LUTSKO v. HILCORP ENERGY COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: AARON L. LUTSKO
Defendant: VIRGIL GILEA, HILCORP ENERGY I, L.P., HILCORP ENERGY COMPANY and GTECH LFG SERVICES, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01200
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Mark R Hornak
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by HILCORP ENERGY COMPANY, HILCORP ENERGY I, L.P.. (Barnes, Adam)
September 14, 2020 Filing 11 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against VIRGIL GILEA, HILCORP ENERGY COMPANY, HILCORP ENERGY I, L.P., GTECH LFG SERVICES, LLC VIRGIL GILEA answer due 9/28/2020; HILCORP ENERGY COMPANY answer due 9/28/2020; HILCORP ENERGY I, L.P. answer due 9/28/2020; GTECH LFG SERVICES, LLC answer due 11/16/2020, filed by AARON L. LUTSKO. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Ogrodowski, E.)
August 21, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint Before Removal served on Virgil Gilea on July 20, 2020, filed by AARON L. LUTSKO. (Ogrodowski, E.)
August 21, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint before Removal served on Hilcorp Energy I, L.P. on July 21, 2020, filed by AARON L. LUTSKO. (Ogrodowski, E.)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint Before Removal served on Hilcorp Energy Company on July 21, 2020, filed by AARON L. LUTSKO. (Ogrodowski, E.)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by E. Richard Ogrodowski on behalf of AARON L. LUTSKO. (Ogrodowski, E.)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by HILCORP ENERGY I, L.P.. (Barnes, Adam)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by HILCORP ENERGY COMPANY. (Barnes, Adam)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice and use either Dial-In No. 1 or Dial-In No. 2, both of which are contained in this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only", so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jad)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 8/21/20. (jad)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jad)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from The Court of Common Pleas of Lawrence County, case number 10381-2020 with Jury Demand (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5831307), filed by HILCORP ENERGY COMPANY, HILCORP ENERGY I, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (cel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LUTSKO v. HILCORP ENERGY COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIRGIL GILEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HILCORP ENERGY I, L.P.
Represented By: Adam M. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HILCORP ENERGY COMPANY
Represented By: Adam M. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GTECH LFG SERVICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AARON L. LUTSKO
Represented By: E. Richard Ogrodowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?