ANDERSON v. PITTSBURGH PUBLIC SCHOOLS
Plaintiff: ANTHONY ANDERSON
Defendant: PITTSBURGH PUBLIC SCHOOLS
Case Number: 2:2020cv01278
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Joy Flowers Conti
Referring Judge: William S Stickman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Update Answer Deadline: Answer deadline terminated for ANTHONY ANDERSON (ma)
October 14, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against PITTSBURGH PUBLIC SCHOOLS. PITTSBURGH PUBLIC SCHOOLS answer due 11/16/2020, filed by ANTHONY ANDERSON. (Sansone, Joel) Modified on 10/19/2020 (ma).
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion to Amend Complaint. Amended Complaint due by 10/21/2020. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 10/14/20. (eca)
October 13, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint by ANTHONY ANDERSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) (Sansone, Joel)
October 6, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ANTHONY ANDERSON. PITTSBURGH PUBLIC SCHOOLS waiver sent on 9/16/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (Sansone, Joel)
September 30, 2020 Judge William S. Stickman added. Judge Joy Flowers Conti no longer assigned to case. (mao)
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Massimo A. Terzigni on behalf of ANTHONY ANDERSON. (Terzigni, Massimo)
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Tuttle on behalf of ANTHONY ANDERSON. (Tuttle, Elizabeth)
September 21, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian P. Gabriel on behalf of PITTSBURGH PUBLIC SCHOOLS. (Gabriel, Brian)
September 3, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (cjo)
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PITTSBURGH PUBLIC SCHOOLS (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5870466), filed by ANTHONY ANDERSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ANDERSON v. PITTSBURGH PUBLIC SCHOOLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PITTSBURGH PUBLIC SCHOOLS
Represented By: Brian P. Gabriel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY ANDERSON
Represented By: Joel S. Sansone
Represented By: Massimo A. Terzigni
Represented By: Elizabeth Tuttle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?