KUPIEC v. SAUL
Plaintiff: ANDREW THOMAS KUPIEC
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Case Number: 2:2020cv01240
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Donetta W Ambrose
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by ANDREW THOMAS KUPIEC. ANDREW SAUL served on 8/28/2020, answer due 10/27/2020. (Quatrini, Adam)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to ANDREW SAUL (jmm)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against ANDREW SAUL, filed by ANDREW THOMAS KUPIEC. (jmm)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Donetta W. Ambrose on 8/24/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cha)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Donetta W. Ambrose for all further proceedings. Judge Cathy Bissoon no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 8/20/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dcd)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ANDREW THOMAS KUPIEC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Complaint Lodged pending IFP, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Proposed, #5 Summons Proposed, #6 Summons Proposed) (jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KUPIEC v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW THOMAS KUPIEC
Represented By: Adam N Quatrini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?