SHEROD v. COMPREHENSIVE HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC et al
Plaintiff: VANESSA SHEROD
Defendant: HCSG LABOR SUPPLY, LLC, QUALITY BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, INC., EPHRAM LAHASKY, BRIAN EDWARD MEJIA, CHMS GROUP, LLC, HCSG STAFF LEASING SOLUTIONS, LLC, HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC., COMPREHENSIVE MANAGEMENT SERVICES - PROPERTY, LLC, SAMUEL HARPER, HCSG SUPPLY, INC. and COMPREHENSIVE HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC doing business as BRIGHTON REHABILITATION AND WELLNESS CENTER
Case Number: 2:2020cv01198
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Arthur J Schwab
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief Reply due no later than 10/13/2020 at noon. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 10/8/20. (lck)
October 7, 2020 Filing 27 Errata re #26 Motion for Leave to File, by VANESSA SHEROD. Reason for Correction: Wrong attachment to original filing. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service) (Kwass, David)
September 30, 2020 Filing 26 First MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Defendant Comprehensive HealthCare Management Service, LLC d/b/a Brighton Rehabilitation and Wellness Centers Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Remand by VANESSA SHEROD. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Proposed Order) (Kwass, David)
September 30, 2020 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #22 Brief in Opposition to Motion, #24 Reply to Response to Motion to Remand filed by VANESSA SHEROD. (Kwass, David)
September 30, 2020 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #22 Brief in Opposition to Motion to Remand filed by VANESSA SHEROD. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Kwass, David)
September 30, 2020 Filing 23 JOINDER of HCSG LABOR SUPPLY, LLC, HCSG STAFF LEASING SOLUTIONS, LLC, HCSG SUPPLY, INC., HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC., BRIAN EDWARD MEJIA to #22 Brief in Opposition to Motion, #10 Motion to Remand to Agency. (Swistak, Jennifer)
September 30, 2020 Filing 22 BRIEF in Opposition re #10 Motion to Remand to Agency filed by COMPREHENSIVE HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Kimball, Andrew)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER approving #20 Stipulation filed by CHMS GROUP, LLC, COMPREHENSIVE MANAGEMENT SERVICES - PROPERTY, LLC, CHMS GROUP, LLC and COMPREHENSIVE MANAGEMENT SERVICES - PROPERTY, LLC are terminated. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 9/28/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lck)
September 25, 2020 Filing 20 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendants, Comprehensive Management Services Property, LLC and CHMS Group, LLC by CHMS GROUP, LLC, COMPREHENSIVE MANAGEMENT SERVICES - PROPERTY, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Curren, Erica)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER approving #18 Stipulation to exceed page limit. Defendant, Comprehensive Healthcare Management Services, LLC d/b/a Brighton Rehabilitation and Wellness Center is granted permission to exceed the 15-page limit for responsive briefs by an additional 15 pages, at most (for a maximum total page limit of 30 pages). Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 9/23/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lck)
September 22, 2020 Filing 18 STIPULATION to Exceed Page Limit for Brief in Opposition to #10 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by CHMS GROUP, LLC, COMPREHENSIVE HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC, COMPREHENSIVE MANAGEMENT SERVICES - PROPERTY, LLC, SAMUEL HARPER, EPHRAM LAHASKY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Curren, Erica) Modified on 9/29/2020 (ma).
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER approving #16 Stipulation filed by HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC., QUALITY BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, INC. terminated. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 9/21/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lck)
September 18, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant, Quality Business Solutions, Inc. by HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC.. (Swistak, Jennifer)
September 17, 2020 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by HCSG LABOR SUPPLY, LLC, HCSG STAFF LEASING SOLUTIONS, LLC, HCSG SUPPLY, INC., HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC.. (Swistak, Jennifer)
September 14, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #10 Motion to Remand. ERROR: Document should have been filed as two separate documents. CORRECTION: Attorney advised in future that documents of that nature are to be filed as separate documents. Clerk of Court docketed Brief in Support. This message is for informational purposes only. (ma)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER approving #12 Stipulation, filed by COMPREHENSIVE HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC, SAMUEL HARPER, CHMS GROUP, LLC, EPHRAM LAHASKY, COMPREHENSIVE MANAGEMENT SERVICES - PROPERTY, LLC - Response due by 9/30/2020, Reply brief due by 10/7/2020. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 9/14/20. (lck)
September 14, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance and Jury Demand by Erica Kelly Curren on behalf of CHMS GROUP, LLC, COMPREHENSIVE HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC, COMPREHENSIVE MANAGEMENT SERVICES - PROPERTY, LLC, SAMUEL HARPER, EPHRAM LAHASKY. (Curren, Erica) Modified on 9/14/2020 (ma).
September 11, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendants to File Response in Opposition to #10 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by CHMS GROUP, LLC, COMPREHENSIVE HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC, COMPREHENSIVE MANAGEMENT SERVICES - PROPERTY, LLC, SAMUEL HARPER, EPHRAM LAHASKY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kelly, Erica) Modified on 9/14/2020 (ma).
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER re #10 Motion to Remand filed by VANESSA SHEROD - Response due by 9/18/2020 at noon, Reply brief due by 9/23/2020 at noon. Further Ordered that the case is stayed until the Court rules on the Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 9/10/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lck)
September 9, 2020 W/ #10 BRIEF in Support re #10 Motion to Remand filed by VANESSA SHEROD. (ma)
September 9, 2020 Filing 10 Motion to Remand #1 Notice of Removal filed by VANESSA SHEROD. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service) (Kwass, David) Modified on 9/10/2020 (lck).
August 19, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by HCSG LABOR SUPPLY, LLC, HCSG STAFF LEASING SOLUTIONS, LLC, HCSG SUPPLY, INC., HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC., BRIAN EDWARD MEJIA, QUALITY BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, INC. re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Swistak, Jennifer)
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by BRIAN EDWARD MEJIA, HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC., HCSG SUPPLY, INC., HCSG STAFF LEASING SOLUTIONS, LLC, HCSG LABOR SUPPLY, LLC, QUALITY BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, INC. Answer due from BRIAN EDWARD MEJIA on 9/18/2020; HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC. on 9/18/2020; HCSG SUPPLY, INC. on 9/18/2020; HCSG STAFF LEASING SOLUTIONS, LLC on 9/18/2020; HCSG LABOR SUPPLY, LLC on 9/18/2020; QUALITY BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, INC. on 9/18/2020. (Swistak, Jennifer)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer M. Swistak on behalf of HCSG LABOR SUPPLY, LLC, HCSG STAFF LEASING SOLUTIONS, LLC, HCSG SUPPLY, INC., HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC., BRIAN EDWARD MEJIA, QUALITY BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, INC.. (Swistak, Jennifer)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer CHMS GROUP, LLC answer due 9/28/2020; CHMS GROUP, LLC, COMPREHENSIVE HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC, COMPREHENSIVE MANAGEMENT SERVICES - PROPERTY, LLC, SAMUEL HARPER, EPHRAM LAHASKY answer due 9/28/2020. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 8/17/20. (lck)
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 Errata re #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, by CHMS GROUP, LLC, COMPREHENSIVE HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC, COMPREHENSIVE MANAGEMENT SERVICES - PROPERTY, LLC, SAMUEL HARPER, EPHRAM LAHASKY. Reason for Correction: All parties consented to the Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, so was advised by clerk to file a Stipulation instead. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kimball, Andrew)
August 14, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by CHMS GROUP, LLC, COMPREHENSIVE HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC, COMPREHENSIVE MANAGEMENT SERVICES - PROPERTY, LLC, SAMUEL HARPER, EPHRAM LAHASKY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kimball, Andrew) Refiled as a Stipulation. Modified to add link to the errata at #5 on 8/18/2020 (ma).
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Re: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 8/13/20. (ms)
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (ms)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County, case number GD-20-007319 Copies attached: State Court Complaint, Process and Pleadings, Civil Docket Sheet, Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, Consent to Removal (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5829789), filed by COMPREHENSIVE HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (ma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHEROD v. COMPREHENSIVE HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCSG LABOR SUPPLY, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer M. Swistak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUALITY BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, INC.
Represented By: Jennifer M. Swistak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EPHRAM LAHASKY
Represented By: Andrew G. Kimball
Represented By: Erica Kelly Curren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN EDWARD MEJIA
Represented By: Jennifer M. Swistak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHMS GROUP, LLC
Represented By: Andrew G. Kimball
Represented By: Erica Kelly Curren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCSG STAFF LEASING SOLUTIONS, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer M. Swistak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEALTHCARE SERVICES GROUP, INC.
Represented By: Jennifer M. Swistak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMPREHENSIVE MANAGEMENT SERVICES - PROPERTY, LLC
Represented By: Andrew G. Kimball
Represented By: Erica Kelly Curren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMUEL HARPER
Represented By: Andrew G. Kimball
Represented By: Erica Kelly Curren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HCSG SUPPLY, INC.
Represented By: Jennifer M. Swistak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMPREHENSIVE HEALTHCARE MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC doing business as BRIGHTON REHABILITATION AND WELLNESS CENTER
Represented By: Andrew G. Kimball
Represented By: Erica Kelly Curren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VANESSA SHEROD
Represented By: Robert J. Mongeluzzi
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Bailey
Represented By: David L. Kwass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?