ALESIUS et al v. PITTSBURGH LOGISTIC SYSTEMS, INC.
Plaintiff: ROBERT WATERHOUSE, CHRISTIAN ALESIUS, BRENDAN BEAULIEU, NICK CUSOLITO and BRIAN STENSTROM
Defendant: PITTSBURGH LOGISTIC SYSTEMS, INC. doing business as PLS LOGISTICS SERVICES
Case Number: 2:2020cv01067
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Marilyn J Horan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kayla Drum on behalf of CHRISTIAN ALESIUS, BRENDAN BEAULIEU, NICK CUSOLITO, BRIAN STENSTROM, ROBERT WATERHOUSE. (Drum, Kayla)
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHRISTIAN ALESIUS, BRENDAN BEAULIEU, ROBERT WATERHOUSE, NICK CUSOLITO, BRIAN STENSTROM. PITTSBURGH LOGISTIC SYSTEMS, INC. waiver sent on 8/21/2020, answer due 10/20/2020. (Drum, Kayla)
September 1, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey P. Myers on behalf of PITTSBURGH LOGISTIC SYSTEMS, INC.. (Myers, Jeffrey)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by PITTSBURGH LOGISTIC SYSTEMS, INC.. (Steinberg, Benjamin )
August 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin J. Steinberg on behalf of PITTSBURGH LOGISTIC SYSTEMS, INC.. (Steinberg, Benjamin )
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to PITTSBURGH LOGISTIC SYSTEMS, INC. (ma)
August 16, 2020 Filing 3 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by CHRISTIAN ALESIUS, BRENDAN BEAULIEU, NICK CUSOLITO, BRIAN STENSTROM, ROBERT WATERHOUSE (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Hardin, Kenneth)
July 24, 2020 Judge Marilyn J. Horan presiding. (nll)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Judge David S. Cercone no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 7/24/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kly)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PITTSBURGH LOGISTIC SYSTEMS, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5764795), filed by CHRISTIAN ALESIUS, BRENDAN BEAULIEU, ROBERT WATERHOUSE, NICK CUSOLITO, BRIAN STENSTROM. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1) (ma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALESIUS et al v. PITTSBURGH LOGISTIC SYSTEMS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PITTSBURGH LOGISTIC SYSTEMS, INC. doing business as PLS LOGISTICS SERVICES
Represented By: Benjamin J. Steinberg
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT WATERHOUSE
Represented By: Kenneth J. Hardin, II
Represented By: Kayla Drum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTIAN ALESIUS
Represented By: Kenneth J. Hardin, II
Represented By: Kayla Drum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENDAN BEAULIEU
Represented By: Kenneth J. Hardin, II
Represented By: Kayla Drum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICK CUSOLITO
Represented By: Kenneth J. Hardin, II
Represented By: Kayla Drum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN STENSTROM
Represented By: Kenneth J. Hardin, II
Represented By: Kayla Drum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?