PAUL v. NRG ENERGY, INC., et al
Plaintiff: SHAWN PAUL and NICKI PAUL
Defendant: NRG HOMER CITY SERVICE, LLC, NRG ENERGY, INC. and NRG ENERGY SERVICES
Case Number: 2:2020cv01217
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Marilyn J Horan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 9/11/2020. (jgb)
September 9, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SHAWN PAUL, NICKI PAUL. NRG ENERGY SERVICES waiver sent on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020; NRG ENERGY, INC. waiver sent on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020; NRG HOMER CITY SERVICE, LLC waiver sent on 9/8/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. (Scanlon, Matthew)
September 9, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jared S. Hawk on behalf of NRG ENERGY SERVICES, NRG ENERGY, INC., NRG HOMER CITY SERVICE, LLC. (Hawk, Jared)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NRG ENERGY SERVICES, NRG ENERGY, INC., NRG HOMER CITY SERVICE, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5839791), filed by SHAWN PAUL, NICKI PAUL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PAUL v. NRG ENERGY, INC., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAWN PAUL
Represented By: Matthew J. Scanlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICKI PAUL
Represented By: Matthew J. Scanlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NRG HOMER CITY SERVICE, LLC
Represented By: Jared S. Hawk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NRG ENERGY, INC.
Represented By: Jared S. Hawk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NRG ENERGY SERVICES
Represented By: Jared S. Hawk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?