HASTON v. PHILLIPS & COHEN ASSOCIATES, LTD. et al
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY HASTON
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-5 and PHILLIPS & COHEN ASSOCIATES, LTD.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01069
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: William S Stickman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 11/02/20; Joinder of Parties due 11/02/20; Exchange of initial disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1) due by 09/16/20; Discovery ends 02/01/21; Telephonic Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 02/03/21 at 9:30 AM; Call parameters outlined herein; Fee records due by the 28th of each month; First disclosure due by 10/28/20. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 09/02/20. (eca)
September 2, 2020 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William S. Stickman: Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference held on 9/2/2020. (Court Reporter: None) (eca)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion for Ethan G. Ostroff to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Ostroff is admitted pro hac vice for Phillips & Cohen Associates, LTD. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 09/01/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
August 31, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for attorney Ethan G. Ostroff to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-5875047) by PHILLIPS & COHEN ASSOCIATES, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order) (Ostroff, Ethan)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 08/24/20. (eca)
August 21, 2020 Filing 9 PROPOSED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by TIMOTHY HASTON. (Abramowicz, Kevin) Modified on 8/24/2020 (eca).
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION selecting ADR process by TIMOTHY HASTON. (Abramowicz, Kevin)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Abramowicz, Kevin)
August 11, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin W. Tucker on behalf of TIMOTHY HASTON. (Tucker, Kevin)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 8/14/2020. Rule 26 Meeting Report and Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 8/21/2020. Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/2/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge William S. Stickman. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 07/24/20. (eca)
July 23, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by PHILLIPS & COHEN ASSOCIATES, LTD.. (Summerfield, Victoria)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria D. Summerfield on behalf of PHILLIPS & COHEN ASSOCIATES, LTD.. (jd)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by PHILLIPS & COHEN ASSOCIATES, LTD.. (jd)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from ALLEGHENY COUNTY COURT OF COMMON PLEAS, case number GD-20-006460 with BOTH Copies attached: LOWER COURT COMPLAINT, EXHIBITS, NOTICE OF FILING (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5768531), filed by PHILLIPS & COHEN ASSOCIATES, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Lower Court Documents, #3 Exhibit B- Notice of Filing) (jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HASTON v. PHILLIPS & COHEN ASSOCIATES, LTD. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY HASTON
Represented By: Kevin Abramowicz
Represented By: Eugene D. Frank
Represented By: Kevin W. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILLIPS & COHEN ASSOCIATES, LTD.
Represented By: Victoria D. Summerfield
Represented By: Ethan G. Ostroff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?