SCOJET, INC. v. FIRTH RIXSON FORGINGS, LLC et al
Plaintiff: SCOJET, INC.
Defendant: ARCONIC, INC., FIRTH RIXSON FORGINGS, LLC doing business as ALCOA FORGINGS AND EXTRUSIONS, ALCOA INC. and HOWMET AEROSPACE INC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01362
Filed: September 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: W Scott Hardy
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2020 Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from All Defendants by 11/12/20 (sdp)
October 27, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jesse R. Loffler on behalf of ARCONIC, INC., FIRTH RIXSON FORGINGS, LLC, HOWMET AEROSPACE INC. (Loffler, Jesse)
October 27, 2020 Filing 8 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by FIRTH RIXSON FORGINGS, LLC, HOWMET AEROSPACE INC, ARCONIC, INC. Answer due from All Defendants. (Loffler, Jesse)
October 26, 2020 Filing 7 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this document. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only," so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (dms)
October 20, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons, complaint, notice of ADR designation served on Audrey Waldock on 10-13-20, filed by SCOJET, INC.. (Hoffman, Matthew)
October 20, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons, complaint, notice of ADR designation served on Audrey Walkock on 10-13-20, filed by SCOJET, INC.. (Hoffman, Matthew)
October 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (dms)
September 28, 2020 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement identifying NONE as corporate parent or other affiliate, by SCOJET, INC.. (Hoffman, Matthew)
September 11, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to ARCONIC, INC., FIRTH RIXSON FORGINGS, LLC, HOWMET AEROSPACE INC (sdp)
September 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ARCONIC, INC., FIRTH RIXSON FORGINGS, LLC, HOWMET AEROSPACE INC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5902540), filed by SCOJET, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SCOJET, INC. v. FIRTH RIXSON FORGINGS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARCONIC, INC.
Represented By: Jesse R. Loffler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIRTH RIXSON FORGINGS, LLC doing business as ALCOA FORGINGS AND EXTRUSIONS
Represented By: Jesse R. Loffler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALCOA INC.
Represented By: Jesse R. Loffler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOWMET AEROSPACE INC
Represented By: Jesse R. Loffler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCOJET, INC.
Represented By: Matthew M. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?