CENTIMARK CORPORATION v. PACIFICA DAYTONA LLC
Plaintiff: CENTIMARK CORPORATION
Defendant: PACIFICA DAYTONA LLC and PERRYS OCEAN EDGE MOTEL
Case Number: 2:2020cv01239
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason M. Yarbrough on behalf of PACIFICA DAYTONA LLC. (Yarbrough, Jason)
October 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Tony J. Thompson on behalf of PACIFICA DAYTONA LLC. (Thompson, Tony)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Show Cause Response due by 11/6/2020. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 10/8/2020. (mrm)
August 28, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Plaintiff's Complaint served on Frank Perez on 08/28/20, filed by CENTIMARK CORPORATION. (Golen, Mark)
August 21, 2020 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement identifying none as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CENTIMARK CORPORATION. (Golen, Mark)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER ON RULE 12(b) MOTIONS. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 8/21/2020. (cmc)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CENTIMARK CORPORATION (jd)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PACIFICA DAYTONA LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5847335), filed by CENTIMARK CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CENTIMARK CORPORATION v. PACIFICA DAYTONA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PACIFICA DAYTONA LLC
Represented By: Jason M. Yarbrough
Represented By: Tony J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERRYS OCEAN EDGE MOTEL
Represented By: Jason M. Yarbrough
Represented By: Tony J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CENTIMARK CORPORATION
Represented By: Mark J. Golen, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?