2 TOMATO, INC. v. THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: TOMATO INC. on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated doing business as II TOMATO and 2 TOMATO, INC. on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated doing business as II TOMATO
Defendant: THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY, THE CINCINNATI INDEMNITY COMPANY and THE CINCINNATI CASUALTY COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2020cv01245
Filed: August 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Mark R Hornak
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 2 TOMATO, INC.. THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY waiver sent on 9/1/2020, answr due 11/2/2020. (Lynch, Gary) Modified on 9/25/2020 (elt).
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 2 TOMATO, INC. THE CINCINNATI INDEMNITY COMPANY waiver sent on 9/1/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (Lynch, Gary) Modified on 9/25/2020 (elt).
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by 2 TOMATO, INC. THE CINCINNATI CASUALTY COMPANY waiver sent on 9/1/2020, answer due 11/2/2020. (Lynch, Gary) Modified on 9/25/2020 (elt).
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by 2 TOMATO, INC. (Lynch, Gary) Modified on 9/25/2020 (elt).
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice and use either Dial-In No. 1 or Dial-In No. 2, both of which are contained in this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only", so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jad)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 8/24/20. (jad)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jad)
August 21, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 8/28/2020. (elt)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to THE CINCINNATI CASUALTY COMPANY, THE CINCINNATI INDEMNITY COMPANY, THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (elt)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against THE CINCINNATI CASUALTY COMPANY, THE CINCINNATI INDEMNITY COMPANY, THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5850646), filed by TOMATO INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (elt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 2 TOMATO, INC. v. THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE CINCINNATI INDEMNITY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE CINCINNATI CASUALTY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOMATO INC. on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated doing business as II TOMATO
Represented By: Gary F. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 2 TOMATO, INC. on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated doing business as II TOMATO
Represented By: Gary F. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?