LEO v. THOMAS NEWARA, NEWARNICK CONSTRUCTION
Plaintiff: JOSHUA LEO
Defendant: THOMAS NEWARA, NEWARNICK CONSTRUCTION
Case Number: 2:2020cv01237
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: W Scott Hardy
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 9:9
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re Application for Refund. This should be filed at 2:07mc203 using the form on our website. (sdp)
September 22, 2020 Case reassigned to W. Scott Hardy pursuant to reassignment order at 2:20-mc-1349. Judge Arthur J. Schwab no longer assigned to the case. (cw)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 Errata re #3 Order Re: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss. Reason for Correction: wrong caption. (ms)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Re: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 8/24/20. (ms) Wrong caption on document. Removed from public view and redocketed as an errata at #4 . Modified on 8/27/2020 (ma).
August 21, 2020 Judge Arthur J. Schwab presiding. (nll)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF RECUSAL that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455, Judge Nora Barry Fischer recuses in this matter; the Clerk of Court shall reassign this case to another member of the Bench. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 8/20/20. (cjo)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against THOMAS NEWARA, NEWARNICK CONSTRUCTION (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5846674), filed by JOSHUA LEO. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (ma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEO v. THOMAS NEWARA, NEWARNICK CONSTRUCTION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS NEWARA, NEWARNICK CONSTRUCTION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA LEO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?