LILJA v. J&B IMPORTERS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: PATRICIA LILJA
Defendant: RECREATIONAL EQUIPMENT INC., KALLOY INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. and J&B IMPORTERS, INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01158
Filed: August 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: William S Stickman
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to #17 Amended Complaint, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, CROSSCLAIM against J&B IMPORTERS, INC., KALLOY INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. by RECREATIONAL EQUIPMENT INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Cohen, Jeffrey)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER OF COURT. In light of the filing of #17 Amended Complaint, #6 and #15 Motions to Dismiss are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 09/17/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
September 16, 2020 Filing 17 Third AMENDED COMPLAINT In Civil Action against J&B IMPORTERS, INC., KALLOY INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD., RECREATIONAL EQUIPMENT INC. J&B IMPORTERS, INC. answer due 10/7/2020; KALLOY INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. answer due 10/7/2020; RECREATIONAL EQUIPMENT INC. answer due 10/7/2020, filed by PATRICIA LILJA. (Levine, Richard)
September 4, 2020 Filing 16 BRIEF in Support re #15 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by KALLOY INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Walter, Robert)
September 4, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by KALLOY INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Walter, Robert)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion to Extend Time to File Third Amended Complaint. Third Amended Complaint due by 9/16/2020; J & B Importers, Inc.'s responsive pleading due by 10/7/2020. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 09/01/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (eca)
August 31, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Extend Time to File Third Amended Complaint by PATRICIA LILJA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order) (Levine, Richard)
August 26, 2020 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by RECREATIONAL EQUIPMENT INC.. (Cohen, Jeffrey)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. KALLOY INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. answer due 9/9/2020. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 08/26/20. (eca)
August 25, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by KALLOY INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) (Walter, Robert)
August 24, 2020 Filing 9 DISCOVERY DISPUTE CERTIFICATE by PATRICIA LILJA . (Levine, Richard)
August 19, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #7 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 8/26/2020. (ma)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by J&B IMPORTERS, INC.: Meet and Confer Certificate due by 08/24/2020; Plaintiff's response and brief in opposition, not to exceed twenty pages, due by 09/14/2020; Defendant's Reply brief, not to exceed fifteen pages, due by 9/21/2020. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 08/18/2020. (rgm)
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, and CROSSCLAIM against J&B IMPORTERS, INC., KALLOY INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. by RECREATIONAL EQUIPMENT INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Cohen, Jeffrey)
August 14, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by J&B IMPORTERS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order) (Sichok, Christopher)
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Sichok on behalf of J&B IMPORTERS, INC.. (Sichok, Christopher)
August 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul R. Robinson on behalf of RECREATIONAL EQUIPMENT INC.. (Robinson, Paul)
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Cohen on behalf of RECREATIONAL EQUIPMENT INC.. (Cohen, Jeffrey)
August 4, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert P. Walter on behalf of KALLOY INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.. (Walter, Robert)
August 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County, case number GD-19-003554 with Jury Demand Copies attached: State Court Complaint (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5806616), filed by KALLOY INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (ma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LILJA v. J&B IMPORTERS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA LILJA
Represented By: Richard C. Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RECREATIONAL EQUIPMENT INC.
Represented By: Paul R. Robinson
Represented By: Jeffrey Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KALLOY INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
Represented By: Robert P. Walter
Represented By: Warner Mariani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J&B IMPORTERS, INC.
Represented By: Christopher J. Sichok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?