THE COCORICO CORP. v. MOTORISTS COMMERCIAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: THE COCORICO CORP. and THE COCORICO CORP. doing business as ROUND CORNER CANTINA
Defendant: MOTORISTS COMMERCIAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2020cv00998
Filed: July 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Joy Flowers Conti
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATION for Extension of Time by THE COCORICO CORP.. (Goodrich, John)
August 31, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by THE COCORICO CORP. (Goodrich, John)
August 30, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority in Further Support of Doc. 15 by MOTORISTS COMMERCIAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY re #15 Brief in Opposition to Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Meyers, Matthew)
August 27, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by THE COCORICO CORP. (Goodrich, John)
August 19, 2020 Filing 15 BRIEF in Opposition re #4 Motion to Remand filed by MOTORISTS COMMERCIAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Meyers, Matthew)
August 19, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #4 Motion to Remand, filed by MOTORISTS COMMERCIAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Meyers, Matthew)
August 19, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by THE COCORICO CORP. (Goodrich, John)
August 18, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by THE COCORICO CORP. (Goodrich, John) Incorrect document attached. Removed from public view, redocketed at #13 . Modified on 8/25/2020 (ma).
August 12, 2020 Filing 11 BRIEF in Support re #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by MOTORISTS COMMERCIAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Meyers, Matthew)
August 12, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by MOTORISTS COMMERCIAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Proposed Order) (Meyers, Matthew)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER: INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 8/24/20. ADR Stipulation and Rule 26f Report due by 9/8/20; Telephonic Case Management set for 10/6/20 at 3:30 PM before Judge Joy Flowers Conti. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 8/3/20. (cjo)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order on Motions Practice. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 8/3/20. (cjo)
July 29, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (cjo)
July 29, 2020 Filing 6 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against MOTORISTS COMMERCIAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY MOTORISTS COMMERCIAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY answer due 8/12/2020, filed by THE COCORICO CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Cooper, Scott)
July 29, 2020 Filing 5 BRIEF in Support re #4 Motion to Remand filed by THE COCORICO CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Certificate of Concurrence/Compliance) (Cooper, Scott)
July 29, 2020 Filing 4 First MOTION to Remand by THE COCORICO CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service, #6 Certificate of Concurrence/Compliance) (Cooper, Scott)
July 10, 2020 Filing 3 BRIEF in Support re #2 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by MOTORISTS COMMERCIAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Meyers, Matthew)
July 10, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by MOTORISTS COMMERCIAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order) (Meyers, Matthew)
July 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County, case number GD-20-006548 Copies attached: State Court Complaint (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5734530), filed by MOTORISTS COMMERCIAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (ma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THE COCORICO CORP. v. MOTORISTS COMMERCIAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE COCORICO CORP.
Represented By: John P. Goodrich
Represented By: Jonathan Shub
Represented By: Scott B. Cooper
Represented By: James C. Haggerty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE COCORICO CORP. doing business as ROUND CORNER CANTINA
Represented By: John P. Goodrich
Represented By: Jonathan Shub
Represented By: Scott B. Cooper
Represented By: James C. Haggerty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOTORISTS COMMERCIAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Matthew A. Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?