MOORE v. SOLOMON
Plaintiff: MOORE JERRY and JERRY MOORE
Defendant: JILL SOLOMAN and JILL SOLOMON
Case Number: 2:2020cv01225
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER - Pursuant to the NOTICE OF Voluntary Withdrawal of Action by JERRY MOORE #5 , the Clerk of Court is directed is to mark this CASE CLOSED. The $350.00 filing fee shall not be assessed. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 9/14/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bsc)
September 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF Voluntary Withdrawal of Action by JERRY MOORE (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (elt)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER indicating that for the reasons more fully stated within, this Court may not have jurisdiction of Plaintiff's claims. If Plaintiff desires to voluntarily dismiss the case, he may file the attached Notification of Withdrawal of Action and the Court will dismiss the case and not assess the $350.00 filing fee. The Notice of Withdrawal should be filed by 9/28/2020. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 8/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal) (bsc)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by JERRY MOORE. (elt) Modified on 8/20/2020 to update name(elt).
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JERRY MOORE. (Attachments: #1 Authorization, #2 Complaint, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Consent to MJ) (elt) Modified on 8/20/2020 to update name (elt). (Attachment 6 replaced to separate from envelope on 8/20/2020) (elt). (Additional attachment (envelope) added on 8/20/2020: #7 Envelope) (elt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOORE v. SOLOMON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MOORE JERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JERRY MOORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JILL SOLOMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JILL SOLOMON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?