FENNELL v. TACU et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL FENNELL
Defendant: SPARTAK, INC., GT EXPRESS, LLC and GHEORGHE TACU
Case Number: 2:2020cv01157
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Nora Barry Fischer
Referring Judge: W Scott Hardy
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to W. Scott Hardy for all further proceedings. Judge Nora Barry Fischer no longer assigned to case. All previously scheduled deadlines and proceedings shall remain in effect unless otherwise ordered by the Court. See order at 2:20-mc-1349. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 9/22/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (map)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ON MOTIONS PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 8/18/20. (cjo)
August 7, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to GT EXPRESS, LLC, SPARTAK, INC., GHEORGHE TACU (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (ma)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 8/4/20. (cjo)
August 4, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (cjo)
August 4, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Lydia A. Gorba on behalf of MICHAEL FENNELL. (Gorba, Lydia)
August 4, 2020 Filing 2 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by MICHAEL FENNELL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Kunselman, Harry)
August 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GT EXPRESS, LLC, SPARTAK, INC., GHEORGHE TACU (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5806765), filed by MICHAEL FENNELL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FENNELL v. TACU et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPARTAK, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GT EXPRESS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GHEORGHE TACU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL FENNELL
Represented By: Harry F. Kunselman
Represented By: Lydia A. Gorba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?