ALEKSANDR v. PNC BANK
Plaintiff: YUZHAKOV ALEKSANDR
Defendant: PNC BANK
Case Number: 2:2020cv01140
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Office: Pittsburgh Office
Presiding Judge: Marilyn J Horan
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING CASE And Now this 16th day of September, 2020, after consideration of Plaintiffs Amended Complaint (ECF No. 5), the Court, sua sponte, finds that it lacks subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is dismissed. The Clerk shall make this case closed. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 9/16/2020. (bjl)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OPINION Plaintiff's Amended Complaint will be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1). A separate order will follow. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 9/16/2020. (bjl)
September 10, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against PNC BANK, filed by YUZHAKOV ALEKSANDR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (cel)
August 12, 2020 Filing 4 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only", so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jgb)
August 3, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against PNC BANK (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number IFP Granted), filed by YUZHAKOV ALEKSANDR. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope) (cel)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to file the Complaint. Furthermore, upon review of Plaintiffs Complaint, the Court, sua sponte, finds that it lacks subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed. However, Plaintiff is granted leave to file an Amended Complaint in accordance with this Opinion on or before September 16, 2020. Should the Plaintiff not file an Amended Complaint by said date, the Clerk shall make this case closed. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 8/3/2020. (bjl)
July 30, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by YUZHAKOV ALEKSANDR. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Complaint Lodged Pending the Dispositon of the Motion to Procede IFP, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Envelope) (cel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALEKSANDR v. PNC BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YUZHAKOV ALEKSANDR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?