MONITEAU SCHOOL DISTRICT v. JUUL LABS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: MONITEAU SCHOOL DISTRICT
Defendant: PHILLIP MORRIS USA, INC., JOHN DOES 1-100, INCLUSIVE, ALTRIA GROUP, INC., ALTRIA GROUP DISTRIBUTION COMPANY, ALTRIA CLIENT SERVICES, JUUL LABS, INC. and NU MARK LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01072
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Joy Flowers Conti
Referring Judge: J Nicholas Ranjan
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Filing 8 Case opened in NDCA at 3:20cv5356 on 8/4/20. (sdp)
August 3, 2020 Case electronically transferred to District of NDCA. (sdp)
July 31, 2020 Filing 7 Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order received from Northern District of California. (sdp)
July 24, 2020 Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan is now presiding. (jmm)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455, Judge Nora Barry Fischer recuses in this matter; the Clerk of Court shall reassign this case to another member of the Bench. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 7/23/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdk)
July 23, 2020 Judge Nora Barry Fischer presiding. (nll)
July 23, 2020 Judge Joy Flowers Conti no longer presiding in case. (nll)
July 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan P. Shuber on behalf of MONITEAU SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Shuber, Jordan)
July 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald T. Elliott on behalf of MONITEAU SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Elliott, Ronald)
July 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E. Breth on behalf of MONITEAU SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Breth, Thomas)
July 18, 2020 Filing 2 Errata re #1 Complaint, by MONITEAU SCHOOL DISTRICT. Reason for Correction: Corrected Signature Requirements. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (King, Thomas)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALTRIA CLIENT SERVICES, ALTRIA GROUP DISTRIBUTION COMPANY, ALTRIA GROUP, INC., JOHN DOES 1-100, INCLUSIVE, JUUL LABS, INC., NU MARK LLC, PHILLIP MORRIS USA, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5769312), filed by MONITEAU SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MONITEAU SCHOOL DISTRICT v. JUUL LABS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILLIP MORRIS USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-100, INCLUSIVE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALTRIA GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALTRIA GROUP DISTRIBUTION COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALTRIA CLIENT SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUUL LABS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NU MARK LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONITEAU SCHOOL DISTRICT
Represented By: Thomas W. King, III
Represented By: Jordan P. Shuber
Represented By: Thomas E. Breth
Represented By: Ronald T. Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?