CLOUGH v. ARTHUR J. GALLAGHER & CO. et al
Plaintiff: JARED D. CLOUGH
Defendant: ARTHUR J. GALLAGHER (U.S.), LLC and ARTHUR J. GALLAGHER & CO.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01074
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Nora Barry Fischer
Referring Judge: Maureen P Kelly
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JARED D. CLOUGH. ARTHUR J. GALLAGHER (U.S.), LLC waiver sent on 7/21/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Wyrick, William)
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JARED D. CLOUGH. ARTHUR J. GALLAGHER & CO. waiver sent on 7/21/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Wyrick, William)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 As detailed in the accompanying Order, given that motions pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) are discouraged if the pleading defect is curable by amendment, IT HEREBY IS ORDERED that the parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of any motion to dismiss to determine whether it can be avoided. The duty to meet and confer extends to parties appearing pro se. Consistent with the foregoing, motions to dismiss must be accompanied by a certificate of the movant, stating that the moving party has made a good faith effort to confer with the nonmovant(s) to determine whether the identified pleading deficiencies properly may be cured by amendment. Motions to dismiss that do not contain the required certification will be summarily denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 07/20/2020. (tjw)
July 20, 2020 Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly presiding. (nll)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455, Judge Nora Barry Fischer recuses in this matter; the Clerk of Court shall assign this case to another member of the Bench. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 7/20/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdk)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to ARTHUR J. GALLAGHER & CO. (Main Documents), ARTHUR J. GALLAGHER (U.S.), LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons issued as to Arthur J. Gallagher (U.S.) LLC) (jv)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ARTHUR J. GALLAGHER & CO., ARTHUR J. GALLAGHER (U.S.), LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5770579), filed by JARED D. CLOUGH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CLOUGH v. ARTHUR J. GALLAGHER & CO. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARTHUR J. GALLAGHER (U.S.), LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARTHUR J. GALLAGHER & CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JARED D. CLOUGH
Represented By: William J. Wyrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?