SIDELINES BEER HOUSE LLC v. ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE
Plaintiff: SIDELINES BEER HOUSE LLC
Defendant: ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE
Case Number: 2:2020cv01246
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Mark R Hornak
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly K. Iverson on behalf of SIDELINES BEER HOUSE LLC. (Iverson, Kelly)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #15 Motion for Tiffany L. Powers to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 9/9/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb)
September 8, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for attorney Tiffany L. Powers to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-5896111) by ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Tiffany L. Powers, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit 3 - Proposed Order) (Powers, Tiffany)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion for Adam J. Kaiser to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 9/3/20. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb)
September 2, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for attorney Adam J. Kaiser to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-5881241) by ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Adam Kaiser in Support, #2 Exhibit A) Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Kaiser, Adam)
September 2, 2020 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement identifying Erie Indemnity Co. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE. (Maczuzak, Tara)
September 1, 2020 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by SIDELINES BEER HOUSE LLC. (Lynch, Gary)
August 31, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Bruce Carlson on behalf of SIDELINES BEER HOUSE LLC. (Carlson, R.)
August 27, 2020 Filing 9 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice and use either Dial-In No. 1 or Dial-In No. 2, both of which are contained in this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only", so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jad)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 8/27/20. (jad)
August 27, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jad)
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SIDELINES BEER HOUSE LLC. ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE waiver sent on 8/26/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Lynch, Gary)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason H. Peck on behalf of ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE. (Peck, Jason)
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul K. Geer on behalf of ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE. (Geer, Paul)
August 26, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Tara L. Maczuzak on behalf of ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE. (Maczuzak, Tara)
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE (jv)
August 25, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Complaint,. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 9/1/2020. (jv) Modified on 8/26/2020 (ept).
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5850771), filed by SIDELINES BEER HOUSE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SIDELINES BEER HOUSE LLC v. ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIDELINES BEER HOUSE LLC
Represented By: Gary F. Lynch
Represented By: Kelly K. Iverson
Represented By: R. Bruce Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIE INSURANCE EXCHANGE
Represented By: Jason H. Peck
Represented By: Paul K. Geer
Represented By: Tara L. Maczuzak
Represented By: Tiffany L Powers
Represented By: Adam J. Kaiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?