THE TOWNSHIP OF UNITY v. THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: THE TOWNSHIP OF UNITY
Defendant: THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY, THE CINCINNATI INDEMNITY COMPANY and THE CINCINNATI CASUALTY COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2020cv01068
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Nora Barry Fischer
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER that upon request of counsel to extend the stay to continue settlement discussions, the stay of this matter is extended to 11/5/20. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report by 10/5/20. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 09/10/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (nls)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that the initial case management conference set for 8/5/2020 is continued until further order of court. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 7/27/2020. (See #8 ) Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdk)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Stipulation filed by THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY, this matter is stayed for sixty (60) days of the date of this Order, pending potential resolution of the case; the August 5, 2020 Initial Case Management Conference will be rescheduled to occur after October 5, 2020; if the case does not otherwise resolve, the parties will file a Stipulation Selecting ADR Process and Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(f) Report by 10/5/2020 (further details set forth in said Order). Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 7/27/2020. (bdk)
July 27, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION to Stay Proceedings by THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY. (Krekstein, William)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM ORDER indicating that the parties' Rule 26(f) Report and ADR Stipulation are due by 7/29/20; a Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference is set for 8/5/20 at 9:00 AM before Judge Nora Barry Fischer; the law clerk will circulate conference call dial-in information. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 7/22/20. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation Selecting ADR, #2 Rule 26(f) Form) (cjo)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 7/22/20. (cjo)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (cjo)
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by THE CINCINNATI CASUALTY COMPANY, THE CINCINNATI INDEMNITY COMPANY, THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D-1, part 1, #2 Exhibit D-1, part 2, #3 Exhibit D-1, part 3, #4 Exhibit D-1, part 4, #5 Exhibit D-1, part 5, #6 Exhibit D-1, part 6, #7 Exhibit D-1, part 7, #8 Exhibit D-2) (Krekstein, William)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying Cincinnati Financial Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate, by THE CINCINNATI CASUALTY COMPANY, THE CINCINNATI INDEMNITY COMPANY, THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY. (Krekstein, William)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas of Westmoreland County, case number 4660 of 2019 Copies attached: State Court Complaint (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5768394), filed by THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY, THE CINCINNATI CASUALTY COMPANY, THE CINCINNATI INDEMNITY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (ma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THE TOWNSHIP OF UNITY v. THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: William O. Krekstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE CINCINNATI INDEMNITY COMPANY
Represented By: William O. Krekstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE CINCINNATI CASUALTY COMPANY
Represented By: William O. Krekstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE TOWNSHIP OF UNITY
Represented By: Gary A. Falatovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?