SILVERMAN et al v. ZAKY et al
Plaintiff: ANGELA SILVERMAN and JEFFREY SILVERMAN
Defendant: NEW PARIS RURAL HEALTH CLINIC, T. JUSTIN RUTHERFORD, PA, HARVEY SCHOENPHAL, MD. and MAGED ZAKY, MD.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01134
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Patricia L Dodge
Referring Judge: Mark R Hornak
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak presiding and Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge referred. Motions referred to Patricia L. Dodge. (jmm)
September 11, 2020 Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge no longer assigned to case. (jmm)
September 11, 2020 Filing 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #14 Amended Complaint filed by ANGELA SILVERMAN, and JEFFREY SILVERMAN. Objections to R&R due by 9/25/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 9/11/2020. (mqe)
September 10, 2020 Filing 14 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against NEW PARIS RURAL HEALTH CLINIC, T. JUSTIN RUTHERFORD, PA, HARVEY SCHOENPHAL, MD, filed by JEFFREY SILVERMAN, ANGELA SILVERMAN. (Kobylinski, Peter)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint Amended Pleadings due by 9/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 9/3/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (spc)
September 3, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge: Telephonic Status Conference held on 9/3/2020. (Court Reporter: none) Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes a Minute of the Court or Notice on the matter. (spc)
September 2, 2020 Filing 12 First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by ANGELA SILVERMAN, JEFFREY SILVERMAN. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A) (Kobylinski, Peter)
August 31, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter T. Kobylinski on behalf of ANGELA SILVERMAN, JEFFREY SILVERMAN. (Kobylinski, Peter)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/3/2020 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge. Parties are directed to refer to the AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES for instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 8/28/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mqe)
August 27, 2020 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 Brief in Opposition to Motion filed by MAGED ZAKY, MD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Taylor, Kezia)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 BRIEF in Opposition re #4 Motion to Dismiss, Motion for Summary Judgment filed by ANGELA SILVERMAN. (Kobylinski, Peter)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #4 Motion to Dismiss, Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Motion to Substitute Party: Responses to Motions due by 8/20/2020. Replies due by 8/27/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 8/6/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (spc)
August 5, 2020 Filing 5 BRIEF in Support re #4 Motion to Dismiss, Motion for Summary Judgment filed by MAGED ZAKY, MD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Taylor, Kezia)
August 5, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment by MAGED ZAKY, MD. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Judgment Order) (Taylor, Kezia)
July 29, 2020 Filing 3 BRIEF in Support re #2 Motion to Substitute Party filed by MAGED ZAKY, MD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Taylor, Kezia)
July 29, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Substitute Party by MAGED ZAKY, MD. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Taylor, Kezia)
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County, case number GD 19-8706, filed by MAGED ZAKY, MD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Including Complaint filed in State Court, #3 Exhibit B) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SILVERMAN et al v. ZAKY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW PARIS RURAL HEALTH CLINIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. JUSTIN RUTHERFORD, PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARVEY SCHOENPHAL, MD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAGED ZAKY, MD.
Represented By: Kezia Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELA SILVERMAN
Represented By: David M. Kobylinski
Represented By: Peter T. Kobylinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY SILVERMAN
Represented By: David M. Kobylinski
Represented By: Peter T. Kobylinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?