATER TECHNOLOGIES, LLC
Represented By: Bridget L. Baranyai
Represented By: Ashley Waldinger
Represented By: Adam J. Warhola
Represented By: Ashley D Waldinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLIED GLOVE CORPORATION
Represented By: Abby K. Hahn
Represented By: Glenn A. Huetter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.M. FOSTER, INC.
Represented By: Steven D. Evans
Represented By: Edward A. Smallwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALCOA, INC.
Represented By: Jennifer E. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUNTER SALES CORPORATION
Represented By: Steven D. Evans
Represented By: Kelly L Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I.U. NORTH AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Jennifer E. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AURORA PUMPS
Represented By: Joseph R. Schaper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOY GLOBAL SURFACE MINING, INC.
Represented By: David Emil Lamm
Represented By: Paul K. Vey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIRTEK, INC.
Represented By: Elizabeth K. Wiese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONEYWELL, INC.
Represented By: Eric W. Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: Sarah M. Czypinski
Represented By: Michael J. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPX COOLING TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Represented By: Matthew R. Wimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TUTHILL CORPORATION
Represented By: Matthew G. Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TENOVA INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE WILLIAM POWELL COMPANY
Represented By: Steven D. Evans
Represented By: Edward A. Smallwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC CORPORATION
Represented By: Katherine A. Lowery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REUNION INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: Joshua M. Brick
Represented By: Edward A. Smallwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD MCKAY SMITH, INC.
Represented By: Gregory C Scheuring
Represented By: Christopher T. Yoskosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SURFACE COMBUSTION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCJUNKIN REDMAN CORPORATION
Represented By: Matthew Breneman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIE IRON CITY WORKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INGERSOLL-RAND CORPORATION
Represented By: Edward A. Smallwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTEK GLOBAL HVAC, LLC
Represented By: John A. Turlik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCWANE, INC.
Represented By: Danielle M. Vugrinovich
Represented By: Erin Margolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBINSON FANS, INC.
Represented By: Edward O'Connell
Represented By: Glenn A. Huetter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STERLING FLUID SYSTEMS (USA), LLC
Represented By: Katherine A. Lowery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DICK CORPORATION
Represented By: Richard C. Polley
Represented By: Bridget L. Baranyai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC.
Represented By: Aaron Arthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAINT-GOBAIN ABRASIVES, INC.
Represented By: Jennifer E. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: READING CRANE AND ENGINEERING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE NASH ENGINEERING COMPANY
Represented By: Steven D. Evans
Represented By: Edward A. Smallwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBBINS & MYERS, INC.
Represented By: Abby K. Hahn
Represented By: Glenn A. Huetter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COST MANAGEMENT, LLC
Represented By: Jeanette H. Ho
Represented By: Kenneth T. Newman
Represented By: G. Richard Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC.
Represented By: Tausha Saunders
Represented By: Michael J. Zukowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.O. SMITH CORPORATION
Represented By: Andrew F. Adomitis
Represented By: Vincent P. Lamperski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAUER, INC.
Represented By: David Emil Lamm
Represented By: Paul K. Vey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEZURIK, INC.
Represented By: Joseph R. Schaper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLOOM ENGINEERING COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: Abby K. Hahn
Represented By: Glenn A. Huetter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARMSTRONG PUMPS, INC.
Represented By: Adam J. Warhola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEAN VIEW CAPITAL
Represented By: Andrew F. Adomitis
Represented By: Vincent P. Lamperski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.S. JACOBS & ASSOCIATES, INC.
Represented By: Matthew Breneman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANE U.S. INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOYNO, INC.
Represented By: Abby K. Hahn
Represented By: Glenn A. Huetter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: Richard C. Polley
Represented By: Shannan Cerrone
Represented By: Shannan Noe Cerrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MILWAUKEE VALVE COMPANY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAP, INC.
Represented By: Jennifer E. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLSMIDTH, INC.
Represented By: Danielle M. Vugrinovich
Represented By: Joseph R. Schaper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLARK RELIANCE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RESEARCH-COTTRELL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOWDEN NORTH AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: Alba E Arriaga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GG OF FLORIDA, INC.
Represented By: John M. Schollaert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SULZER PUMPS SOLUTIONS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUNDYNE, LLC
Represented By: Abby K. Hahn
Represented By: Glenn A. Huetter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREENE TWEED & COMPANY
Represented By: Dennis F. Wolford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR CORPORATION
Represented By: Joseph R. Petrina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROCESS VALVE & EQUIPMENT CO.
Represented By: Alison R. Viola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARMEUSE LIME, INC.
Represented By: Cathy R. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEAD
Represented By: Danielle M. Vugrinovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAMERON INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION
Represented By: Nicholas J. Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION
Represented By: Julie Nord Friedman
Represented By: Eric K. Falk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RESCO HOLDINGS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EATON CORPORATION
Represented By: Danielle M. Vugrinovich
Represented By: Erin Margolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RCH NEW CO. II LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOOTER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: Eric K. Falk
Represented By: Julie Nord Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZURN INDUSTRIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE RUST ENGINEERING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P&H MINING EQUIPMENT
Represented By: David Emil Lamm
Represented By: Paul K. Vey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COST CORPORATION
Represented By: Jeanette H. Ho
Represented By: Kenneth T. Newman
Represented By: G. Richard Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLOWSERVE FSD CORP., Successor to Valtek International
Represented By: John A. Turlik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORE FURNACE SYSTEMS CORP., as Successor-in-interest to Salem Furnace Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARNISCHFEGER CORPORATION
Represented By: David Emil Lamm
Represented By: Paul K. Vey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MRC GLOBAL (US), INC.
Represented By: Matthew Breneman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FULLER COMPANY
Represented By: Danielle M. Vugrinovich
Represented By: Joseph R. Schaper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERTSON CECO CORPORATION, an alleged successor to H.H. Robertson Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GD-TEK, INC.
Represented By: Christopher H. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAGLE PUMPS, INC.
Represented By: Adam J. Warhola
Represented By: Richard C. Polley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal