TESLOVICH v. CHUBB INSURANCE GROUP et al
Plaintiff: GEORGE M. TESLOVICH, JR.
Defendant: CHUBB INSURANCE GROUP and PACIFIC INDEMNITY COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2020cv01132
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
Referring Judge: Marilyn J Horan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Filing 11 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only", so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jgb)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 8/7/2020. (jgb)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Charles J. Jesuit to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 8/6/2020. (bjl)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Stephen S. Kempa to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 8/6/2020. (bjl)
August 5, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Charles J. Jesuit, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-5814229) by CHUBB INSURANCE GROUP, PACIFIC INDEMNITY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Jesuit, Charles)
August 5, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for attorney Stephen S. Kempa to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-5814206) by CHUBB INSURANCE GROUP, PACIFIC INDEMNITY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Kempa, Stephen)
August 4, 2020 Filing 5 BRIEF in Support re #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by CHUBB INSURANCE GROUP, PACIFIC INDEMNITY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pacific Indemnity Company Policy Number 10336670-02-Certified Copy) (Steinman, Paul)
August 4, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by CHUBB INSURANCE GROUP, PACIFIC INDEMNITY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Non-Concurrence, #2 Proposed Order) (Steinman, Paul)
July 31, 2020 Judge Marilyn J. Horan added. (mao)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy recused. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 7/30/2020. (cmc)
July 29, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying Chubb INA Holdings Inc, Chubb Limited, Chubb Group Holdings as corporate parent or other affiliate, by PACIFIC INDEMNITY COMPANY. (Steinman, Paul)
July 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fayette County, case number 494-2020-GD Copies attached: complaint and docket (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5794847), filed by CHUBB INSURANCE GROUP, PACIFIC INDEMNITY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TESLOVICH v. CHUBB INSURANCE GROUP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE M. TESLOVICH, JR.
Represented By: John M. O'Connell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHUBB INSURANCE GROUP
Represented By: Paul D. Steinman
Represented By: Stephen S. Kempa
Represented By: Charles Joseph Jesuit, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PACIFIC INDEMNITY COMPANY
Represented By: Paul D. Steinman
Represented By: Stephen S. Kempa
Represented By: Charles Joseph Jesuit, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?